PILKIN v. SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02501

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2021 at 5:41 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VITALY EVGENIEVICH PILKIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 14/1 Yasny Proezd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VITALY EVGENIEVICH PILKIN
No Logo VLADIMIR VITALYEVICH MIROSHNICHENKO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 84, 3 Pochtovoe Otdelenie Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VLADIMIR VITALYEVICH MIROSHNICHENKO
v.
No Logo HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rhonda Lisa Campbell +1 202 514 9519 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 04/17/2018 Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANTHONY ST. JOSEPH +1 215 861 8267 anthony.stjoseph@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Kate Bailey +1 202 514 9239 kate.bailey@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES H. PERCIVAL, II +1 202 616 1589 +1 202 514 0238 james.percival@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Stephen Michael Pezzi +1 202 305 8576 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.pezzi@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Rachael Lynn Westmoreland +1 202 514 1280 +1 202 616 8460 rachael.westmoreland@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 887 4107 +1 202 887 4288 cwolverton@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Sherri Lee Berthrong +1 202 514 6948 +1 202 514 8784 sherri.berthrong@usdoj.gov
Space Alesia N. Black +1 202 616 3285 +1 202 514 8780 alesia.black@usdoj.gov
, Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
, , , Timothy E. Broomhead +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 timothy.broomhead@usdoj.gov
, , , Rhonda Lisa Campbell +1 202 514 9519 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov
Space Nina Bafundo Crimm +1 202 616 3285 +1 202 514 8780 nina.crimm@usdoj.gov
Space Rhonda C. Fields +1 202 514 6970 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.fields@usdoj.gov
, , Tricia Dianne Francis +1 202 616 2257 +1 202 514 8780 tricia.Francis@usdoj.gov
, Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Blake Harwood +1 202 307 0372 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.harwood@usdoj.gov
, Melanie Dyani Hendry +1 202 252 2510 +1 202 252 2599 melanie.hendry2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Tammy Allison Holloway +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 252 2599 tammy.holloway2@usdoj.gov
, Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
, , , Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jenny Marie Knopinski +1 202 616 3285 +1 202 514 8780 jenny.knopinski@usdoj.gov
, Kevin Michael Laden +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 514 8780 kladen@usa.doj.gov
, , , Jennifer Joy Lee +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jennifer.lee@usdoj.gov
, Peter Rolf Maier +1 202 514 7185 +1 202 514 8780 peter.maier2@usdoj.gov
, , , William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov
, , Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
, , Laura R. Ponto +1 202 307 6242 +1 202 514 8780 laura.ponto@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov
, , Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
Space David Cotter Rybicki +1 202 353 4024 david.rybicki@usdoj.gov
, April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
, Bernard Snell +1 478 621 2732 +1 478 621 2737 bernard.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Johnny Hillary Walker, III +1 202 252 2575 +1 202 252 2599 johnny.walker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Claire M. Whitaker +1 202 514 7137 +1 202 514 8780 claire.whitaker@usdoj.gov
Space Tyler James Wood +1 202 616 2257 tyler.wood@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Eric Joseph Young +1 202 252 2530 +1 202 252 2599 eric.young2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Rafique Omar Anderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rafique Omar Anderson

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert N. Englund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert N. Englund

