Aafc Liquidation Corp
Bankruptcy Case Illinois Northern Bankruptcy Court - Chicago, Case No. 97-02106

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Last Updated January 26, 2018 at 9:12 PM ST (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (322) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 322 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Close Bankruptcy Case
ORDER CLOSING CASE [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 193
    LREF
    Blank 321 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Order (GENERIC)
    ORDER GRANTED ORDER The above chapter 11 case is hereby closed RE: Item# 318 [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 192
      LREF
      Blank 320 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Certificate of service
      CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 318 [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 191
        LREF
        Blank 319 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Verification
        VERIFICATION by Constantin R Boden [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 190
          LREF
          Blank 318 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001, Terminated: 1/14/2002 Motion for Entry of Order
          MOTION for Entry of A Final Decree by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 01/09/2002 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 189
            LREF
            Blank 317 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 notice of motion
            NOTICE of Motion [DO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 188
              LREF
              Blank 316 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Order Judge ReassignmentCourt Filing
              ORDER Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce W. Black from Judge Erwin I. Katz [RLK] Original NIBS Entry Number: 187
                LREF
                Blank 315 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                ORDER GRANTED SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 314 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 186
                  LREF
                  Blank 314 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Motion Objecting to Claim
                  OBJECTION to Claim of Omnibus [Second Amended] by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 11/06/2000 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 185
                    LREF
                    Blank 313 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of filing
                    NOTICE of Filing And Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 184
                      LREF
                      Blank 312 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 stipulation
                      STIPULATION Of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff/Debtor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 183
                        LREF
                        Blank 311 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Notice of filing
                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 182
                          LREF
                          Blank 309 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Adversary Proceeding Filed #
                          ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILED NO. 99A193 454/To recover money or property [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 180
                            LREF
                            Blank 306 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Entered and Continued
                            HEARING Continued hearing on 01/05/1999 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 305 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 177A
                              LREF
                              Blank 307 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Order (GENERIC)
                              ORDER approving settlement agreement and release among the debtor, LaSalle National Bank and Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC; and agreement and release between the debtor and Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 302 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 178
                                LREF
                                Blank 305 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Entered and Continued
                                HEARING Continued hearing on 12/29/1998 at 10:30 a.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 177
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 304 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Order (GENERIC)
                                  ORDER that the Letter Agreement as defined in the motion, attached as Exhibit 1 and the compromise contained is approved in all respects and the Company is authorized to make the payments called for by the Letter Agreement in accordance with the terms. RE: It em# 301 [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 176
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 303 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Certificate of service
                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 301 [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 175
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 308 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 notice of motion
                                      NOTICE of Motion RE: Item# 302 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 179
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 302 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                        MOTION for order approving settlement agreement and release among the debtor, LaSalle National Bank and Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC; and agreement and release between the debtor and credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC by 1550 Liq uidation Corporation hearing on 12/15/1998[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 174
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 301 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                          MOTION for order approving copromise contained in letter agreement by and between the debtor and Lanier Worldwide Inc by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 12/15/1998 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 173
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 300 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 notice of motion
                                            NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 172
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 299 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Adversary Proceeding Filed #
                                              ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILED NO. 98A519 456/To obtain declaratory judgment relating to any of foregoing causes of action [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 171
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 298 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: 12/24/1997 Order and Stipulation
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding claims of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 294 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 170
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: 12/24/1997 Order and Stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding claim of Bear Stearns & Company Inc SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 296 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 169
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 296 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                    MOTION for order approving stipulation regarding claim of Bear Stearns & Company Inc by debtor hearing on 12/23/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 168A
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997 notice of motion
                                                      NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 168
