WILSON v. KRISE TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00065

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 2:57 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NANCY WILSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Zachary A. Hebert +1 412 690 7143 zachary.hebert@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Rose Stern +1 412 395 6896 julie.stern@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo KRISE TRANSPORTATION, INC., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/14/18. (lck)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
    First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by NANCY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Hebert, Zachary)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice as premature since no appearance yet entered on behalf of defendant re: 8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/7/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NANCY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Hebert, Zachary)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ADR Notice by NANCY WILSON (Stern, Julie) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judge Schwab's Order Setting Status Conference by NANCY WILSON (Stern, Julie) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 3 Motion Pro hac vice for Zachary A. Hebert. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/28/18. (lck)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  First MOTION Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. Hebert by NANCY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion, # 2 Proposed Order to Admit Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Certificate of Service for PHV Motion) (Hebert, Zachary)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to KRISE TRANSPORTATION, INC. (dm) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT and Petition for Temporary Injunction against KRISE TRANSPORTATION, INC., filed by NANCY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Appendix Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service) (dm) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        TEXT ORDER: a Status Conference is set for 3/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. Counsel for Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendant (or Defendant's Counsel if known) with this Text Order and all other pleadings in the case and shall file an appropriate certificate of service. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/28/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eet)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 22 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?