USA v. Gelegan, et al
Criminal Case California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00144-WBS

Tags
Last Updated February 12, 2018 at 12:33 AM ST (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kymberly Ann Smith +1 916 554 2771 +1 916 554 2900

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Lynn Ferris +1 916 554 2932 +1 916 554 2900 laura.ferris@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Shawn Gelegan (1)
Office Sacramento
Filed 3/27/2003
County Placer
Terminated 9/13/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846=CD.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE AND POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE ANALOGUE TO GHB
Count 10
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 856=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21856=CD.F MAINTAINING A PLACE FOR DISTRIBUTION OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE ANALOGUE TO GHB
Count 11-12
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 331A.F
Offense Level 4
21331A.F MISBRANDING DRUGS
Count 13
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=CD.F DISTRIBUTION OF METHYLENEDIOXYMETHANPHETAMINE
Count 14-15
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 844A=CP.F
Offense Level 4
21844A=CP.F POSSESSION OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
Count 16
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 853.F
Offense Level 4
21853.F CRIMINAL FORFEITURE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 331A.F
Offense Level 4
21331A.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE A MISBRANDED DRUG
Count 3-5
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=CD.F DISTRIBUTION OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE ANALOGUE TO GHB
Count 6-8
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=CD.F DISTRIBUTION OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE ANALOGUE TO GHB
Count 9
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=CP.F
Offense Level 4
21841B=CP.F POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE ANALOGUE TO GHB
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (156) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Petition for Violation of Prob/Supervised Release - Prb 12Court Filing
PROBATION FORM 12 as to Shawn Gelegan signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/30/10; The Court approves Probation Officer's plan, and orders no further action be taken at this time. (Becknal, R)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order - CRCourt Filing
    ORDER as to Carol Roth signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/13/08 ORDERING that Carol Roths supervised release is ordered terminated. (Dillon, M)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
      AMENDED [141] Motion to Terminate Supervision by Carol Roth. (Harter, Linda) Modified on 6/16/2008 (Yin, K).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
        MOTION to Terminate Supervision by Carol Roth. (Harter, Linda) Modified on 6/9/2008 (Matson, R).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CRCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [138] Motion for an order terminating her supervised release as to Carol Roth (2) signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/26/07. (Kaminski, H)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Opposition to Motion
            RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to [138] Motion to Terminate Supervised Release by USA as to Carol Roth. Attorney Laura Lynn Ferris added. (Ferris, Laura) Modified on 7/26/2007 (Yin, K).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007, Terminated: 7/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
                JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT as to Shawn Gelegan signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/26/06. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 sentencingCourt Filing
                  MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb:SENTENCING held on 9/13/2006 for Shawn Gelegan (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Imprisonment: 36 Months on count 1, 36 Months on count 2, concurrent for a total of 36 Months. Surrender date 1/13/07 at 2:00 pm. TSR 36 Months on count 1, 12 Months on count 2, concurrent for a total of 36 Months. S/A $200.00; Right to appeal given and waived. Special Conditions given, see J & C. The USA's Motion for downward departure is returned to the USA and will not be sealed with the Court. The defendant requests that the Court follows the USA's recommendation. Defendant requests for 500-hour drug program. Defendant requests for a self surrender date of 1/13/07. Dft exercises his right to allocation and addresses the Court. All standard and special conditions are adopted in full. Court orders that Defendant shall turn himself in to the designated BOP or US Marshal on 1/13/07 by 2:00pm. The pending release conditions are in full force and effect. The USA's request to dismiss remaining counts is granted. Court defers the Dft's request for the 500-hour drug program to the BOP. Court recommends Camp at Sheridan, OR or Lompoc, CA. Count(s) 10, 11-12, 13, 14-15, 16, 3-5, 6-8, 9, DISMISSED. DEFENDANT TERMINATED. CASE CLOSED. Government Counsel Kymberly Smith present. Defense Counsel Tim Warriner present. Custody Status: No in custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kelly O'Halloran. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Exhibits