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 294 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/12/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                        MOTION for order approvng stipulation regarding claims of credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC by debtor hearing on 12/23/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 167A
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 293 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/12/1997 notice of motion
                                                          NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 167
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 292 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                            ORDER - Paragraph 1 of the Stipulation and Order between the Company and LaSalle National Bank dated May 5, 1997 shall be amended and restated to read as follows: SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 290 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 166A
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 291 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                              ORDER Shortening Time and Limiting Notice; and Approving the purchase price adjustment agreement by and amoung the debtor, Credit suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC, Customized Auto Credit Service Inc and Allstate Insurance Company, as assignee of First Midwest Bank N.A. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 290 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 166
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 290 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                MOTION for order shortening time and limiting notice; approving the purchase price adjustment agreement by and among the debtor, credit suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC, Customized Auto Credit Services Inc, and Allstate Insurance Company, as Assignee of First Midwest Bank N.A. by debtor hearing on 10/29/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 165A
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 289 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 notice of motion
                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 165
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 288 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                    ORDER - The Trials scheduled for October 27-29, 1997 and for November 12, 1997 at 2:00 p.m. between 1550 Liquidating Corp. and James M Butler, Deborah Leisten, Charles K Furman, Sandra L Travis, Julia Ann Grobart, Lourdes DeVasquez, Joy Black and Tonya Martin are stricken from the Court's calender pursuant to the terms of the executed agreements attached between the Company and each and every Bonus Claimant. [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 164
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 287 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                      ORDER Disallowing Claim Certain Secured Claims and General Unsecured Claims - Claims listed on Exhibit 1 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 279 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 163
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                        HEARING Continued hearing on 11/12/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 227 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128G
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 11/18/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 11/19/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 217 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126H
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 11/12/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 217 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126G
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 286 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                              ORDER Authorizing Commercial Service Corporation to immediately turn over possession of a 1994 Nissan Sentra Vehicle. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 285 [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 162
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 285 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997, Terminated: 10/10/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                MOTION for Entry [Joint] of Order Authorizing Transfer of Automobile Titles and Liens by Debtor hearing on 10/08/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 161A
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 161
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 283 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 response
                                                                                    RESPONSE by The Tennessee Department of Revenue RE: Item# 279 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 160
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                      HEARING Continued hearing on 10/29/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 226 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128F
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                        HEARING Continued hearing on 10/28/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 226 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128E
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 10/27/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 226 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128D
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 227 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 10/14/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 226 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128C
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                              HEARING Continued hearing on 10/29/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 216 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126F
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                HEARING Continued hearing on 10/28/1997 at 2:00 p.m. RE: Item# 216 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126E
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                  HEARING Continued hearing on 10/14/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 216 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126C
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Amendment to List of Creditors/Matrix (Fee)
                                                                                                    AMENDMENT to Schedule F [Paid/Receipt No. 12014] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 159B
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Summary of Assets and Liabilities
                                                                                                      SUMMARY of Schedules [Third Amended] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 159A
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 159
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 279 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Claim [Omnibus Governmental Claims] by Company [Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 158A
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 158
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 277 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order and Stipulation
                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER - In consideration of the foregoing, the debtor and LaSalle, subject to the approval of the court, agree that the time for filing LaSalle's response to the debtor's objections to the claims of LaSalle described SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 157
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 276 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order and Stipulation
                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER - In consideration of the foregoing, the Company and CACS, subject to the approval of the court, agree that the time for filing CACS' response to the Company's Objection to the Claims of CACS described [the Response] and any hearing on the adequacy of th e objections to the claims of CACS [the objections] shall be continued generally, subject to rights of either party, upon reasonable notice, to request the court to schedule dates for the response and a hearing on the objections. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 156
