USA v. NADER
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:85-cr-00033-JGP

Tags
Last Updated March 9, 2018 at 1:47 AM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Nader, George Aref, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE A. NADER"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

GEORGE A. NADER (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 1/29/1985
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1461.F
Offense Level 4
181461 and 2; MAILING OBSCENE OR CRIME-INCITING MATTER; Mailing Obscene Matter, Aiding and Abetting.
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1462.F
Offense Level 4
181462 and 2; IMPORT OR TRANSPORT OBSCENE MATTER; Importation of Obscene Matter, Aiding and Abetting.
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CAT B
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Remark
ALL DOCUMENTS in this Case from February 5, 185 through July 29, 1986 is PDF as one document. (hsj)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/24/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [7] Motion to Reconsider or Reinstate the Indictment filed by USA as to GEORGE A. NADER (1). Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on 11/24/1986. (hsj) (bj).
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/11/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 Memorandum in opposition
      Memorandum in Opposition by GEORGE A. NADER re [7] MOTION to Reconsider or Reinstate the Indictment. (hsj) (bj).
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/26/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 Motion for reconsideration
        MOTION to Reconsider or Reinstate the Indictment by USA as to GEORGE A. NADER. (hsj) (bj).
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/6/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to GEORGE A. NADER before Judge John Garrett Penn held on 7/30/1986; Page Numbers: 1-64. Court Reporter/Transcriber Harry Deutsch, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/27/1986. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/1986. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/1986. (hsj) (bj).
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/6/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to GEORGE A. NADER before Judge John Garrett Penn held on 7/29/1986; Page Numbers: 1-66. Court Reporter/Transcriber Harry Deutsch, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/27/1986. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/1986. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/1986.(hsj) (bj).
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/19/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to GEORGE A. NADER before Judge John Garrett Penn held on 2/10/1986; Page Numbers: 208-289. Court Reporter/Transcriber Harry Deutsch, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/10/1986. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/1986. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/1986.(hsj) (bj).
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/19/1986, Entered: 3/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to GEORGE A. NADER before Judge John Garrett Penn held on 2/7/1986; Page Numbers: 1-207. Court Reporter/Transcriber Harry Deutsch, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/10/1986. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/1986. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/1986.(hsj) (bj).
                  LREF
                  Opinion 10 Filed: 11/14/1985, Entered: None
                  OPINION
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/29/1985, Entered: 3/8/2018 indictment
                    INDICTMENT as to GEORGE A. NADER (1) count(s) 1, 2. (hsj) (bj).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/1985, Entered: 3/8/2018 Remark
                      DOCKET SHEET from Microfiche from January 29, 1985 through November 24, 1986. (hsj)
                        LREF

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 162 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?