                    EXHIBITS /statement of defendant and letters in support of Shawn Gelegan by Shawn Gelegan. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of defendant# (2) letters in support of Shawn Gelegan)(Warriner, Timothy)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/31/06 ORDERING that the Request to continue hearing date [133] is GRANTED. Judgment and Sentencing is CONTINUED from 8/30/06 to 9/13/2006 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Stipulation and Proposed Order - CR
                        STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing judgment and sentencing to September 13. (Warriner, Timothy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 sentencing memorandum
                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Shawn Gelegan. (Attachments: # (1) character letters)(Warriner, Timothy)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Exhibits
                            EXHIBITS /letters in support of defendant Shawn Gelegan by Shawn Gelegan. (Attachments: # (1) letters in support of Shawn Gelegan)(Warriner, Timothy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Order - CRCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/28/06 ORDERING that the Request to Continue hearing date [129] is GRANTED. Sentencing hearing as to Shawn Gelegan is CONTINUED from 7/5/06 to 8/30/2006 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Stipulation and Proposed Order - CR
                                STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Judgment and Sentencing date. (Warriner, Timothy) Modified on 6/26/2006 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Memorandum - CR
                                  MEMORANDUM by Shawn Gelegan, Shawn Gelegan re continuance of judgment & sentencing date (Warriner, Timothy)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/25/06 ORDERING that the Request to continue judgment and sentencing hearing as to Shawn Gelegan [126] is GRANTED. The Judgment and Sentencing date is CONTINUED to 4/26/2006 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Stipulation and Proposed Order - CR
                                      STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (Warriner, Timothy)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Judgment Returned Executed
                                        JUDGMENT RETURNED EXECUTED as to Carol Roth. Judgment executed on 01/04/06. (Brown, T)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                          ORDER extending self-surrender date as to Carol Roth to January 4, 2006 on or before 2:00 p.m. signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/13/2005. (Hoover, S)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Stipulation and Proposed Order - CR
                                            STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Self Surrender Date (Harter, Linda)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                              ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb as to Shawn Gelegan: Sentencing RESET for 1/25/2006 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Waggoner, D)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
                                                JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT as to Carol Roth signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/16/05. (Carlos, K)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 120 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: GROUPING OF COUNTS signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/14/05 as to Carol Roth. The Court determined that counts 1 and 2 of the indictment are properly gruped pursuant to US Sentencing Guideline 3D1.2. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Stipulation and Proposed Order - CR
                                                    STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (Warriner, Timothy)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb:SENTENCING held on 9/14/2005 for Carol Roth (2), Count(s) 1, 2, Imprisonment: 3 Months as to each of the Counts 1 and 2, to be served concurrently, for a total term of 3 Months. Surrender date: 10/14/05 by 2:00 pm. TSR 36 Months as to Count 1 and 12 Months as to Count 2, to run concurrently, for a total term of 36 Months. Recommendation: Dublin. S/A $200 forthwith. Fine waived. Right to appeal given and waived. Special conditions given. Count(s) 12, 3, 4-5, DISMISSED. DEFENDANT TERMINATED. Government Counsel Kimberly Smith present. Defense Counsel Linda Harter present. Custody Status: on Bail. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kelly O'Halloran. Interpreter none present. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                        NOTICE of Defendant's Supplemental Brief Regarding Grouping and Other Sentencing Issues by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Memorandum - CR
                                                          AMENDED RESPONSE to sentencing memorandum by USA (Smith, Kymberly) Modified on 8/25/2005 (Marcotte, D).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Status Conference - CRCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb :STATUS re: judgment and sentencing as to Carol Roth held on 8/17/2005. Sentencing continued to 9/14/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb to allow counsel to file further briefs. Govt's brief is due 8/24/05; defendant's brief is due 8/31/05.Government Counsel Kymberly Smith present. Defense Counsel Linda Harter present. Custody Status: present and out of custody. Court Reporter: Kelly O'Halloran. (Hoover, S)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Reply/Response - CR