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 275 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order and Stipulation
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER - In consideration of the foregoing, the debtor and Bear Stearns, by and through their respective counsel, subject to the approval of the court, agree as follows: SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 155
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTED Partial Withdrawal of Omnibus Objection to Claims - The company's withdrawal of its objections to the extent set forth in the Partial Withdraw of Omnibus Objections to Claims is authorzied and approved as to the following claims: Claims No. 4, 5, 18, 21, 37, 59, 71, 74, 75, 106, 108, 127, 149, 160, 165, 209, 213, 245, 272, 274, 304, 314, 320, 321, 350, 365, 375, 382, 389 and the Claim filed by Chase Imports. RE: Item# 225 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 154
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 273 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTED Partial Withdrawal of Omnibus Objection to Administrative Claims filed by Carousel Executive Centre Inc. [Claim No. 59] and by London & Spiess, LLC is authorized and approved to the extent set forth in the Partial Withdraw of Omnibus Objections to Claims . RE: Item# 225 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 153
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 226 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                        HEARING Continued hearing on 09/10/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 225 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128B
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 216 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 09/10/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 215 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126B
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 272 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 response
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to the Objections of AAFC Liquidation Corp. by Thelma Rudolph [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 152
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 271 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 response
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims by Copelco Capital, Inc. [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 151A
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 270 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 151
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 269 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 stipulation
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Withdrawing Debtor's Objection to Lanier Claims by Lanier Worldwide, Inc. and Debtor [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 150
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 268 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                    REBUTTAL to Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims and to Debtor's First Amended Omnibus Objection to Claims by Tonya Martin [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 149A
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 267 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 149
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 266 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                        REBUTTAL to Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims and to Debtor's First Amended Omnibus Objection to Claims by Joy Black [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 148A
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 265 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 148
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 264 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                            Creditor's Rebuttal to debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims and to debtor's First Amended Omnibus Objection to Claims [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 147A
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 263 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 147
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                Creditor's rebuttal to debtor's Omnibus Objection to claims and to debtor's First amended Omnibus Objection to Claims [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 146A
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 146
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 260 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                    Rebuttal to debtor's omnibus objection to claims and to debtor's first amended omnibus objection to claims by Julia Ann Grobart Re: Item #128A RE: Item# 215 [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 145A
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 145
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 258 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                        Rebuttal to debtor's omnibus objection to claims and to debtor's first amended omnibus objection to claims by Deborah Leisten Re: Item #128A RE: Item# 215 [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 144A
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 257 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 144
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 256 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                            Rebuttal To Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims and To Debtor's First Amended Omnibus Objection To Claims by Lourdes DeVasquez [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 143A
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 255 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 143
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 254 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                REBUTTAL To Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims and To Debtor's First Amended Omnibus Objection To Claims by James M. Butler, Creditor [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 142B
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 253 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [Dated 07/29/97] [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 142A
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 252 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [Dated 07/28/97] [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 142
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                      Partial withdrawal of omnibus objection to claims by debtor [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 140A
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 140
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 response
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Communication Systems Inc RE: Item# 215 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 138
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated Re: Response to objection of claim #264 by 1550 Liquidation Corporation formerly American Auto Funding Corporation [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 137
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 response
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition to debtor's objection to John Chezik Honda's filed claim by John Chezik Honda [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 136
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 response
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Barbara Byard RE: Item# 215 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 139
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 244 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Quarterly Fee Statement for Quarter Ending
                                                                                                                                                                                  US Trustee Quarterly Fee Statement For Quarter Ending by Robert J Naples [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 135A
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 243 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 135
