Le v. Sessions
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00606

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 22, 2018 at 7:10 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hai Minh Le, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by A#075232050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hai Minh Le
v.
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeff Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Richard Wesley Bennett +1 713 567 9540 +71371830 713 371 8301 Richard.Bennett@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander James Halaska +1 202 307 8704 +1 202 305 7000 alexander.j.halaska@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron Kollitz +1 213 894 2083 +1 213 894 7819 aaron.kollitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Matthew Mailloux +1 718 254 6176 +1 718 254 7483 matthew.mailloux@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Grace Y Park +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 grace.park@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither +1 713 567 9303 +1 713 718 3415 eleanor.robinson-gaither@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marisela Desire Sandoval +1 303 454 0233 marisela.sandoval@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Rachel G. Balaban +1 718 254 6028 +1 718 254 6081 rachel.balaban@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine J. Shinners +1 202 598 8259 +1 202 305 7000 Katherine.J.Shinners@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Ward +1 202 616 9121 brian.c.ward@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Lacy, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Richard Wesley Bennett +1 713 567 9540 +71371830 713 371 8301 Richard.Bennett@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander James Halaska +1 202 307 8704 +1 202 305 7000 alexander.j.halaska@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine J. Shinners +1 202 598 8259 +1 202 305 7000 Katherine.J.Shinners@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Ward +1 202 616 9121 brian.c.ward@usdoj.gov
No Logo Secretary Jeh Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Barbara Murcier Bowens +1 803 929 3000 +1 803 252 2759 barbara.bowens@usdoj.gov
, , Christina B. Parascandola +1 202 514 3097 +1 202 514 8865 christina.parascandola@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
, , , Matthew Mailloux +1 718 254 6176 +1 718 254 7483 matthew.mailloux@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Bryan Keith Lonegan +1 212 637 2770 +1 212 637 2786 bryan.lonegan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , James Alan Weinkle +1 305 961 9290 +1 305 530 7139 James.Weinkle@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jacob Max Bergman +1 212 637 2776 jacob.bergman@usdoj.gov
, , , Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
, Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Marlene Rodriguez +1 305 961 9206 +5307 530 530 7139 marlene.rodriguez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Ronald W. Kish +1 212 264 3475 +1 212 264 4534 ronald.kish@dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Nelsy De La Nuez +1 917 697 3688 nelsy.de.la.nuez2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bret Bradford, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 463 - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & ORDER
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Amended Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Answer to Habeas Petition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (sguevara, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Hai Minh Le. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(hler, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?