ROSSMANN v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00020

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 1:11 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRUD ROSSMANN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CCNV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRUD ROSSMANN +1 202 848 0317
v.
No Logo ASHEESH AGARWAL, Defendant
No Logo DAN CALLAHAN, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "IVANKA TRUMP"
Kushner, Jared C. Kushner, Jared C., Defendant
Officially listed as "JARED KUSHNER"
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"
No Logo NANCY BERRYHILL, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 205
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 02/27/2018. (zsb)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/22/2017. (zsb)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 11 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?