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 242 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to Claim [Administrative] on schedules A and B as well as claims no. 240, 396, 397, 399, 400, 401, 403, and 404 filed on behalf of LaSalle, London & Spiess, LLC and Carousel by Omnibus [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 134A
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 241 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 134
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 240 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/9/1997 Amendment to List of Creditors/Matrix (Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDMENT to Schedule F [Paid/Receipt No. 9979] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 133A
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/9/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 133
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service re: Motion for Order [1] Establishing Deadline for Responding to the the Co.'s Omnibus Objection to Claims; [2] Scheduling Hearing to Consider the Co.'s Omnibus Objection to Claims; and [3] Approving Form of Notice [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 131
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 130A
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of [1] Deadline for Responding to the Co.'s Omnibus Objection to Claims; [2] Hearing to Consider the Co.'s Omnibus Objection to Claims; and [3] Approving Form of Notice [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 130
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 225 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 129
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to Claim [FIRST AMENDED OMNIBUS] by 1550 Liquidation Corp. [Disposed] [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128A
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 128
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION[S] due by 07/31/1997 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 132B
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Hearing Status hearing on 08/05/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 223 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 132A
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER establishing deadlines for responding to the company's Omnibus objection to claims; scheduling hearing to consider the company's omnibus objection to claims and approving form of notice SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 223 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 132
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for order establishing deadline for responding to the company's Omnibus objection to claims: scheduling hearing to consider the company's Omnibus objecting to claims: and approving form of notice by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 06/25/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 127A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 222 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 127
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE Enter and Request for Notices by Michelle Ruberto Fonseca [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 141
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 5/12/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION For Payment Of Administrative Expense by LaSalle National Bank [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 181
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION To Claim [Omnibus] by Debtor [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 126
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for payment of administrative expenses by London & Spiess LLC [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 125
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service re: Notice of Bar Date to File Proofs of Claim for Claims Derived from Rejected Contracts [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 124
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 123B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION[S] by The Liquidating and Disbursing Agent due by 07/11/1997 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 123A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of entry of order approving debtor's first amended disclosure statement dated March 18, 1997 and confirming debtor's first amended amended plan of liquidation dated March 18, 1997 and fixing administrative claims bar date by June 9, 1997 [LH] Original N IBS Entry Number: 123
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Operating Report for the period ending April 30, 1997 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 121A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 121
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Creditors Listed on Schedules with Certificate of Mailing/Service FiledNOTICE to Creditors Listed on Schedules with Certificate of Mailing/Service Filed 5/15/97 RE: Item# 173 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 122
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service re: items #83A, 91A and 105 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 120
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service re: Notice of combined hearing on adequacy of disclosure statement and confirmation of plan of liquidation; Notice of opportunity to object; and Notice of voting deadline and procedures for vote tabulation [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 119
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 194 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 118
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Judgment Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT ORDER - Effective immediately that Debtor's First Amended Disclosure Statement, dated March 18, 1997, the soliciatation materials and the solicitation procedures are hereby approved and debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization, dated March 18, 1997, is he reby confirmed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1129. Re: Item #83A and #91A [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 117
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Hearing Status is set hearing on 08/05/1997 at 10:30 a.m. [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 116A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Approving Debtor's First Amended Disclosure Statement Dated March 18, 1997 and Confirming Debtor's First Amended Plan of Liquidation Dated March 18, 1997 Re: Items #83A and #91A SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 116
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Debtor may pay to Claymore an additional retainer equal to $106,000 as financial advisor to the debtor. RE: Item# 180 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 115A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTED in all respects RE: Item# 180 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 115
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION between the debtor and AAFC Liquidation Corporation regarding First Amended Plan of Reorganization [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 114
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of law in support RE: Item# 139 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 113A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 113
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor's Report on Plan Voting by Classes [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 112A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 112
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTED Instanter RE: Item# 191 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 111
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997, Terminated: 5/1/1997 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave An Objection In Excess of Fifteen Pages by La Salle National Bank hearing on 04/30/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DS] Original NIBS Entry Number: 110A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing [DS] Original NIBS Entry Number: 110
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by LaSalle National Bank, as Successor to LaSalle National Trust N.A. RE: Item# 158 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 109A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 109
