United States v. Cromar
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01223

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2020 at 6:28 PM DT (6.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan S. Watson +1 202 514 5173 +1 202 307 0054 Ryan.Watson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Barbara Ann Cromar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barbara Ann Cromar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Ann Cromar
No Logo Paul Kenneth Cromar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Kenneth Cromar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Kenneth Cromar
No Logo State of Utah Tax Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Utah Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen W. Lewis +1 801 366 0371 swlewis@agutah.gov
No Logo Universal Campus Federal Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo Utah County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Cort Griffin +1 801 851 8001 cortg@utahcounty.gov
No Logo Utah Housing Finance Agency, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Discovery
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Sealed Document - SEALED
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Writ
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order of Sale
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Order of Sale
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Default
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Case Number 18-4128 for 75 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Paul Kenneth Cromar, Barbara Ann Cromar. (jmr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Certify the Question on Appeal to the U.S. 10th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Defendants' Motion to Certify) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re 75 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory as to Tenth Circuit. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Preliminary Record) (dla) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 63 Order, 74 Order, filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: Not Paid. Filing fee $ 505. (dla) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying 73 Motion to Vacate: The Cromars have filed a "Motion to Vacate the Order of the Court for Lack of a Subject-Matter Jurisdiction." The Motion is denied. As the court has stated numerous times, it is satisfied it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action. And the Cromars' "new evidence documenting the lack of constitutionally required geographical uniformity" does nothing to change that conclusion or warrant reprieve from the entry of default. The Cromars are welcome to pursue any appellate rights they may have if or when those rights vest. But they may not continue to litigate settled questions in this case before this court. To that end, the court finds circumstances warrant the imposition of restrictions on the Cromars' ability to file motions or other documents in this case. "Federal courts have the inherent power to regulate the activities of abusive litigants by imposing carefully tailored restrictions under the appropriate circumstances." Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED as follows:(1) The Cromars are RESTRICTED from filing additional motions or other documents in this case without first obtaining written permission from the Court. (2) Any motions for such leave should bear the title "Motion for Leave to File Motion." Any such motion for leave shall not exceed two (2) pages in length and shall contain, as attachments, each motion the Cromars wish to file. The Motion for Leave to File Motion must state "succinctly the precise relief sought and the specific grounds for the motion" as required by the District of Utah Local Rules. (3) Any response to the Motion for Leave to File Motion must be filed within seven (7) days. (4) The Motion for Leave to File Motion will be considered ten days after it was filed. If leave to file the motion is granted, it may be filed within fourteen days. If the motion for which leave was given is not timely filed it may not be later filed without a new Motion for Leave to File Motion. If there is any variation in form of the motion actually filed from the form attached to the Motion for Leave to File Motion, the variant motion shall be stricken without notice. (5) Any motion filed without first obtaining leave will be summarily denied. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/28/18. (dla)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                          MOTION to Vacate the 69 Order of the Court for Lack of a Subject-Matter Jurisdiction Proven by New Evidence, Documenting the Lack of the Constitutionally Required Geographical Uniformity of the 1986 IRC Section 1- "Tax Imposed", in Violation of the "Uniformity" Clause of Article I, Section 8, Clause 1 of the U.S. Constitution filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (dla) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying 71 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 71 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/3/2018. (jwt)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Set Aside Default
                                                                                MOTION to Set Aside Default, MOTION to Vacate 63 Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar (alt) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to 63 Order granting Motion for Entry of Default, filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar (alt) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying Motion to Dismiss and Entering Default: On 7/12/2018, the court entered default against Defendants Paul Kenneth Cromar and Barbara Ann Cromar for failing to defend against the United States' claims. Following that Order, the Cromars filed two Motions to Void Judgment 64 65, a Motion to Vacate Judgment and Void the Order of the Court 66, and an "Objection to the Order of the Court Granting Default Judgment 67 . " Although the court ordered entry of default against the Cromars, the court docket text erroneously reflected that a default judgment had been entered. The docket text was corrected on 7/17/2018, the same day the Cromars filed their Motions and Objection. It seems clear the Cromars filed their Motions and Objection with a reasonable but mistaken understanding that default judgment had been entered against them. The 64 65 66 Motions are therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/20/18. (dla)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Motions No Longer Referred: 64 MOTION re 63 Default Judgment,,, Order,,, 65 MOTION re 63 Default Judgment,,, Order,. District Judge to handle the Motions. (lnp) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to 63 Order of the Court Granting Default Judgment, After the Defendant Explained to the Court that the Defendants Do Not Understand the Claims Made in the Complaint filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (dla) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Vacate
                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate 63 Judgment and to Void the Order of the Court for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (dla)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            MOTION to Void 63 Judgment for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction Under the 16th Amendment by New Evidence and for Fraud Upon the Court filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              MOTION to Void 63 Judgment for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the District Court to Enforce a Judgment Allegedly Rendered Under Article I, Section 8 Authority; for a Non-Geographically Uniform Tax on Income Enforced in Violation of Article I, Section 8, clause 1 of the U.S. Constitution filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Judgment DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss and granting 56 Motion for Entry of Default: The 60 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED for the same reasons articulated by the court in its previous Orders. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), it is ORDERED that a DEFAULT is entered against Defendants Paul Kenneth Cromar and Barbara Cromar for failure to defend against the United States' claims. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/12/18. (dla) Modified by correcting docket text and event type on 7/17/2018 (dla).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Motions No Longer Referred: 60 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Hearing. District Judge to handle the Motion. (lnp) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Defendant's Explanation of Why it is Impossible for Any Person to Properly Answer the Complaint filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (Response to 59 Order to Show Cause). (dla) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the District Court That Can be Taken Under Statutes Alone, Without an Identified Constitutional Authority and Motion for Hearing filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The Cromars are ordered to file an answer to the Complaint within fourteen days of this Order. Failure to answer or otherwise defend within fourteen days may result in the entry of default against them pursuant to Rule 55(a). Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/27/18. (dla)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Paul Kenneth Cromar and Barbara Ann Cromar are hereby ordered to show cause why the Court should not impose a $100 sanction, payable to the District of Utah, based on their continued failure to abide by the Court's Order 46 prohibiting them from filing additional motions challenging this Court's subject matter jurisdiction in this case. Defendants are directed to respond in writing no later than July 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/26/2018. (jjm) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING 53 Motion for More Definite Statement for the reasons stated in previous Orders 30, 46, and 51 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/26/2018. (jjm) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Entry of Default
