IN RE BITCONNECT SECURITIES LITIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:18-cv-80086

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 31, 2020 at 4:39 PM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Akiva Katz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Albert Parks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Aric Harold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo BitConnect Investor Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
No Logo Charles Wildes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Craig Grant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Sarah Michelle Block +1 202 833 8855 smb@wmlaborlaw.com
No Logo Faramarz Shemirani, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Francisco Doria, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo James Gurry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Justin Perry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com
No Logo Ronald Nelson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Anthony Duffy +1 312 861 8000 +1 312 861 2899 michael.duffy@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth A. Sloan +1 302 252 4465 sloane@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victoria A. Guilfoyle +1 302 425 6404 +1 302 425 6464 guilfoyle@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BRANCH LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Turner Williamson Branch +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3534 psanchez@branchlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , C. Malcolm Cochran, IV +1 302 658 6541 +1 302 651 7701 cochran@rlf.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Zachary I. Shapiro +1 302 651 7700 +1 302 651 7701 shapiro@rlf.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory V. Varallo +1 302 651 7772 +1 302 498 7772 varallo@rlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by silvermillerlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jason Stuart Miller +1 954 516 6000 JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NO David Chad Silver +1 954 516 6000 DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Branch Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Turner W. Branch +1 505 243 3501 +2433 243 243 3534
v.
No Logo BitConnect International PLC, Defendant
No Logo BitConnect Ltd., Defendant
No Logo BitConnect Trading Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Glenn Arcaro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carol Celeiro Lumpkin +1 305 539 3300 +1 305 358 7095 carol.lumpkin@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Desiree F. Moore +1 312 807 4417 +1 312 827 1261 desiree.moore@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicole Claire Mueller +1 312 372 1121 nicole.mueller@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Carl E. Volz +1 312 372 1121 carl.volz@klgates.com
No Logo John Doe No. 1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gadeir I. Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 720 251 0425 gadeir.abbas@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tedrick Knightshead +1 225 389 8730 +1 225 389 8736 knightsheadlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bredhoff & Kaiser PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeremiah A. Collins +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 jcollins@bredhoff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR Michigan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lena F Masri +1 248 390 9784 +1 248 559 2250 lmasri@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
, , , Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
, , , David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by EBRP Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Frank J. Gremillion +1 225 389 8730 + 225 389 8736 fgremillion@brgov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew G. McAndrews