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION of Customized Auto Credit Services Inc to Adequacy of Disclosure Statement and to Confirmation of Plan of Liquidation [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 108A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 108
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continued hearing on 05/05/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 180 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 107
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE for Corporated Environments/Corporate Planners, Inc by John M Drews [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 106
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 4/21/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing regarding Proof of Claim and Ballot for Accepting or Rejecting Plan [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 105
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to PayORDER to Pay - Debtor shall pay, within ten [10] days after the entry of this order, the sum of $1,465.87 to Acceptable SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS ORDER to Pay RE: Item# 170 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 104A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - The equipment leases in the motion are by rejected by the debtor. Debtor shall immediately tender possession of the equipment desscribed in the leases to Acceptable or its authorized representative. RE: Item# 170 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 104
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION For Authority To Pay Claymore Partners Ltd Additional Retainer As Financial Advisor To The Debtor by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 04/23/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [AM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 10 3A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion [AM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 103
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE for ContiFinancial Corporation by David W Writ [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 102
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE for ContiFinancial Corporation by James F Conlan [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 101
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT Listing for Month EndingRECEIPT Listing for Month Ending for the month ending 3/31/97 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 100A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 100
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT Listing for Month EndingRECEIPT Listing for Month Ending for the month ending 1/24/97 - 2/28/97 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 99
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Amendment to List of Creditors/Matrix (Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDMENT to Schedule C - F [Paid Receipt No. 6844] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 98B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Financial Affairs [Amended] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 98A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Summary of Assets and Liabilities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMARY of Schedules [Amended] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 98
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997, Terminated: 4/17/1997 Motion to Assume/Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Reject Or Assume Equipment Leases by Acceptable Equipment Leasing Company hearing on 04/16/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [AM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 97A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion [AM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 97
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report of David T Erie Regarding Status of Screening Arrangements Implemented by Kirkland & Ellis [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 96A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 96
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Authorizing to reject the executory contracts listed on exhibit A annexed hereto, effective as of 2/5/97 [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 95
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE for Matterhorn Bank Programs Inc by David G Bover [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 94D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE for Matterhorn Bank Programs Inc by Scott B Tudor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 94C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE for Matterhorn Bank Programs Inc by Scott V Scarpelli [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 94B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE for Matterhorn Bank Program Inc by William F Richardson [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 94A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 94
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Authorizing to pay $414,246.82 from its debtor-in-possession bank account to the automobile dealerships listed on Exhibit A annexed to this Order in the amounts set forth opposite such dealerships on such Exhibit A SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 146 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 93
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Authorizing debtor to pay to CDW $12,880.03 in full satisfaction of CDW's claims [whether asserted as administrative, priority, unsecured or other claims] under the invoices decribed in the motion SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 136 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 92
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Disclosure/Amended Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE Statement for first amended plan of liquidation dated March 18, 1997 under Chapter 11 of the bankruptcy code [First Amended] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 91A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 91
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 139 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 90
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997, Terminated: 3/21/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Automobile Dealerships by 1550 Liquidation Corp hearing on 03/19/1997 at 10:30 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 85 A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 85
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - Entered and Continued hearing on 03/19/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 136 [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 88
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Authorizing the Debtor to reject the executory contracts and unexpired leases listed on Exhibit A annexed hereto, effective as of 2/5/97 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 133 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 87
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - all ballots accepting or rejecting the Plan must be received by the Clerk of the Court by 4:30 p.m., Chicago time, on 4/25/97 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 86E
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - the Debtor shall have until 6/9/97 as the last date by which the Debtor may make an objection [other than to claims filed by governmental units, to which claims the Debtor may object on or before 8/21/97] to any timely-filed claim [MC] Original NIBS E ntry Number: 86D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - 7/22/97 is the last date by which governmental units may file a proof of claim against the Debtor [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 86C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 149 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - 4/25/97 is the last date all creditors and interest holders of the Debtor, excluding governmental units may file a proof of claim against the Debtor [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 86B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION[S] to the adequacy of the Disclosure Statement, the confirmation of the Plan is due by 04/25/1997 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 86A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Hearing [to consider the adequacy of the Disclosure Statement and confirmation of the Plan] hearing on 05/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 86
