United States v. INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00032-DLF-1

Tags

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated February 17, 2020 at 6:24 PM ST (1.7 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Rush Atkinson +1 202 514 3030
Space Ryan Kao Dickey +1 202 616 1509
Space Jeannie Sclafani Rhee +j sru sdojgov
v.
No Logo ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, Defendant
No Logo ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, Defendant
No Logo CONCORD CATERING, Defendant
No Logo CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, Defendant
No Logo GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, Defendant
No Logo INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, Defendant
No Logo IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, Defendant
No Logo JAYHOON ASLANOV, Defendant
No Logo MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, Defendant
No Logo MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, Defendant
No Logo MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, Defendant
No Logo SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, Defendant
No Logo VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, Defendant
No Logo VLADIMIR VENKOV, Defendant
No Logo YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/16/2018
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371; CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES; Conspiracy to Defraud the United States
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349; CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT BANK AND WIRE FRAUD; Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud and Bank Fraud
Count 3-8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A(a)(1) and 2; FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS; Aggravated Identity Theft
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CAT B
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Indictment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 115 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jason Bradley Adam McCullough appearing for USA. (McCullough, Jason) (Main Document 75 replaced on 11/19/2018) (zvt). Modified to make document non-fillable on 11/19/2018 (zvt).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: The 5/9/18 Oral Motion for Control/Status Hearing (docketed 5/10/18) was entered in error, re-filed and granted by oral order to reflect correct participant defendants. The 5/9/18 Minute Entry was also modified to reflect the correct parties for the 7/9/18 Control/Status Hearing. (kk)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                              MOTION Regarding Status of Service by USA as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD CATERING. (Dickey, Ryan)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Heather Alpino appearing for USA. (Alpino, Heather)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Richard Dreeben appearing for USA. (Dreeben, Michael)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV re [15] Transcript was entered in error and transcript will be refiled by court reporter. (zhsj)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE in case as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV, before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich, held on 05/16/2018. Page Numbers: 1-14. Date of Issuance: 05/23/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara Wick, Telephone number 202-354-3284. Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2018. (Wick, Sara) Modified on 5/25/2018 (zhsj).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Motion for Speedy Trial
                                        Joint MOTION for Speedy Trial Act Continuance Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. ?? 3161(h)(7)(A) by USA as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Lawrence)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION Pursuant to Rule 6(e)(3)(E)(ii) for In Camera Inspection of Legal Instructions Provided to the Grand Jury Regarding Count One of The Indictment by CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(Seikaly, Katherine) Modified on 5/14/2018 (hsj).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV re [10] MOTION Pursuant to Rule 6(e)(3)(E)(ii) for In Camera Inspection of Legal Instructions Provided to the Grand Jury Regarding Count One of The Indictment was entered in error due to linking to wrong defendants. Counsel will refile document linking to correct defendant. (hsj)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey held on May 9, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: May 9, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC (1), CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC (2), CONCORD CATERING (3), YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN (4), MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV (5), MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK (6), ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA (7), ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA (8), SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV (9), MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA (10), ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA (11), DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV (12), VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV (13), GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO (14), IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA (15), VLADIMIR VENKOV (16): Please disregard status conference hearing/deadline entered on 5/9/18 as to ALL defendants. Deadline was entered in error. (jl)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                  ORAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 5/9/18 : granting Oral Motion by USA for Control/Status Hearing for Defendants INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC (1) and CONCORD CATERING (3). (kk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Motion for Hearing
                                                    ORAL MOTION by USA for Control/Status Hearing for Defendants INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC (1) and CONCORD CATERING (3). (kk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Hearings as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV: Status Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (jl) Modified on 5/10/2018 (zjl).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018, Terminated: 5/7/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to Continue Initial Appearance and Arraignment by USA as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC, CONCORD CATERING, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA, VLADIMIR VENKOV. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Order
                                                        MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the [7] Government's Motion to Continue Initial Appearance and Arraignment. Defendant Concord Management and Consulting LLC shall file any response to the motion by 5:00 p.m. (EST) on May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 4, 2018. (JK)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                          LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Addendum Two to Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File Denied" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 4/18/2018. (hsj)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                            LEAVE TO FILE DENIED-Addendum One to Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File Denied" by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 4/18/2018. (hsj)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 indictment
                                                              INDICTMENT as to INTERNET RESEARCH AGENCY LLC (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-8, CONCORD MANAGEMENT AND CONSULTING LLC (2) count(s) 1, CONCORD CATERING (3) count(s) 1, YEVGENIY VIKTOROVICH PRIGOZHIN (4) count(s) 1, MIKHAIL IVANOVICH BYSTROV (5) count(s) 1, MIKHAIL LEONIDOVICH BURCHIK (6) count(s) 1, ALEKSANDRA YURYEVNA KRYLOVA (7) count(s) 1, ANNA VLADISLAVOVNA BOGACHEVA (8) count(s) 1, SERGEY PAVLOVICH POLOZOV (9) count(s) 1, MARIA ANATOLYEVNA BOVDA (10) count(s) 1, ROBERT SERGEYEVICH BOVDA (11) count(s) 1, DZHEYKHUN NASIMI OGLY ASLANOV (12) count(s) 1, 2, 3-8, VADIM VLADIMIROVICH PODKOPAEV (13) count(s) 1, GLEB IGOREVICH VASILCHENKO (14) count(s) 1, 2, 3-8, IRINA VIKTOROVNA KAVERZINA (15) count(s) 1, 3-8, VLADIMIR VENKOV (16) count(s) 1, 3-8. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (tl)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 963 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?