                                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to the Defendant's Sentencing Memorandum by Carol Roth, USA (Smith, Kymberly)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005, Terminated: 9/14/2005 Motion to Continue - CRCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to CONTINUE and to Exclude Testimony at Sentencing Hearing by Carol Roth. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Harter, Linda)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - CR
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re [110] Notice. This pleading bears the incorrect image and incorrect case number and is deemed by the Clerk's office as improperly filed. Please refer to doc [111]. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                    NOTICE (Amended) of hearing changing J&S from July 27, 2005 to August 17, 2005 by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                      NOTICE of hearing changing current J/S date of July 27, 2005 to August 17, 2005 by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 sentencing memorandum
                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER as to Shawn Gelegan Sentencing reset for 7/27/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb, signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 06/17/2005. (Hoover, S)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Initial Appearance of Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTES for proceedings held on 6/14/2005 before Judge Peter A. Nowinski :INITIAL APPEARANCE re REVOCATION of Pretrial Release as to Shawn Gelegan Government Counsel Kymberly Smith present. Defense Counsel Timothy Warriner, CJA present. Custody Status: Out of custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Casey Forester, ECRO. All parties present. The deft was not in custody. The Govt requested the conditions of the deft's Pretrial release be modified. Counsel for the deft had no objections to the modification. The Court discussed the additional conditions with both counsel. The Court ordered the deft returned to Pretrial supervision with the condition that he shall not order drugs of any kind over the internet or other unconvential channel or distribution. If he fails to do so, this will be regarded as a violation of this condition. The Pretrial petition was ordered dismissed. TEXT ONLY. (Cannarozzi, N)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Petition for Violation of Prob/Supervised Release - Prb 12Court Filing
                                                                              PRETRIAL SERVICES VIOLATION PETITION as to Shawn Gelegan signed by Judge Peter A. Nowinski on 06/08/05: Violation Proceedings set for 6/14/2005 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 (PAN) before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Nowinski. (Warren, P)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing changing J/S by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Sealed Document - CR
                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005, Terminated: 9/14/2005 Motion for Downward Departure
                                                                                    MOTION for DOWNWARD DEPARTURE Government's Sentencing Recommendation by USA as to Carol Roth. (Smith, Kymberly)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing Changing J&S date by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Stipulation - CR
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT & SENTENCING (Warriner, Timothy)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                          NOTICE of Continuance of J&S Hearing by USA as to Carol Roth (Smith, Kymberly)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing Changing J&S Date by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER as to Shawn Gelegan Sentencing reset from 3/23/2005 to 4/27/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 03/21/2005. (Hoover, S)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Stipulation - CR
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT AND SENTENCING DATE (Warriner, Timothy)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                                  NOTICE of hearing by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge William B Shubb on 02/03/05 as to Shawn Gelegan [94]. Judgment and Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED from 2/9/05 to 3/23/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Stipulation - CR
                                                                                                      STIPULATION and PROPOSED Order Continuing Judgment and Sentencing as to Shawn Gelegan (Warriner, Timothy) Modified on 2/2/2005 (Forester, C).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Notice - Other - CRATY
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing Continuing J&S by Carol Roth (Harter, Linda)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/4/05. The Judgment and Sentencing as to Shawn Gelegan [91] is CONTINUED from 1/5/05 to 2/9/2005 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Proposed Order - CR
                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by Shawn Gelegan for Continuance of Sentencing date(Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Notice of Change of Address - CR