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - motion continued with respect to the executory contracts of Messrs. Branchick, Santella and Vanderleek set hearing on 03/25/1997 at 10:30 a.m. [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 89
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Disclosure/Amended Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE Statement for plan of liquidation dated March 10, 1997 under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code by debtor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 84
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plan of Liquidation by debtor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 83A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 83
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997, Terminated: 1/14/2002 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Approving Form of Ballots, Voting Deadline and Procedures for Vote Tabulation; and Approving Form of Notice by 1550 Liquidation Corp. hearing on 03/11/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [MC] Original NIB S Entry Number: 82C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997, Terminated: 1/14/2002 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Establishing Objection Deadline; Establishing Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim and Deadline for Objections to Claims by 1550 Liquidation Corp. hearing on 03/11/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 82B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997, Terminated: 1/14/2002 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Scheduling Combined Hearing to Approve Adequacy of Disclosure Statement and to Confirm Plan of Liquidation by 1550 Liquidation Corp. hearing on 03/11/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 82A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 82
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997, Terminated: 3/21/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION For Reclamation Pursuant To Section 546[c] Of The Bankruptcy Code And For Other Relief by CDW Computer Centers, Inc. hearing on 03/12/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [FN] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8 0A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE [FN] Original NIBS Entry Number: 80
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Order on Motion to Receive Notice or Add to Service List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER to Receive Notices and/or Added to Service List Grotech's counsel: Catherine Steege and Jenner & Block, One IBM Plaza, Chicago, Illinois 60611 RE: Item# 128 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 79
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997, Terminated: 3/17/1997 Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Authority to reject certain executory contracts and unexpired leases by 1550 Liquidation Corporation hearing on 03/11/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 78A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 78
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Authorizing the employment of K&E as attorneys for the debtor effective as of entry of the order for relief is approved. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 29 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 81
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997, Terminated: 3/4/1997 Motion to Receive Notice or Add to Service List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Receive Notices and/or Added to Service List - by Grotech Partners IV, LP., and Grotech Capital Group hearing on 03/03/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [WE] Original NIBS Entry Number: 76A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [WE] Original NIBS Entry Number: 76
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Financial Affairs [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 77B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULES A - H [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 77A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Summary of Assets and Liabilities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMARY of Schedules [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 77
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - American Recovery Service shall release possession to GE Capital and/or its subsidiary, Customized Auto Credit Services of any automobiles subject to installment contracts purchased by Customized Auto through the bankruptcy sale and Order entered Febru ary 3, 1997; AAFC Liquidation Corp is directed to and shall review all invoices sent from American Recovery Service to AAFC, and to Customized Auto, within seven days from the date of this order and to pay American Recovery Service by bank wire transfer within that time the amounts dude for any and all undisputed invoices up to the amount of $112,605.38 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 109 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 75
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Authorizing debtor [to any extent necessary to deliver collections under pooling and servicing agreement SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 114 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 74
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Authorizing to execute and enter into Lease and Employment Agreement attached to the Motion as Exhibits B and C respectively. RE: Item# 112 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 120 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 72
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 114 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 71
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 112 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 70
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL Affidavit of James A Stempel in support of debtor's application to retain Kirkland & Ellis as counsel to the debtor by James A Stempel [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 69A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 69
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - Continued hearing on 02/19/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 112 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 68
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - Continued hearing on 02/19/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 114 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 67
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Order on Motion to Receive Notice or Add to Service List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to Receive Notices and/or Added to Service List Adams Family Trusts c/o Michael Yetnikoff, Esq. Lord, Bissell & Brook 115 South LaSalle Street Suite 3100 Chicago, IL 60603 RE: Item# 92 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 66
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997, Terminated: 2/21/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of an order authorizing to deliver collections under pooling and servicing agreement by debtor hearing on 02/18/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 64A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 64
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997, Terminated: 2/21/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Enter into a Post-Petition Lease and Employment Agreement by Debtor hearing on 02/18/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 63A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Mailing [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 62C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997, Terminated: 2/27/1997 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend or Grant Relief from the Order Authorizing the Debtor to Sell Assets Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to Section 363 by River City Auto Recovery Inc hearing on 02/26/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [M J] Original NIBS Entry Number: 62B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 62A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 62
