MAROUF v. AZAR
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00378

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2021 at 11:40 AM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRYN ESPLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Kenneth Dale Upton +1 214 302 2218 +1 312 663 4307 upton.ken@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alali Dagogo-Jack +1 650 463 4070 +1 650 463 4199

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Heaven Chanel Chin Chee +1 713 632 1427 heaven.chee@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Y. Choe +1 202 637 5675 +1 202 637 5910 ken.choe@hoganlovells.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Lynn Ellsworth +1 202 637 5886 jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Fleury +1 713 632 1400 jennifer.fleury@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE James Anthony Huang +1 202 637 3696 +1 202 637 5910 james.huang@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl Lian Kleiman +1 212 918 3728 daryl.kleiman@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Jamie Avra Gliksberg +1 312 663 4307 jgliksberg@lambdalegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Camilla Bronwen Taylor +1 312 663 4413 +1 312 663 4307 ctaylor@lambdalegal.org
No Logo FATMA MAROUF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Kenneth Dale Upton +1 214 302 2218 +1 312 663 4307 upton.ken@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Alali Dagogo-Jack +1 650 463 4070 +1 650 463 4199

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Heaven Chanel Chin Chee +1 713 632 1427 heaven.chee@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Y. Choe +1 202 637 5675 +1 202 637 5910 ken.choe@hoganlovells.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Lynn Ellsworth +1 202 637 5886 jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Fleury +1 713 632 1400 jennifer.fleury@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE James Anthony Huang +1 202 637 3696 +1 202 637 5910 james.huang@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl Lian Kleiman +1 212 918 3728 daryl.kleiman@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Jamie Avra Gliksberg +1 312 663 4307 jgliksberg@lambdalegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Camilla Bronwen Taylor +1 312 663 4413 +1 312 663 4307 ctaylor@lambdalegal.org
No Logo NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Heaven Chanel Chin Chee +1 713 632 1427 heaven.chee@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Y. Choe +1 202 637 5675 +1 202 637 5910 ken.choe@hoganlovells.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Lynn Ellsworth +1 202 637 5886 jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Fleury +1 713 632 1400 jennifer.fleury@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daryl Lian Kleiman +1 212 918 3728 daryl.kleiman@hoganlovells.com
v.
No Logo ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
Azar, II, Alex Michael Azar, II, Alex Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "ALEX M. AZAR, II"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
No Logo SCOTT LLOYD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEVEN W. WAGNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Conference Of Catholic Bishops, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Leon F. DeJulius +1 412 394 9528 +1 412 394 7959 lfdejulius@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Anthony J Dick +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 ajdick@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE John D. Goetz +1 412 391 3939 jdgoetz@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Timothy Raimer +1 202 879 3890 +1 202 626 1700 dtraimer@jonesday.com
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vinita Andrapalliyal +1 202 598 8085 vinita.b.andrapalliyal@usdoj.gov
Space Graham L. Barron +1 202 307 3997 +20514100 205 514 1009 graham.l.barron@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren H. Bell +1 202 353 1991 +1 202 514 8742 lauren.hash.bell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov
, , Walter Wayne Brown +1 202 307 0341 walter.brown2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Andrew E. Clark +1 202 307 0067 +1 202 514 8742 andrew.clark@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jason T. Cohen +1 202 305 0207 +1 202 305 0275 jason.cohen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Comber +1 412 644 3500 michael.comber@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Daniel Kadane Crane-Hirsch +1 202 616 8242 +1 202 514 8742 daniel.crane-hirsch@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Drake S. Cutini +1 202 307 0044 +1 202 514 8742 drake.cutini@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Shannon L. Fagan +1 202 252 2575 shannon.fagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017 Adam Anderson Grogg +1 202 514 2395 adam.a.grogg@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/15/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Anderson Grogg +1 202 514 2395 adam.a.grogg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , James W. Harlow +1 202 514 6786 +1 202 514 8742 james.w.harlow@usdoj.gov
Space Fred Elmore Haynes +1 202 514 7201 +1 202 514 8780 fred.haynes@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Heide Lynn Herrmann +1 202 305 3315 +1 202 305 0274 heide.herrmann@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eric G. Hostetler +1 202 305 2326 +1 202 514 8865 eric.hostetler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/06/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/06/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/06/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/06/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/2 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Gerald Cooper Kell +1 202 514 1586 +1 202 514 8742 gerald.kell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
, , Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
, , , Joshua M. Kolsky +1 202 252 2541 +1 202 514 8780 joshua.kolsky@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J.B. Lawrence +1 202 305 0747 +1 202 616 8202 Matthew.J.Lawrence@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Keith V. Morgan +1 202 514 7228 +1 202 514 8780 keith.morgan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , James T. Nelson +1 202 307 0067 +1 202 514 8742 james.nelson2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew L. Nolan +1 202 305 8735 andrew.l.nolan@usdoj.gov
, , , Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Peter C. Pfaffenroth +1 202 514 7188 +1 202 514 8780 peter.pfaffenroth@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jacek Pruski +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 jacek.pruski@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT WEBSTER REID +1 215 861 8358 scott.reid@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Maureen Elizabeth Rudolph +1 202 305 0479 +1 202 353 2021 maureen.rudolph@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Albert W. Schollaert +1 412 644 3500 albert.schollaert@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Karen Patricia Seifert +1 202 305 0891 karen.p.seifert@usdoj.gov
, Michael Jeffrey Sherman +1 202 616 5501 +1 202 514 1009 michael.j.sherman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Jeremy S. Simon +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 jeremy.simon@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , JOEL M. SWEET +1 215 861 8581 +1 215 861 8618 joel.sweet@usdoj.gov
, Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Carol L. Wallack +1 202 307 0486 +1 202 514 8742 carol.wallack@usdoj.gov
, Claire M. Whitaker +1 202 514 7137 +1 202 514 8780 claire.whitaker@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric R. Womack +1 202 514 4020 +1 202 616 8470 eric.womack@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Shelese M. Woods +1 317 226 6333 +1 317 226 5027 shelese.woods@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Danielle Wolfson Young +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 danielle.young2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Andrew Zee +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8470 m.andrew.zee@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas David Zimpleman +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 616 8470 thomas.d.zimpleman@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Modify
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/28/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Modify
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Modify
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION. Attorney Daryl Lian Kleiman terminated. (Kleiman, Daryl)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay re Order to File Joint Status Report by January 14, 2019 in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT LLOYD, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN W. WAGNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Status report
                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to November 30, 2018 Motion Hearing Minute Order by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION. (Choe, Kenneth)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by James R. Powers (Powers, James)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS. (Raimer, David)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT LLOYD, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN W. WAGNER. (Powers, James)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Choe, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A Fleury on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fleury, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daryl Lian Kleiman, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 875 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - 212-918-3728. Fax No. - 212-918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5510327. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daryl Lian Kleiman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heaven Chanel Chin Chee, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 609 Main Street, Suite 4200, Houston, Texas 77002. Phone No. - 713-632-1427. Fax No. - 713-632-1401 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5510291. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Heaven Chanel Chin Chee, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Extension of Time for Defendants to File Reply by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Raimer, David)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT LLOYD, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN W. WAGNER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT LLOYD, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN W. WAGNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dick, Anthony) Modified event title on 3/29/2018 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Raimer, David)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leon F. DeJulius, Jr., :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 500 Grant Street, Suite 4500, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-391-3939. Fax No. - 412-394-7959 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Raimer, David)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Goetz, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 500 Grant Street, Suite 4500, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-391-3939. Fax No. - 412-394-7959 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Raimer, David)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of David Timothy Raimer by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS (Raimer, David) Modified event on 3/27/2018 (znmw). (Main Document 22 replaced on 3/27/2018) (znmw).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT served on 3/1/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT LLOYD served on 3/5/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES served on 3/6/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEVEN W. WAGNER served on 3/6/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/5/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 3/1/2018 (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/06/2018. (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/5/2018. (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie Avra Gilksberg, :Firm- Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., :Address- 105 West Adams Street, Suite 2600, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312-663-4413 ext. 324. Fax No. - 31 filed by FATMA MAROUF, BRYN ESPLIN. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT LLOYD, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, STEVEN W. WAGNER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth Y. Choe, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - 202-637-5675. Fax No. - 202-637-5910 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339257. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth Y. Choe, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alali Dagogo-Jack, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 4085 Campbell Avenue, Suite 100, Menlo Park, CA 94025. Phone No. - 650-463-4070. Fax No. - 650-463-4199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339215. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alali Dagogo-Jack, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James Anthony Huang, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - 202-637-3696. Fax No. - 202-637-5910 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339192. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Anthony Huang, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth Y. Choe, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - 202-637-5675. Fax No. - 202-637-5910 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339170. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth Y. Choe, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica) Modified on 2/20/2018 (td).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Camilla B. Taylor, :Firm- Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., :Address- 105 West Adams Street, Suite 2600, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312-663-4413 ext. 325. Fax No. - 312-663-4307 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339153. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Camilla B. Taylor, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie Avra Gilksberg, :Firm- Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., :Address- 105 West Adams Street, Suite 2600, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312-663-4413 ext. 324. Fax No. - 312-663-4307 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jamie Avra Gilksberg, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr., :Firm- Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., :Address- 3500 Oak Lawn Avenue Suite 500 Dallas, TX 75219-6722. Phone No. - 214-302-2218. Fax No. - 214-219-4455 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5339076. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRYN ESPLIN, FATMA MAROUF (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr., # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Ellsworth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5338574) filed by FATMA MAROUF, BRYN ESPLIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Defendants' Motion for a Stay of Proceedings. This matter is hereby stayed. Within three business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, Defendants shall notify the court by when the parties will file their Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/08/2019. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 14, 2019, updating the court on their efforts to resolve this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/14/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2018 re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SCOTT LLOYD, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, ALEX M. AZAR, II, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, STEVEN W. WAGNER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF CATHOLIC BISHOPS. Oral arguments heard. The parties are to submit a Joint Status report within two weeks of today's Hearing. (Court Reporter Willaim Zaremba) (znbn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. At the hearing scheduled for November 30, 2018, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta, the parties shall be prepared to address the recent case, Dumont v. Lyon, No. 17-CV-13080, 2018 WL 4385667 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 14, 2018). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument regarding 28 and 29 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for November 30, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/06/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Heaven Chanel Chin Chee is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daryl Lian Kleiman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 30 Joint Motion for Extensions of Time. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' 28 and 29 Motions to Dismiss shall now be due on or before June 18, 2018, and Defendants' Replies shall be due on or before July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response due by 6/18/2018. Defendants' Replies due by 7/9/2018. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' 21 Amended Complaint is hereby extended to May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/04/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to amended complaint due by 5/21/2018. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Goetz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/02/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Leon F. DeJulius, Jr. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/02/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filing fee received: $ 200.00, receipt number: 4616090271 re 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Goetz and 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leon F. DeJulius, Jr., (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear. Anthony J. Dick has hereby entered an appearance in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/28/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Before the court considers the 23 and 24 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the movants must each pay the $100 fee required under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). If the movants fail to pay these fees by April 4, 2018, the court will deny the pro hac vice motions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/28/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear. David T. Raimer has hereby entered an appearance in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/27/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant United States Conference of Catholic Bishops' 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant United States Conference of Catholic Bishops shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint no later than May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/27/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant United States Conference of Catholic Bishops' answer to Amended Complaint due by 5/7/2018. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr., is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jamie Avra Gilksberg is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Camilla B. Taylor is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James Anthony Huang is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alali Dagogo-Jack is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kenneth Y. Choe is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2018. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth Y. Choe, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - 202-637-5675. Fax No. - 202-637-5910 Filing fee $ 10 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?