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dft Shawn Gelegan regarding unsecured appearance bond (lm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                NOTICE of hearing by Carol Roth sentencing hearing RESET for 9:00 1/19/05 for Carol Roth (cc: all counsel) (daw)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING the secured appearance bond presently on file shall be exonerated upon the court's receipt of a satisfactory $100,000 unsecured appearance bond signed by dft Gelegan (cc: all counsel) (kdc)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                    LODGED stip and order re: modification of condition of pretrial release and exoneration of bail by defendant Shawn Gelegan, plaintiff USA (old)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Stipulation - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge William B Shubb ORDERING that the Request to continue the sentencing date is GRANTED; Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED from 12/1/04 to 9:00 1/5/05 for Shawn Gelegan (cc: all counsel) - (lm)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                        LODGED Stipulation and order Re Continuance of Sentencing by Dft Shawn Gelegan, plaintiff USA (lm)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Minute Order - CR
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER issued by CRD: sentencing hearing RESET to 9:00 12/15/04 for Carol Roth (cc: all counsel) (crf) Modified on 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd ORDERING that the terms of dft Shawn Gelegan's pretrial release be modified to permit him to access the nternet and to utilize email; any and all conditions of pretrial release heretofore imposed that restriced or otherwise limited the dft's rights to access the internet and to utilize email are hereby STRICKEN (cc: all counsel) (daw)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                              LODGED Ex-Parte Motion for Modification of Terms of Pretrial Release and Stipulation of Counsel by Dft Shawn Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of hearing by FD Linda Harter for Dft Carol Roth, approved by CRD Judgment and Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED from 10/27/04 to 9:00 11/17/04 for Carol Roth (lm)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of hearing (MEMORANDUM) judgment and sentencing hearing RESET for 9:00 10/27/04 for Carol Roth (sk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Schedule of Disclosure for PSR
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULE FOR DISCLOSURE OF PSR as to Dft Shawn Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 plea agreement
                                                                                                                                      PLEA Agreement as to Shawn Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb RE: Change of Plea; Dft present on bail; Dft withdrew not guilty plea; Guilty plea entered by Shawn Gelegan (1) count(s) 1, 2 of the Indictment ; Judgment and Sentencing hearing SET for 9:00 12/1/04 for Shawn Gelegan ; Dft to remain out on bail pending J & S C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Stipulation - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge William B. Shubb lodged stipulation re excludable time and status conference is GRANTED; status hearing RESET for 9/15/04 for Shawn Gelegan , T4 started for Shawn Gelegan start date: 09/08/04 end date: 09/15/04 (cc: all counsel) - (sk)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                                            LODGED Stipulation to Excludable time by Dft Shawn Gelegan, Pltf USA (lm)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Stipulation - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge William B. Shubb lodged stipulation regarding excludable time is GRANTED T2 and T4 started for Shawn Gelegan start date: 08/04/04 end date: 09/08/04 (cc: all counsel) - (sk)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                                                LODGED Stipulation and Order Re: excludable time (sk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES before Judge William B. Shubb RE: Change of Plea change of plea hearing CONTINUED to 9:00 9/8/04 for Shawn Gelegan ; counsel to submit affidavit and proposed order regarding excludable time C/R Kelly O'Halloran (sk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of hearing by Linda Harter, counsel for Dft Carol Roth, approved by CRD Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED from 9/1/04 to 9:00 10/6/04 for Carol Roth (lm)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of hearing by Michele Horton, US Probation Officer, approved by CRD Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED from 8/11/04 to 9:00 9/1/04 for Carol Roth (lm)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Schedule of Disclosure for PSR
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULE FOR DISCLOSURE OF PSR as to defendant Carol Roth (crf)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 plea agreement
