Grant v. Office of the State Attorney
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00252

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 1:42 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pernell Antonio Grant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pernell Antonio Grant
No Logo State of Florida, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Duval County, Pre-Trial Detention Facility, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Jefferson Correctional Institution, Defendant
No Logo Office of the State Attorney, Defendant
No Logo City of Jacksonville, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT pursuant to this Court's Order entered on 5/1/18, judgment is hereby entered this case is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/2/2018. (PAM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER of dismissal for failure to state a claim under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1915A(b); directing the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the case without prejudice, terminate any pending motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/1/2018. (KLC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/16/2018. (CKS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against City of Jacksonville, Duval County, Pre-Trial Detention Facility, Florida Department of Corrections, Jefferson Correctional Institution, Office of the State Attorney, State of Florida filed by Pernell Antonio Grant. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope) (no service copies, no IFP, postmarked 2/10/18) (AEJ) Modified text on 2/16/2018. (AEJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?