ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD v. ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01397

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2020 at 9:12 AM EDT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone Conroy LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBEKAH R. CONROY +1 973 400 4181 +1 973 498 0070 rconroy@stoneconroy.com
No Logo ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HILL WALLACK, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Ira Abraham +1 609 734 6358 eabraham@hillwallack.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO +1 609 734 6395 cls@hillwallack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL BRIAN SUDENTAS +1 347 891 3693 psudentas@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LOCKEW LORD LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Wayda +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 awayda@lockelord.com
No Logo Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. BATON +1 973 286 6700 wbaton@saul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA +1 973 286 6700 clizza@saul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH ANN SULLIVAN +1 973 286 6700 ssullivan@saul.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit -
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Judgment - consent
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Application/Petition
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Statement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension, until 6/28/2018, to submit a proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/13/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                    Letter from Plaintiff to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER ORDER amending the 31 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/31/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension until 6/12/2018 to submit a proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/31/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                          Letter from Plaintiff to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/27/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff is to initiate the call. An In-Person Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. A client representative with full settlement authority is to be immediately available by telephone. Any motion to amend the pleading or join new parties is due 7/2/2018, returnable 8/6/2018. Fact Discovery due by 8/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2020, returnable 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/23/2018. (mps) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER ORDER granting request for a two-week extension, until 5/29/2018, to submit a proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/23/2018. (mps) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Ronald M. Daignault, Esq. and Richard Juang, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/22/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (CONROY, REBEKAH)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Letter
                                                                                                                                        Letter from Actelion to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Alison Mulry for by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of C. Lizza, # 2 Certification of A. Mulry, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Gaertner, James T. Peterka, Wasim K. Bleibel, and Christopher J. Cassella for by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification P. Sudentas, # 2 Certification M. Gaertner, # 3 Certification J. Peterka, # 4 Certification W. Bleibel, # 5 Certification C. Cassella, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bruce M. Wexler, Preston K. Ratliff II, Yousef M. Mian, Simon F. Kung, Maria C. Nunez, and Mark R. Sperling for by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of C. Lizza, # 2 Certification of B. Wexler, # 3 Certification of P. Ratliff II, # 4 Certification of Y. Mian, # 5 Certification of S. Kung, # 6 Certification of M. Nunez, # 7 Certification of M. Sperling, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA LYNN WAYDA on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. (WAYDA, ANDREA)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. identifying Cadila Healthcare Limited as Corporate Parent.. (SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..(SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Actelion to the Hon. Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER that Zydus shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 3/19/2018, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/13/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2018 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/26/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (CONROY, REBEKAH)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc... (SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Clerk's Order) by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL BRIAN SUDENTAS on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. (SUDENTAS, PAUL)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (BATON, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        AO120 Patent Form filed. (jem)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. identifying Johnson & Johnson as a Corporate Parent. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8444620), filed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?