                                                                                                                                                          PLEA Agreement as to Carol Roth (crf)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES before Judge William B. Shubb RE: Change of Plea Hearing guilty plea entered by Carol Roth (2) to count(s) 1 and 2 ; evidentiary hearing set for 6/8/04 VACATED and sentencing hearing SET for 9:00 8/11/04 for Carol Roth ; C/R Kelly O'Halloran (crf)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Stipulation - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge William B. Shubb ORDERING that the stipulation re preplea presentence report for dft Shawn Gelegan GRANTED; hearing set for 6/8/04 VACATED and a status conference SET for 8/4/04 for Shawn Gelegan ; Probation to prepare a full pre-plea presentence report for dft Gelegan on counts one and two of the indictment and to distribute a copy by 8/4/04; Probation NOT to forward a copy to the court; T4 started for Shawn Gelegan start date: 6/2/04 end date: 8/4/04 (cc: all counsel) - (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of hearing (Memo) change of plea hearing SET for 6/2/04 for Carol Roth (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                                                                  LODGED Stip and Order re preplea presentence report by defendant Shawn Gelegan (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES before Judge William B. Shubb RE: change of plea hearing set for 8:30 5/28/04 for Carol Roth C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge William B. Shubb ORDERING that the Government's motion to continue hearing GRANTED; evidentiary hearing CONTINUED to 9:00 6/8/04 for Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth ; E, M and T2 started for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth start date: 3/17/04 end date: 6/8/04 (cc: all counsel) (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                                                                        LODGED Motion to continue evidentiary hearing and for continued exclusion of time by plaintiff USA (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to dismiss counts I, III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XV and XVI of indictment due to vagueness by defendant Shawn Gelegan ; hearing SET for 9:00 3/30/04 (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of hearing (Memo) evidentiary hearing CONTINUED to 9:00 3/30/03 for Carol Roth (crf) Modified on 12/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                              CJA Form 23 (Financial Affidavit) as to Shawn Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                CJA FORM 20 COPY 4 (Appointment of Counsel) apponting Timothy Warriner to represent Dft Shawn Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb Evidentiary hearing on Motion to Dismiss CONTINUED from 12/16/03 to 9:00 3/9/04 for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth ; Dfts' supplemental briefing due 1/16/04; Govt's supplemental opposition due 1/30/04; Any supplemental reply due 2/9/04 Tim Warriner appointed as new counsel for Dft Shawn Gelegan C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb Evidentiary hearing set for 12/16/03 is VACATED and will be reset after new atty is appointed for dft Gelegan, who has requested new counsel; Status Conference is SET for 9:00 12/16/03 for Shawn Gelegan for appointment of new counsel, Federal Defender to be present C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Application/Request - General
                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST by Dft Shawn Gelegan, and Pltf USA to bifurcate hearing on Motion to Dismiss (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Pltf USA to Motion To Dismiss Indictment [57-1], and Motion to Clarify the elements of 21:802 (32) (A)by defendant Carol Roth [55-1] (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Nowinski RE Pltf's Motion for Discovery: Govt counsel informed the court that she had not received discovery requested; Mr Bockman on behalf of both dft's counsel assured court that discovery is immediately forthcoming; Motion for discovery by USA [50-1] HEARING RESET FOR 2:00 PM 10/31/03; ECRO Dona Euler (pw)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by USA confirmed by CRD: Motion for discovery by USA [50-1] HEARING RESET FOR 2:00 PM 10/17/03 (cc: all counsel) (pw)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION To Dismiss counts I, III, IV and V by Dft Carol Roth ; hearing SET for 9:00 12/16/03 before the Honorable William B Shubb (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION To Dismiss Counts by Dft Shawn Gelegan ; hearing SET for 9:00 12/1/03 (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Clarify the elements of 21:802 (32) (A)by defendant Carol Roth hearing SET for 9:00 12/16/03 (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge William B Shubb ORDERING that the following schedule shall replace the current briefing, Motion hearing and evidentiary hearing schedule; Defense Moion due 10/1/03; Govt's reply Motions due 11/19/03; Defense reply motions due 12/3/03; Motions hrg 12/10/03; Evidentiary hearing SET for 12/16/03 for Shawn Gelegan, and Carol Roth ; Exludable T2 started for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth start date: 8/15/03 end date: 10/1/03 (cc: all counsel) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES before Judge William B. Shubb RE: Status Conference; Motions by 10/1/03; opposition by 11/19/03; reply by 12/3/03; Motion hrg 12/10/03; Evidentiary hearing set for 9:00 12/16/03 for Shawn Gelegan, for Carol Roth C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Continue - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION To Continue Evidentiary hearing and for exclusion of time by USA as to Dfts Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Peter A Nowinski: Notice of Motion for Discovery-Change of Hearing date GRANTED; Motion for Discovery by USA [50-1] HEARING RE-SET FOR 2:00 10/3/03 T2, T4 started for dfts Shawn Gelegan & Carol Roth start date: 8/15/03 - end date: 10/3/03 (cc: all counsel) (mm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LODGED Document: Motion to Continue Evidentiary hearing and for