Holmes v. Guardian Brevard Newspaper
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00232

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 6:38 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER adopting 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Jariel Q Holmes. The Motion to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees and Costs (Doc. 2) is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before April 4, 2018 along with a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/21/2018. (MMW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 6 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?