Sehwail v. Wray
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00158

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 5:04 AM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hashem Nader Sehwail, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR - Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Omar Mustafa Saleh +1 813 514 1414 +1 813 987 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gadeir I. Abbas +1 202 742 6410 +1 202 488 0833 gabbas@cair.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thania Diaz Clevenger +1 813 514 1414 tclevenger@cair.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com
v.
No Logo Charles H. Cable, IV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
No Logo Christopher A. Wray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
No Logo David P Pekoske, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin K. McAleenan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
No Logo Russel Travers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None District transfer out
TRANSFER to the Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division. Clerk's office in Alexandria notified by phone that case is being transferred and that there is a Motion for TRO that needs an expedited ruling. (AET) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDERED: 15 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause, construed as a motion to transfer venue, is GRANTED. With the consent of the parties, this case is transferred to the Alexandria Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia for all future proceedings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/7/2018. (MHM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Response to order to show cause
      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 14 Order to show cause filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
        ORDER directing Plaintiff to show cause by a written response filed by Noon on February 8, 2018, why this case should not be transferred. Defendants shall respond by Noon on February 9, 2018. Second Amended Complaint due by Noon on February 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/7/2018. (JW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/7/2018. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop (JW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Motion for temporary restraining order
            AMENDED MOTION for temporary restraining order by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar) Modified on 2/7/2018 to edit text (RH).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 appendix
              APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibits 4 -10 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10)(Saleh, Omar)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 appendix
                APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 pgs 31-60)(Saleh, Omar)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 appendix
                  APPENDIX re 8 Amended Complaint Exhibits 1 - 2 by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 pgs 37-83, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Saleh, Omar)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail.(Saleh, Omar)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE of Special Appearance by Dena Michal Roth on behalf of Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray (Roth, Dena)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                        MOTION for Lena Masri to appear pro hac vice by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Saleh, Omar) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                          MOTION for Gadeir Abbas to appear pro hac vice by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Saleh, Omar) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This matter is set for a TELEPHONIC HEARING on the 1 Complaint on Wednesday, February 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/5/2018. (MHM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Motion for temporary restraining order
                              Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Saleh, Omar)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Related case order and track 2 notice
                                NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report Form, # 2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against Charles H. Cable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P Pekoske, Russel Travers, Christopher A. Wray with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX 026555) filed by Hashem Nader Sehwail. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2018: # 2 Exhibit 1 PART 1, # 3 Exhibit 1 PART 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 PART 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 PART 2, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5) (RH). (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lena F. Masri, appearing on behalf of Hashem Nader Sehwail (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX026735.) Related document: 6 MOTION for Lena Masri to appear pro hac vice. Modified on 2/23/2018-Refund being processed (AFC).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
                                        ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Gadeir Abbas, appearing on behalf of Hashem Nader Sehwail (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX026736.) Related document: 5 MOTION for Gadeir Abbas to appear pro hac vice. Modified on 2/23/2018-Refund being processed (AFC).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?