exclusion of time lodged on 8/22/03 (NOT TO BE SIGNED PER JUDGE) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LODGED Motion for Discovery by plaintiff USA (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Motion for Discovery - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for discovery by USA as to Shawn Gelegan (pw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LODGED Motion to Continue Evidentiary hearing and for exclusion of time by plaintiff USA (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Memorandum - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Federal Defender Linda Harter regarding motion For Discovery by Dft Shawn Gelegan [24-1] TERMINATED (nac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Application/Request - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST by plaintiff USA for discovery pursuant to Rule 16(b) FR Criminal Procedure for all materials covered by Rule 16(b), (c), (d) and (e) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Notice of Change of Address - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        cc: NOTICE by plaintiff USA regarding Dr. Richard Irwin no longer available for the 11/18/03 hearing; request to reschedule hearing at 9:00 11/25/03 (daw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to joint motion For Discovery by Dft Shawn Gelegan [24-1] (mdk) Modified on 08/08/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb RE: Evidentiary hearing; Motions by 9/3/03; opposition by 10/15/03; reply by 10/29/03; hearing 9:00 11/18/03 C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Notice of Change of Address - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by plaintiff USA of recording of Lis Pendens (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Affidavit /Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Linda C Harter in SUPPORT of Request to Continue the Status Conference to 7/23/03 (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb Further Status Hrg SET for 9:00 7/23/03 for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth ; Excludable T2 started for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth start date: 6/18/03 end date: 7/23/03 C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Notice of Change of Address - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Pretrial services office regarding surrendered passport No 134337220 for Dft Shawn McClain Gelegan (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BOND ($20,000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Artin Sahrai) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BOND ($15,500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Ketti Baker) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BOND ($20,000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Melissa Roth) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BOND ($20,000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Brett Leo) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BOND ($20,000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Joe Gora) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BOND ($500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Elizabeth Danielle Wilt) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BOND ($1000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Erik Peri) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BOND ($500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Jeff Maher) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BOND ($500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Raagini Auten) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BOND ($500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Terri Thompson) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BOND ($500.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Chuck Forman) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BOND ($3000.00/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (Sheryl Villers) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BOND ($100,000/unsecured) by Shawn Gelegan (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER to court from counsel for defendant Shawn Gelegan regarding individuals who are willing to sign a promissory note for Mr Gelegan's appearance (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Notice to Defendant Being Released
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO DEFENDANT being released as to defendant Shawn Gelegan (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for Shawn Gelegan (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Motion for Discovery - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND JOINT MOTION For Discovery by Dft Shawn Gelegan ; Momorandum of points and authorities; Declaration; hearing SET for 2:00 6/17/03 before the Honorable Peter A Nowinski (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES before Chief Judge William B Shubb Further Status hearing SET for 9:00 6/18/03 for Shawn Gelegan, Carol Roth ; Defense counsel filed joint motion for discovery in court C/R Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: Bail Review defense submitted memo with potential sureties for appearance bond; arguments; government continues to request detention; deft ordered released on conditions; deft's release to be secured by $102,000 as indicated and an appearance bond in the amount of $100,000 secured by deft's residence; PTS conditions/supervision: see minute order; passport to be surrendered to Clerk, USDC; no internet service w/out approval; counsel to work with PTS on condition regarding