                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of Default as to Paul Cromar and Barbara Cromar and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Watson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff USA. (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2018. Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Motions due by 2/8/2019. (See order for further deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/6/2018. (jwt)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                      Reply and Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Clerks Entry of Default Certificate
                                                                                                                        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Universal Campus Federal Credit Union (jwt)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 48 Motion to Strike Improper Pleadings and 49 Motion for Hearing. On 5/15/2018, this Court entered an 46 Order denying the Cromar Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and issued a warning that "the filing of improper and frivolous motions may result in the impositions of sanctions." The Court again reminds the Cromar Defendants that the continued failure to abide by the Court's Order will result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/29/18. (dla)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION to Strike 45 Notice (Other) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff USA. (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Hearing
                                                                                                                              Defendants' MOTION for Hearing re 48 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(jwt)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Strike
                                                                                                                                Defendant's Objection and MOTION to Strike Improper Pleadings for Lack of a Demonstrated subject-matter jurisdiction of the court that is properly and fully shown on the record of the action filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(jwt)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Initial Pretrial Conference held on May 9, 2018 before Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2018. (las) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 39 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(4)(A), the Cromars must respond to the United States' Complaint within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/14/18. (dla)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by USA (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Initial Pretrial Conference held on May 9, 2018 before Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2018. (jmr) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2018. Plaintiff's counsel and defendants present by telephone. Court hears statements from parties regarding scheduling order and will enter order provided by Plaintiff. Defendants' objections to entry of scheduling order or any proceedings, put on record. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Ryan S. Watson. Defendants: Paul Kenneth Cromar, Barbara Ann Cromar. Court Reporter: Electronic. (Time Start: 10:01:18, Time End: 10:12:57, Room 7.400.) (dla) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING 38 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Court to email conference call information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/8/2018. No attached document. (lnp) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (jlw)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear to Appear Telephonically Ryan S. Watson filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Approving Stipulation: 1) The Stipulation is approved; 2) If the United States obtains an order allowing it to sell the real property at issue in this action, it shall submit to the Court a proposed order of sale consistent with the terms of the Stipulation; 3) Pending sale of the Subject Property or unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Utah County is excused from further participation in this action; 4) The United States and Utah County shall each bear their own costs related to this litigation against each other. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/2/18. (dla)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Motions No Longer Referred: 32 Stipulated MOTION Entry of Order Approving Stipulation (mjm) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Parties: State of Utah Tax Commission and Utah Housing Finance Agency are dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/1/18 (alt)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Planning Meeting Report) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated MOTION Entry of Order Approving Stipulation filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Utah Housing Finance Agency and State of Utah Tax Commission filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 11, 12 Motions to Determine the Subject-Matter of the Court. For the reasons stated in the Order, the Cromars' Motions and 29 Objection are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/26/18. (dla)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to the 27 Order of the Court and MOTION to Suspend Proceedings for Lack of a Demonstrated Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the Court that is Properly and Fully Shown on the Record of the Action filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (dla) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Default as to Universal Campus Federal Credit Union filed by Plaintiff USA. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Watson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/10/2018. (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Failure to Fully and Properly Identify the Granted Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the District Court on the Record of the Action filed by Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar. (dla) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Disclaimer of Utah State Tax Commission ANSWER to Complaint filed by State of Utah Tax Commission.(Lewis, Stephen) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Lewis on behalf of State of Utah Tax Commission (Lewis, Stephen) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION, 12 MOTION filed by Plaintiff USA. (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Disclaimer of Interest of Utah Housing Corporation f/k/a Utah Housing Finance Agency filed by Defendant Utah Housing Finance Agency (Dove, Kenyon) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint filed by Utah County.(Griffin, M.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by M. Cort Griffin on behalf of Utah County (Griffin, M.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Utah Housing Finance Agency served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to State of Utah Tax Commission served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Barbara Ann Cromar served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Paul Kenneth Cromar served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Universal Campus Federal Credit Union served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Utah County served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Summons)(Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions No Longer Referred: 12 to Determine the Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the Court filed by Defendant Barbara Ann Cromar, MOTION, 11 MOTION to Determine the Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the Court filed by Defendant Paul Kenneth Cromar. (mjm) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Determine the Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the Court filed by Defendant Barbara Ann Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Determine the Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of the Court filed by Defendant Paul Kenneth Cromar. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. (dla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff USA (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/5/2018. (mjm) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State of Utah Tax Commission. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Universal Campus Federal Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Housing Finance Agency. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Barbara Ann Cromar. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Kenneth Cromar. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Barbara Ann Cromar, Paul Kenneth Cromar, State of Utah Tax Commission, Universal Campus Federal Credit Union, Utah County, Utah Housing Finance Agency No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Watson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?