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 102 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 61
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER WITHDRAWING [PER MINUTE ORDER] RE: Item# 7 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 65
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Rudnick and Wolfe for the amount of $15,000.00 RE: Item# 90 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 60A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Authorizing that the debtor may employ Rudnick & Wolfe as special counsel to the debtor RE: Item# 90 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 60
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 94 [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 59
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL To Application To Retain Rudnick & Wolfe As Special Counsel to the Debtor by Debtor [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 58A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 58
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion [Amended Routine] RE: Item# 91 [FN] Original NIBS Entry Number: 56
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39 for The Allen W Adams Family Trust and The Sarah K Adams Family Trust by Michael Yetnikoff [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 55
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE for The Allen W Adams Family Trust and The Sarah K Adams Family Trust by Michael Yetnikoff [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 54
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 90 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 53
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 88 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 52
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997, Terminated: 1/14/2002 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Order [Re BK Rule 1007] Extending Time of Debtor to File Schedulesand Statement of Financial Affairs - by Debtor hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [WE] Original NIBS Entry Number: 51A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [WE] Original NIBS Entry Number: 51
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997, Terminated: 2/19/1997 Motion to Receive Notice or Add to Service List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Receive Notices and/or Added to Service List by Adams Family Trust hearing on 02/17/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 50A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of 341 Meeting Notice with Certificate of Mailing/Service FiledNOTICE of 341 Meeting Notice with Certificate of Mailing/Service Filed 02/07/97 [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 57
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997, Terminated: 2/11/1997 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Employ Special Counsel by Debtor hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 49A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Application [DM] Original NIBS Entry Number: 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL Affidavit of James A Stempel in support of debtor's application to retain Kirkland & Ellis as counsel to the debtor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 48A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 23 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5E
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 23 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 16 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3F
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 16 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3E
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 9 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2F
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING Continued hearing on 02/10/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 9 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2E
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 No Notice Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [NO Notice Required] RE: Item# 77 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Omnibus Notice of Filing - re: items 32, 40, 41, and 44 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Walter H Roder II RE: Item# 78 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 44
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39 for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC by John J Voorhees Jr. [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC by John J Voorhees Jr. [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Andrew C Hill RE: Item# 78 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 41
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in support of debtor's emergency motion for an order [1] Granting Authority to Sell Assets Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363 [b] And [f] And To Assume and Assign Executory Contracts Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365 [b] and [f]; [2] Es tablishing Auction Procedures: and [3] Approving Form of Notice [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 List of Creditors (Matrix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LIST of Creditors [Amended No Fee] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 39A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 39
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - The relief requested in the Sale Motion is granted and approved in all respects with respect to the Purchase Agreement. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 47 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 38A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER and Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law [a] Authorizing and Approving - Debtor is authorized and directed to change its name as of the closing pursuant to the terms of the Purchase Agreement to AAFC Liquidation Corp. The clerk of the Bankruptcy Court is authorized to modify the style of these Chapter 11 cases. Accordingly, the Clerk, Debtors, and all other parties in interest are directed to file pleadings in this case using AAFC Liquidation Corp. RE: Item# 47 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LIST of Exhibits by debtor [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 32
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING Continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 47 [X6] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19E
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING Continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 30 [X6] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING Continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 22 [X6] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING Continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 15 [X6] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HEARING Continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 8 [X6] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service re: notice of hearing on [A] Sale of Substantially All of the Assets of Debtor [B] Assumption and Assignment of Substantially All Executory Contracts of Debtor and [C] Opportunity to Bid [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 37
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 47 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Written Demand For Reclamation Pursuant To Section 546[c] Of The Bankruptcy Code by CDW Computer Centers Inc [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 47A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 47
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order on Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPROVING SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 55 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 36
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Authorizing debtor to execute and enter into the Transfer Agreement and Power of Attorney with CACS attached hereto as Exhibits A-1 and A-2 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 52 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 55 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 34
