Enterprise Property Management Inc. v. Jennie Pineda
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00859

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 1:16 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, Case Number 17PDUD01480, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?