Shehadi v. Cusson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00360

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2021 at 4:36 PM EDT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Patrick O'Brien, Plaintiff

Represented by Hossley & Embry LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , D. Allen Hossley +1 903 526 1772 +1 903 526 1773 allen@hossleyembry.com

Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTIC Robert Turner Haefele +1 843 216 9184 +1 843 216 9450 rhaefele@motleyrice.com
No Logo William H Shehadi, Jr., Plaintiff

Represented by Connecticut Legal Rights Project, Inc.-Mdltn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk W. Lowry +1 860 262 5017 +1 860 262 5035 klowry@clrp.org

Represented by Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Antonio Ponvert, III +1 203 336 4421 +1 203 368 3244 aponvert@koskoff.com
v.
No Logo Bruce Holt, Defendant

Represented by Engstrom Lipscomb & Lack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Walter John Lack +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 wlack@elllaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark Evans Millard +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 mmillard@elllaw.com

Represented by Girardi Keese

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas V. Girardi +1 213 977 0211 +1 213 481 1554 tgirardi@girardikeese.com

Represented by Girardi Keese & Crane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Carrie Rognlien +1 213 977 0211

Represented by Law Office Of Masry & Vititoe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Omar A.R. Abukurah +1 818 991 8900

Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Represented by Law Offices Of Masry & Vititoe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Nancy Seidler Eichler +1 818 991 6200
No Logo Carl Benjamin, Defendant

Represented by Carl Benjamin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Benjamin +1 347 879 9126

Represented by Suite 1700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wesley Martin Mullen +1 646 632 3718 wmullen@mullenpc.com
No Logo Clayton Davis, Defendant

Represented by Clayton Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton Davis +1 860 670 2384
No Logo Greg Giantonio, Defendant
No Logo Lance Camby, Defendant
No Logo Mark Cusson, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mario Cerame +1 860 560 7359 mariokcerame@gmail.com

Represented by Law Offices of Norman A. Pattis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman A. Pattis +1 203 393 3017 +1 203 393 9745 npattis@pattislaw.com

Represented by woolflaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Woolf +1 860 290 8690 w@woolflaw.com
No Logo Michael Presnick, Defendant

Represented by Moriarty , Paetzold & Sherwood, LLC-Gstnby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Peter Moriarty +1 860 657 1010 +1 860 657 1011 tom@mpslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Paetzold +1 860 657 1010 +1 860 657 1011 whpaetzold@mpslawfirm.com
No Logo Robert Larned, Defendant

Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon D. Golas +1 860 646 4545 jon.golas@snet.net
No Logo Robert Martineau, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Norman A. Pattis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman A. Pattis +1 203 393 3017 +1 203 393 9745 npattis@pattislaw.com
No Logo Seth Quider, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Brewer +1 860 217 0652 jbreweratty@gmail.com
No Logo Willie Bethea, Defendant

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Megan Elizabeth Jones +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 mjones@hausfeld.com