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Matthew G. McAndrews

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Patricia McConnell +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 pmcconnell@msek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas +1 720 251 0425 +1 202 204 0253 gadeir@abbaslawfirm.com
No Logo John Doe Nos. 2-10, Defendant
No Logo Joshua Jeppesen, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Hildreth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Hildreth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Hildreth
No Logo Ryan Maasen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stumphauzer & Sloman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kiran Narayan Bhat +1 305 371 9686 +1 305 371 9687 kbhat@sslawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan K. Stumphauzer +1 305 371 9686 +1 305 371 9687 rstumphauzer@sslawyers.com
No Logo Trevon Brown, Defendant
No Logo Youtube, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Kline, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eggnatz Pascucci, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Harris Eggnatz +1 954 889 3359 +1 954 889 5913 JEggnatz@JusticeEarned.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael James Pascucci +1 954 889 3359 +1 954 889 5913 MPascucci@JusticeEarned.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Klein +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 mklein@ssbny.com
No Logo Baltazar Avalos, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Komlossy Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY raa@komlossylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Emily C. Komlossy +1 954 842 2021 +1 954 416 6223 eck@komlossylaw.com
No Logo Charles Mabra, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eggnatz Pascucci, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Harris Eggnatz +1 954 889 3359 +1 954 889 5913 JEggnatz@JusticeEarned.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Klein +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 mklein@ssbny.com
No Logo Dusty Showers, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eggnatz Pascucci, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Harris Eggnatz +1 954 889 3359 +1 954 889 5913 JEggnatz@JusticeEarned.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Klein +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 mklein@ssbny.com
No Logo Kiandra Love, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abbott Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven William Teppler +1 941 487 0050 +1 941 870 4403 steppler@abbottlawpa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John A. Yanchunis +1 813 223 5505 +1 813 223 5402 jyanchunis@forthepeople.com
No Logo Lena Huna, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eggnatz Pascucci, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Harris Eggnatz +1 954 889 3359 +1 954 889 5913 JEggnatz@JusticeEarned.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Klein +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 mklein@ssbny.com
No Logo Paul Long, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abbott Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven William Teppler +1 941 487 0050 +1 941 870 4403 steppler@abbottlawpa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Ward PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jasper Dudley Ward, IV +1 502 882 6000 +1 502 587 2007 jasper@jonesward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John A. Yanchunis +1 813 223 5505 +1 813 223 5402 jyanchunis@forthepeople.com
No Logo Bitconnect, Consol Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-20, Consol Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Trovato, Consol Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0077
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Appealability
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Order Striking
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry Non-Entry of Default
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Motion for Clerks Entry of Default
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to YouTube, LLC. (ls) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to be served upon YouTube, LLC by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Third AMENDED COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani.(Silver, David) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document; granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Re: 5 Amended Complaint, 19 Amended Complaint filed by Ronald Nelson, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Francisco Doria, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Plaintiffs Operative Complaint due 7/3/2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/21/2018. (ls) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Approving Stipulation/Consolidating Cases for Appointing Lead Plaintiff, Approving Co-Lead Counsel and Creation of Executive Committee. The Securities class actions, 9:18-cv-80086-DMM; 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case numbers 9:18-cv-80319DMM; 98:18-cv-21118-DMMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM are closed. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 1:18-cv-21118-DMM, 9:18-cv-80319-DMM, 9:18-cv-80512-DMM (kpe) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 5 Amended Complaint, by Glenn Arcaro. Attorney Carol Celeiro Lumpkin added to party Glenn Arcaro(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lumpkin, Carol)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kiran Narayan Bhat on behalf of Ryan Maasen. Attorney Kiran Narayan Bhat added to party Ryan Maasen(pty:dft). (Bhat, Kiran) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Ryan Hildreth. (fjn) (Defendant's Address Updated) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Trevon Brown served on 4/12/2018, answer due 4/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service of Process upon Trevon Brown a/k/a Trevon James)(Silver, David) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. (Silver, David) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Striking
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Striking 37 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Ronald Nelson, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Francisco Doria, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Silver, David) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller filed by Ryan Maasen. Replies due by 5/4/2018. (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re 35 Notice of Striking. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Glenn Arcaro waiver sent on 4/13/2018, answer due 6/12/2018. (Silver, David) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service of Process upon Ryan Hildreth)(Silver, David) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Striking
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Striking 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Silver, David) Modified Link on 4/26/2018 (ls). (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re 33 Summons Returned Executed,. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 19 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Ryan Hildreth served on 4/13/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. (Silver, David) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT signed by : David C. Silver. re 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller by Faramarz Shemirani, Charles Wildes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Silver, David) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 4/27/2018), MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff the BitConnect Investor Group (Albert Parks and Faramarz Shemirani) ( Responses due by 4/27/2018), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and Silver Miller by Albert Parks, Faramarz Shemirani. Attorney David Chad Silver added to party Albert Parks(pty:mov), Attorney David Chad Silver added to party Faramarz Shemirani(pty:mov). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed jointly by Plaintiffs and by Ryan Maasen (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report, ( Status Report due by 4/13/2018.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/4/2018. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 19 Second Amended Complaint filed by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Silver, David) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 21 MOTION for Leave to Serve Process Electronically, denying 23 Motion for Leave to Serve Process by International Mail or FedEx and by Electronic Means on the BitConnect Corporate Defendants. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/16/2018. (ls) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER. Defendants move for an extension of time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint and represent that Plaintiffs oppose the Motion (DE 24 ). Accordingly, Plaintiffs must file a response to the Motion by March 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/19/2018. (kal) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Ryan Maasen (Stumphauzer, Ryan) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 19 Second Amended Complaint by Ryan Maasen. Attorney Ryan K. Stumphauzer added to party Ryan Maasen(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Paige Lawsuit Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Long Lawsuit Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Kline Lawsuit Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Avalos Lawsuit Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Argiro Lawsuit Complaint)(Stumphauzer, Ryan) Modified Link on 3/20/2018 (ls).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve Process by International Mail or FedEx and by Electronic Means on the BitConnect Corporate Defendants by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Silver, David)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 5 Amended Complaint, with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry. Ryan Maasen served on 2/4/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. (Silver, David) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve Process Electronically by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Silver, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Alias Summons Issued as to John Doe No. 1. (ls) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Akiva Katz, James Gurry.(Silver, David) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint must be separately filed by March 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/23/2018. (kal) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Continuing Trial, ( Calendar Call reset for 2/13/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial reset for 2/19/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/22/2018. (ls) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks: Scheduling Conference held on 2/22/2018. Attorney Appearance(s): David Chad Silver, Esq. and Jason Stuart Miller, Esq. Order to follow. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gm1) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed - Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Silver, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Silver, David) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/8/2018. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes. Responses due by 2/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Alias Summons Issued as to John Doe No. 1. (ls) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Francisco Doria, James Gurry, Akiva Katz, Ronald Nelson, Justin Perry, Charles Wildes (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Silver, David) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Trial Date and Scheduling Conference, ( Calendar Call set for 9/12/2018 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 9/17/2018 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2018 01:45 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/1/2018. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Ryan Maasen. (ls) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Defendant's Address is Not Listed on Summons. (ls) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Francisco Doria, Charles Wildes, Ronald Nelson, Akiva Katz, James Gurry, Justin Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) Jeppesen, # 2 Summon(s) Maasen, # 3 Certification Akiva Katz)(Silver, David) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Aric Harold (Silver, David) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Glenn Arcaro, BitConnect International PLC, BitConnect Ltd., BitConnect Trading Ltd., Trevon Brown, John Doe No. 1, Craig Grant, Ryan Hildreth. (lrz1) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lrz1) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10354620, filed by Ronald Nelson, Aric Harold, Francisco Doria, Akiva Katz, Charles Wildes, James Gurry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) BitConnect International PLC, # 3 Summon(s) BitConnect Ltd., # 4 Summon(s) BitConnect Trading Ltd., # 5 Summon(s) Glenn Arcaro, # 6 Summon(s) Trevon Brown a/k/a Trevon James, # 7 Summon(s) Ryan Hildreth, # 8 Summon(s) Craig Grant, # 9 Summon(s) John Doe No. 1 a/k/a CryptoNick, # 10 Certification Charles Wildes, # 11 Certification Francisco Doria, # 12 Certification Aric Harold, # 13 Certification James Gurry, # 14 Certification Ronald Nelson)(Silver, David) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?