Carpenter v. Mercer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04024

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 11:50 PM EST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jermaine D Carpenter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RUSHVILLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jermaine D Carpenter +1 217 322 3204
v.
No Logo Abdi Tinwalla, Defendant
No Logo Brian Maze, Defendant
No Logo Dawn Mercer, Defendant
No Logo Gregg Scott, Defendant
No Logo Jetwani, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Michael Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Rao, Defendant
No Logo Richard Logan, Defendant
No Logo Spencer, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 560 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Writ Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
      +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jermaine D Carpenter (JMB, ilcd)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
        Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting trust fund ledgers. (JMB, ilcd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jermaine D Carpenter. Responses due by 2/20/2018 (JMB, ilcd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 2/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(JMB, ilcd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jermaine D Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 scanning page)(JMB, ilcd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/9/2018. This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee).Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Jermaine Carpenter is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed.(JMB, ilcd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?