Represented by Willie Bethea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Willie Bethea
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Financial Affidavit
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Appearance Self Represented Party
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Norman A. Pattis on behalf of Mark Cusson (Pattis, Norman)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/17/2018. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by William H Shehadi, Jr.Responses due by 9/25/2018 (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 29 37 Motions to Stay; The stay (1) applies to all discovery and proceedings, including motion practice, concerning the ten defendants facing criminal prosecution; (2) shall not apply to the two defendants Martineau and OBrien who are not facing criminal prosecution; and (3) shall be lifted as to each defendant as soon as that defendant either pleads to one or more charges, or is found guilty or acquitted by the finder of fact, i.e. discovery may proceed prior to sentencing. Plaintiff may seek to vacate the stay as to any defendant who has not pleaded to one or more charges or has not been found guilty or acquitted within 10 months of the date of the Courts Order on this Motion. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2018. (LaMura, K.) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 37 MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Stay discovery, 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion joined and supplemented, 29 MOTION to Stay discovery filed by Mark Cusson. (Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 response
                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 37 MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Stay discovery, 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion joined and supplemented, 29 MOTION to Stay discovery, 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by William H Shehadi, Jr. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon review, the Court approves the case management plan set forth in document 51 as follows: Discovery is extended to October 31, 2018; dispositive motions are due by November 30, 2018. The Court will consider whether to stay this case after the issue is fully briefed. Discovery due by 10/31/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2018 Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/4/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 45 Motion. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/1/2018. (LaMura, K.) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Robert Martineau.(Pattis, Norman)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Michael Presnick. (Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Norman A. Pattis on behalf of Robert Martineau (Pattis, Norman)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Willie Bethea. (Potter, A.)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to participate in Electronic Filing by Willie Bethea.Responses due by 5/17/2018 (Potter, A.)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Robert Larned's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Robert Larned.(Golas, Jon)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Second SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H Shehadi, Jr. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 34 Motion by Self Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/25/2018. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Michael Presnick.(Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Seth Quider.(Brewer, James)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 36 Objection to Motion for Extension of Time filed by Mark Cusson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preanswer Letter)(Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay re 29 MOTION to Stay discovery, 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion joined and supplemented by Mark Cusson.Responses due by 5/14/2018 (Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2018, and May 23, 2018, respectively concerning Response to Complaint and 26(f) Conference filed by William H Shehadi, Jr. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Self Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Carl Benjamin. Responses due by 5/11/2018. (Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Appearance Self Represented Party
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Appearance Self Represented Party by Carl Benjamin (Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2018, and May 23, 2018, respectively concerning Response to Complaint and 26(f) Conference by Mark Cusson. (Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk W. Lowry on behalf of William H Shehadi, Jr (Lowry, Kirk)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 29 MOTION to Stay discovery filed by Michael Presnick. (Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay discovery by Michael Presnick.Responses due by 5/11/2018 (Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Self Represented Party by Clayton Davis. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/3/2018. (LaMura, K.) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2018 To respond to Complaint by Michael Presnick. (Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Paetzold on behalf of Michael Presnick (Paetzold, William)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Peter Moriarty on behalf of Michael Presnick (Moriarty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H Shehadi, Jr. Clayton Davis served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Patrick O'Brien.(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Patrick O'Brien (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/29/2018. (LaMura, K.) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/26/2018 to file Response by Willie Bethea. (Fanelle, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Appearance Self Represented Party by Willie Bethea (Fanelle, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/27/2018. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2018BY:/s/ Mario Cerame to respond to the Complaint 1 Complaint by Mark Cusson. (Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mario K. Cerame on behalf of Mark Cusson (Cerame, Mario)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Woolf on behalf of Mark Cusson (Woolf, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: 3/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Bruce Holt.(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/23/2018. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/27/2018 respond to Complaint by Seth Quider. (Brewer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/26/2018to Respond to Complaint by Robert Larned. (Golas, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Brewer on behalf of Seth Quider (Brewer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jon D. Golas on behalf of Robert Larned (Golas, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H Shehadi, Jr. Carl Benjamin served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/24/2018; Willie Bethea served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Lance Camby served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Mark Cusson served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Clayton Davis served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Greg Giantonio served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Bruce Holt served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Robert Larned served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Robert Martineau served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Patrick O'Brien served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/24/2018; Michael Presnick served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Seth Quider served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Bruce Holt (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carl Benjamin, Willie Bethea, Lance Camby, Mark Cusson, Clayton Davis, Greg Giantonio, Bruce Holt, Robert Larned, Robert Martineau, Patrick O'Brien, Michael Presnick, Seth Quider* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Antonio Ponvert, III* *Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C.* *350 Fairfield Ave., 5th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by William H Shehadi, Jr., 3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2018. Discovery due by 8/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/1/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4738124.), filed by William H Shehadi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Probate document)(Ponvert, Antonio)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?