Yeager v. National Public Radio
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-04019

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 4, 2020 at 5:25 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter from 10CCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Letter re Writ of Certiorari
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Letter re Writ of Certiorari
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Leave
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Appeal Number Information
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of thisorder to file an amended complaint which states a claim upon which relief may be granted. If plaintiff does not do so, the court shall dismiss this case with prejudice for the reasons described in this order. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/31/18. (msb)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Stay discovery
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Return of Service of Summons Unexecuted
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Index of Exhibits
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Return of Service of Summons Executed
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Return of Service of Summons Executed
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Conventionally
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Return of Service of Summons Executed
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court shall take the appropriate steps to serve Defendants with the summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/7/18. Mailed to pro se party William Conrad Yeager, II by regular mail. (adc)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?