Spencer v. Parra
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00052

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 1:35 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/19/2018. Copy sent to Kevin Spencer via US Mail to 3721 Marshlane Way, Raleigh, NC 27610. (Stouch, L.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Rule 12 Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice-Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice-Other
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice-Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?