Bruzzone v. McManis
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01235

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2020 at 7:04 PM DT (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None ORDER of United States Supreme Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/31/2018. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND IMPOSING PRE-FILING REVIEW REQUIREMENTS ON CERTAIN FUTURE ACTIONS FILED BY MICHAEL BRUZZONE. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST INTEL AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST JUDGE ALSUP SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/10/2018. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Declaratory Judgment
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Declaratory Judgment
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?