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lisa Sheri Goldfluss +1 202 514 7198 +1 202 514 8780 Lisa.Goldfluss@usdoj.gov
Space Karen L. Goodwin +1 413 785 0269 +1 413 785 0394 karen.goodwin@usdoj.gov
, George B. Henderson, III +1 617 748 3272 +1 617 748 3971 george.henderson2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Michael P. Sady +1 617 748 3362 +1 617 748 3971 michael.sady@usdoj.gov
, , , Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , Diane M. Sullivan +1 202 514 7205 +1 202 514 8780 diane.sullivan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christy C. Wiegand +1 412 894 7452 christy.wiegand@usdoj.gov
Space Daria J. Zane +1 202 307 0372 +1 202 514 8780 daria.zane@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/04/2015, TERMINATED: 12/04/2015 Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/23/2018, TERMINATED: 03/23/2018 Jason T. Cohen +1 202 305 0207 +1 202 305 0275 jason.cohen@usdoj.gov
, , , Heather D. Graham-Oliver +1 202 305 1334 +1 202 514 8180 heather.graham-oliver@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Javier M. Guzman +1 202 616 1761 +1 202 514 8780 javier.guzman2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
, , , Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
, , , Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
, Jeremy S. Simon +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 jeremy.simon@usdoj.gov
, Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Space Stratton Christopher Strand +1 202 514 7094 +1 202 514 8780 stratton.strand@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Shuchi Batra +1 202 252 2571 +1 202 514 8780 shuchi.batra@usdoj.gov
, , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/27/2018, TERMINATED: 02/27/2018 Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Britney Berry +1 202 252 2545 +1 202 252 2599 britney.berry@usdoj.gov
, Rupa Bhattacharyya +1 202 514 3146 +1 202 318 7593 rupa.bhattacharyya@usdoj.gov
, , , Hector G. Bladuell +1 202 616 2706 +1 202 616 2547 hector.bladuell2@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
, SHARON I BRETT +1 202 353 1091 sharon.brett@usdoj.gov
, , , Aimee Woodward Brown +1 202 305 0845 +1 202 616 8470 aimee.w.brown@usdoj.gov
, , , , Stephen J. Buckingham +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.buckingham@usdoj.gov
, Bradley Heath Cohen +1 202 305 9855 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.cohen@usdoj.gov
Space Jacqueline E. Coleman Snead +1 202 514 3418 +1 202 616 8470 jacqueline.snead@usdoj.gov
, , , Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Daniel Kadane Crane-Hirsch +1 202 616 8242 +1 202 514 8742 daniel.crane-hirsch@usdoj.gov
, Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
, , , Vikas K. Desai +1 202 514 3492 +1 202 616 8470 vikas.desai@usdoj.gov
Space BRIAN G. DONOHUE +1 202 514 5413 +1 202 616 2427 brian.donohue@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph C Dugan +1 202 514 3259 joseph.dugan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kieran Gavin Gostin +1 202 353 4556 +1 202 616 8460 kieran.g.gostin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jeremiah Goulka +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 jeremiah.goulka@usdoj.gov
, Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sobia Haque +1 202 305 9927 +1 202 514 8780 sobia.haque2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Michael James +1 919 856 4530 Mike.James@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Gerald Cooper Kell +1 202 514 1586 +1 202 514 8742 gerald.kell@usdoj.gov
, Jennie Leah Kneedler +1 202 305 8662 +1 202 616 8150 Jennie.L.Kneedler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , James C. Luh +1 202 514 4938 james.luh@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Joseph Martineau +1 202 307 6483 +1 202 514 6866 michael.j.martineau@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jonathan S. Needle +1 202 305 0037 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.needle@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
, , , , Joshua Z. Rabinovitz +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8202 joshua.rabinovitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
, , , Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Adam Christopher Siple +1 202 305 7664 +1 202 616 8460 adam.c.siple@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Claude Sprung +1 202 305 4042 peter.sprung@usdoj.gov
, Andrew H. Tannenbaum +1 202 616 8202 +1 202 616 8202 andrew.tannenbaum@usdoj.gov
, TYLER MATTHEW TARRANT +1 202 514 3483 +1 202 616 2427 tyler.tarrant@usdoj.gov
, , , , , John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Susan K. Ullman +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8202 susan.ullman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Carlotta Poter Wells +1 202 514 4522 +1 202 616 8470 carlotta.wells@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jonathan Eli Zimmerman +1 202 353 0441 +1 202 318 7610 jonathan.zimmerman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sony Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by BAKER BOTTS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Scheinfeld +1 212 408 2500 +1 212 408 2501

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory S. Gewirtz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory S. Gewirtz

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Paul F. Brinkman +1 202 538 8102 +1 202 538 8100 paulbrinkman@quinnemanuel.com
, Jeffrey S Gerchick +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 jeffgerchick@quinnemanuel.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(3) - FEDEX
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Suggestion of Death
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED against the United States Department of Justice and United States Attorney General Jefferson Sessions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/4/2018. (lcrdm1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/13/2017. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?