chemical sales; ECRO None (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER to court from counsel for defendant Shawn Gelegan; asking to have defendant present at a bail review hearing set for 04/30/03 at 2:00 (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECEIPT of Passport No 134337220 for defendant Shawn Gelegan by Shawn McClain Gelegan Receipt # 203 4120 (Passport in vault) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: Detention Hearing; defense counsel makes an argument for release; PTS makes an oral report to the Court concerning the defendant's release; the Court states he feels there are some conditions that can be posted in order to insure the safety of the community; the Court will wait for the paperwork to be submitted before releasing the defendant; C/R ECRO Dona Euler (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Chief Judge William B. Shubb GRANTING excludable time; T2 and T4 started for Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth start date: 4/16/03 end date: 5/14/03 (cc: all counsel) (daw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES before Chief Judge William B. Shubb; dfts present and dft Gelegan in custody, dft Roth released on bail; further status hearing SET for 9:00 5/14/03 for Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth ; T4 started for Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth start date: 4/16/03 end date: 5/14/03 ; appearances by Kymberly Smith for govt; Charles Bloodgood and Linda Harter for dft C/R K. O'Halloran (daw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: Status Hearing dft present in custody; government submits amended PTS report and indictment; defense requests continuance; detention hearing CONTINUED to 2:00 4/18/03 for Shawn Gelegan ; C/R ECRO (crf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: detention hearing; PTS report submitted by gov; arguments; Court requests further report from PTS re: possible conditions of release; detention hearing CONTINUED to 2:00 4/16/03 for Shawn Gelegan C/R ECRO (daw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: arraignment defendants Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth arraigned; not guilty pleas entered; Attorney Charles F Bloodgood, Vickie Cody present , detention hearing set on 2:00 4/11/03 for Shawn Gelegan; status hearing set for 9:00 4/16/03 for Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth before the Honorable William B. Shubb ; Jury trial requested; C/R Dona Euler Tape 1/1 (mdp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA Form 23 (Financial Affidavit) as to Carol Roth (ak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of hearing by USA arraignment set for 2:00 4/4/03 for Shawn Gelegan, for Carol Roth (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for Carol Roth (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Notice to Defendant Being Released
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO DEFENDANT being released as to defendant Carol Roth (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNSECURED APPEARANCED BOND ($50,000/unsecured) by Carol Roth (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Judge William B. Shubb regarding excludable time; such request and affidavit shall be prepared in advance and presented in open court at the time the request for the finding of excludable time is made (cc: all counsel) (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds first appearance of Shawn Gelegan and Carol Roth Attorney Jeffrey L Staniels present , status of representation, entry of plea, detendion hearing set for 2:00 4/8/03 for Shawn Gelegan and status of representation and entry of plea hearing set for 2:00 04/08/03 for Carol Roth ; FD specially appearing today for both defendants; defendants request continuance to retain counsel; government requests detention as to Mr Gelegan and submits the matter as to Ms Roth on PTS report; Ms Roth ordered released on terms and conditions as set in PTS report and on $50,000 unsecured bond signed by defendant and her father; C/R tape 1 of 1 (sk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Warrant Returned - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST Warrant returned executed as to defendant Shawn Gelegan defendant arrested on 4/4/03 (old)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Warrant Returned - CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST Warrant returned executed as to defendant Carol Roth defendant arrested on 4/4/03 (old)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows Case shall be SEALED until the dft is arrested or until further order of the court (old)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows request [2-1] GRANTED sealing case (cc: all counsel) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Application/Request - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION by plaintiff USA to seal indictment (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT by US Attorney Kymberly Smith Counts filed against Shawn Gelegan (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, 6-8, 9, 10, 11-12, 13, 14-15, 16 Carol Roth (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, 12 (lm) Modified on 03/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST Warrant issued for Shawn Galegan by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows bail set at No bail (old)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST Warrant issued for Carol Roth by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows bail set at No Bail (old)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?