Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.27 Acres, More or Less, in Halifax County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0401654 Identified in Book 958, Page 174 of the Halifax County Public Registry
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 3, 2019 at 10:34 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 717
Nature of Suit Condemnation
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Withdrawal of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/1/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum In Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum In Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Appendix to the Statement of Facts
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Discovery Plan
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Order for Discovery Plan
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying 5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying as moot 14 Motion for Hearing. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/16/2018. (Stouch, L.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appendix to the Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?