United States v. Lapso
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00301

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 24, 2019 at 3:40 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Martin Shapiro +1 202 307 5839 +1 202 514 5238 alan.m.shapiro@usdoj.gov
Space Alan Martin Shapiro +1 202 307 5839 +1 202 514 5238 alan.m.shapiro@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Annette M. Ressetar, Defendant
No Logo Ashtabula County Treasurer, Defendant
No Logo Dennis J. Lapso, Defendant
No Logo Farm Credit Services of Mid-America, Defendant
No Logo Peoples Savings Bank, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to attend by telephone
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Deadlines
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Deed for N. Bend Road Property, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Deed for Ninevah Road Property, # 3 Exhibit 3 - IRS Account and TaxMod Transcripts for 2002, # 4 Exhibit 4 - IRS Account and TaxMod Transcripts for 2005, # 5 Exhibit 5 - IRS Account and TaxMod Transcripts for 2006, # 6 Exhibit 6 - IRS Account and TaxMod Transcripts for 2012, # 7 Exhibit 7 - IRS INTST Transcripts for 2002, 2005, 2006, and 2012, # 8 IRS Notices of Federal Tax Lien, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons for Dennis J. Lapso, # 11 Summons for Annette M. Ressetar, # 12 Summons for Ashtabula County Treasurer, # 13 Summons for Peoples Savings Bank, # 14 Summons for Farm Credit Services of Mid-America) (Shapiro, Alan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (S,SR)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?