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 52 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTED RE: Item# 47 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 28A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER establishing auction procedures and approving form of notice SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 48 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 28
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39 by Lawrence K. Snider for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 27
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39 by Richard G. Ziegler for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE by Lawrence K. Snider for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE by Richard G. Ziegler for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving Employee Servance Plan by Debtor hearing on 01/30/1997 at 4:30 p.m.[Disposed] [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 21B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION Regarding Request for Emergency Hearing [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 21A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion [MJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For An Order Authorizing Debtor To Enter Into A Post-Petition Contract Outside Of The Ordinary Course Of Business by debtor hearing on 01/30/1997 at 4:30 p.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [FN] Original NIBS Entry Nu mber: 20B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion [FN] Original NIBS Entry Number: 20A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 9011 Certification Regarding Request For Emergency Hearing [FN] Original NIBS Entry Number: 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for an Order Establishing Auction Procedures and Approving Form of Notice by Debtor [EMERGENCY] hearing on 01/30/1997 at 9:30 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an Order Granting Authority to Sell Assets Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363[b] and [f], and to Assume and Assign Executory Contracts Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 365[b] and [f] by Debtor [EMERGENCY] hearing on 01/30/1997 at 9:30 a.m. at 2 19 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 9011 Certification Regarding Request for Emergency Hearing [MC] Original NIBS Entry Number: 19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the debtor may employ Claymore as financial advisor to the debtor. RE: Item# 27 [GR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Order on Motion To Set Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Hearing [continue] hearing on 02/03/1997 at 11:00 a.m. [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 22A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Agreed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREED ORDER [Interim] authorizing use of cash collateral RE: Item# 21 [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continued hearing on 02/05/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 29 [LJ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Authorizing debtor to execute and enter into the Transfer Agreement and Power of Attorney with PBC attached hereto as Exhibit A-1 and A-2. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DISPOSED] RE: Item# 52 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Approving Use of Cash Collateral through January 29, 1997 [Agreed Interim Order] RE: Item# 21 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 29
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 38 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 21 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 02/03/1997 at 11:00 a.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 02/03/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 21 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING Continued hearing on 02/03/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 14 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING Continued hearing on 02/03/1997 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 7 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continuedMINUTE ORDER - [Emergency] hearing on 01/28/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 38 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 15
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 9011 Certification Regarding Request For Emergency Hearing [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for an order authorizing debtor to enter into a post-petition contract outside of the ordinary course of busines by debtor [Emergency] [Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 13A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continued hearing on 01/28/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 21 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continued hearing on 01/28/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 7 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - entered and continued re: motion to vacate the automatic stay to implement termination of servicing contract under Tri-Party Custodial Agreement for Contracts hearing on 01/28/1997 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 14 [LH] Original NI BS Entry Number: 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM In Support of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Capital LLC's Motion To Vacate Automatic stay to Implement Termination of Servicing Contract Under Tri-Party Custodial Agreement For Contracts [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 9A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [CR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 9
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997, Terminated: 3/7/1997 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Retain Kirkland & Ellis as Counsel to the Debtor by Debtor hearing on 01/29/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 7A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Application [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997, Terminated: 1/31/1997 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Retain Claymore Partners Ltd. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor by Debtor hearing on 01/29/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 6A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Application [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 6
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral On Interim Basis [Emergency] by Debtor/DIP hearing on 01/27/1997 at 2:30 p.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DS] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion [DS] Original NIBS Entry Number: 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997, Terminated: 1/14/2002 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION hearing on 01/27/1997 at 2:30 p.m. [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE [Emergency] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997, Terminated: 2/18/1997 Motion to Set
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Set Hearing on CFSB'S Motion to Vacate the Automatic Stay to Implement Termination of Servicing Contract under Tri-Party Custodial Agreement for Contracts by Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Captial LLC hearing on 01/27/1997 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE [Emergency] [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Mailing Re: General Order Pertaining to Procedures for Counting Chapter 11 Confirmation Ballots and Order regarding Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Requirements [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INTAKE Checklist [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 1C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT Prescribed by General Rule 39 [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 1B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Form 104/204)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LIST of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims [LH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 1A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Voluntary Petition-Chapter 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    VOLUNTARY petition under chapter 11 [LH]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?