CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 3, 2021 at 6:59 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY - SEATTLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Stephanie M. Parent +1 971 717 6404 +1 971 673 5000 sparent@biologicaldiversity.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margaret Townsend +1 971 717 6409 mtownsend@biologicaldiversity.org
v.
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo U. S. Fish & Wildlife Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Strike
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/12/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/12/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/12/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Parent, Stephanie)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Order of the Court by U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE re Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,, (Sroka, Scott) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (ztd).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Status report
                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RESPONSE re 11 Status Report COUNTERPROPOSAL TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED PRODUCTION SCHEDULE filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stephanie Parent, # 2 Exhibit A - NOAA FOIA Response Letter, # 3 Exhibit B - FWS FOIA Response Letter 1, # 4 Exhibit C - FWS FOIA Response Letter 2, # 5 Exhibit D - Email to EPA Amending Request, # 6 Exhibit E - -EPA's Acknowledgement of Amended Request, # 7 Exhibit F - EPA Initial Response Letter)(Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT and Proposed Production Schedule by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Sroka, Scott) Modified to add link on 3/30/2018 (znmw).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/23/2018. (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 2/22/2018; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 2/22/2018 (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/19/2018. (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie M. Parent, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- P.O. Box 11374; Portland, OR 97211-0374. Phone No. - (971) 717-6404. Fax No. - (503) 283-5528 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5334255. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Parent, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SUMMONS(4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5332024) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Townsend, Margaret)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Fish and Wildlife Services must file an updated joint status report with defendant EPA on November 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/25/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Defendant FWS and plaintiff must meet and confer and determine whether they can narrow or prioritize the search or ascertain more quickly how many of the remaining documents are duplicates, and submit a report to the Court by October 24, 2018 with a proposed schedule for completing the production. Defendant EPA must complete the processing of records and submit a status report by November 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court can determine whether a briefing schedule should be established at this time, defendant Fish and Wildlife Services ("FWS"), must by October 10, 2018, file a notice with the Court explaining the discrepancy between its statement in a prior status report 11 that "FWS has completed its searches, which resulted in approximately 5,500 pages of potentially responsive records," and its subsequent statement in a joint status report 14 that "FWS has processed a total of approximately 5,955 records," and it "estimates it has over 22,500 records remaining to review." As to defendant EPA, absent a narrowing of the FOIA request by agreement or court order, the scope of the search should be defined by the language of the request. Finally, the Court is aware of the pendency of the related case, 18-cv-1706, but it will take no steps to consolidate the cases formally at this time. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/05/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by October 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/2/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. The parties must meet and confer and address in their upcoming August 1 joint status report whether a related case, 18-cv-1706, should be consolidated and whether the records requested in that case should be incorporated into the schedule for rolling production that was established in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/26/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of all of the pleadings, the agencies are ordered to process 600 records per month each, with the first production on May 31, 2018, and continuing on a rolling basis on the last day of each month. The parties must also submit a joint status report on August 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/07/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 27, 2018.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/30/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file their answer to plaintiff's complaint or other response by April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/19/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave of Stephanie M. Parent to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?