Toni Glock v. TitleMax of California, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00213

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2019 at 7:27 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Disclosure
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re Stipulation for Protective Order 18 . (iva)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?