TELEBRANDS CORP. v. E. MISHAN & SONS, INC.

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-03323
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 14, 2019 at 4:11 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo A2 Product Development, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH L. LINARES +1 973 757 1100 +1 973 757 1090 jlinares@walsh.law

Represented by The Walsh Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ +1 973 757 1100 hruiz@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
No Logo Prometheus Brands LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH L. LINARES +1 973 757 1100 +1 973 757 1090 jlinares@walsh.law

Represented by The Walsh Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ +1 973 757 1100 hruiz@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
No Logo Telebrands Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "TELEBRANDS CORP."

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH L. LINARES +1 973 757 1100 +1 973 757 1090 jlinares@walsh.law

Represented by The Walsh Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ +1 973 757 1100 hruiz@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
v.
No Logo E. Mishan & Sons, Inc.,, Defendant

Represented by JARDIM, MEISNER & SUSSER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DENNIS FRANCIS GLEASON +1 973 845 7640 +1 973 549 6079 dgleason@jmslawyers.com

Represented by Notaro & Michalos, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN J. DOYLE +1 845 359 7700 brian.doyle@notaromichalos.com
No Logo Gotham Steel, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY EUGENE MEYERS +1 212 655 3500 em@msf-law.com
No Logo MARVIN LEVY, Defendant

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY EUGENE MEYERS +1 212 655 3500 em@msf-law.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by GOTHAM STEEL LLC, MARVIN LEVY re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Meyers in Support of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Marvin Levy and Gotham Steel, LLC, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. re 44 MOTION to Dismiss (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Request for a two week Extension of Time through and including September 5, 2018 for defendants to File a reply to Plaintiff's opposition [Dkt. No. 53] and in further support of the Gotham Defendants' motion to dismiss [Dkt. No. 45].. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/21/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Request for a two week Extension of Time to File a Reply in further support of motion to dismiss (ECF No. 44); that Emsons' papers would be due September 5.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/20/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Letter
Letter from Eugene Meyers, Esq. Requesting an Extension of Time to File a Reply. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Letter
Letter from Dennis F. Gleason to Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
BRIEF in Opposition filed by A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP. re 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER regarding briefing schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (D.E. 44 & 45). Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motions due August 15, 2018. Defendants' Replies in further support of the Motions due August 22, 2018.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/16/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER regarding briefing schedule for Defendants' Motions to DismissPlaintiffs First Amended Complaint (D.E. 44 & 45, respectively); Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motions due August 15, 2018. Defendants' Replies in further support of the Motions due August 22, 2018.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/13/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER regarding briefing schedule; that Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motions due July 16, 2018; that Defendants' Replies in further support of the Motions due July 23, 2018.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/27/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh (Request "So Order") re 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Letter Rule 7.1
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint . (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Letter Rule 7.1
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss . (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by GOTHAM STEEL LLC, MARVIN LEVY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support Of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Marvin Levy and Gotham Steel, LLC, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC.. Responses due by 6/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration Brian Doyle, dated May 31, 2018, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to E. Mishan & Sons, Inc... (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to First Amended Complaint.. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall terminate docket entries 30 and 32. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/8/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 30 MOTION to Dismiss, 32 MOTION to Dismiss, 39 Amended Complaint. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., TELEBRANDS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Form AO120, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Susan M. Schlesinger to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Antonio Papageorgiou to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Antonio Papageorgiou, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/20/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Antonio Papageorgiou, Esq. and Susan Schlesinger, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/19/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss . (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 30 MOTION to Dismiss . (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss by GOTHAM STEEL LLC, MARVIN LEVY. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Marvin Levy and Gotham Steel, LLC, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Eugene Meyers, Esq. to the Honorable Steven C. Mannion re application for admission pro hac vice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Declaration of Antonio Papageorgiou, # 3 Declaration of Susan M. Schlesinger)(MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC.. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration Brian J Doyle, dated April 12, 2018, # 3 Declaration Edward I. Mishan, dated 10, 2018, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura A. Alos to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8631775.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert T. Maldonado to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8631753.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert T. Maldonado, Esq. and Laura A. Alos, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/6/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Steven C. Mannion, U.S.M.J. regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Robert T. Maldonado, # 2 Certification of Laura A. Alos, # 3 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOTHAM STEEL LLC. (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by EUGENE MEYERS on behalf of GOTHAM STEEL LLC, MARVIN LEVY (MEYERS, EUGENE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. identifying E. Mishan and Sons as Corporate Parent.. (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to E. Mishan & Sons, Inc... (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order held on March 8, 2018, before Judge Esther Salas. Court Reporter: Mary Jo Monteleone (973-580-52620). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 4/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2018. (mfr) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J. DOYLE on behalf of E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. (DOYLE, BRIAN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Zaccaria to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8561713.) (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Angelo Notaro to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8561695.) (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER permitting Angelo Notaro, Esq. and John Zaccaria, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/19/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dennis F. Gleason, # 2 Declaration Angelo Notara, # 3 Declaration John Zaccaria, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 4 Exhibit (to Document),, 3 Declaration,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS FRANCIS GLEASON on behalf of E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. (GLEASON, DENNIS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. LINARES on behalf of A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP. (LINARES, JOSEPH)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP. (O'REILLY, KATELYN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP. (RUIZ, HECTOR)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Hearing on the plaintiff's application for a TRO held on 3/8/2018. Opinion read into the record. Ordered application denied. Status Conference to be set by Magistrate Judge Mannion. (Court Reporter Mary-Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TELEBRANDS CORP. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7) (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
Exhibit 5 to 3 Declaration of Lou Henry,, by A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP.. (ld, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of LOU HENRY re 1 Complaint, by A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(ld, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of AJIT KHUBANI re 1 Complaint, by A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, TELEBRANDS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against E. MISHAN & SONS, INC., GOTHAM STEEL LLC, MARVIN LEVY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW035827) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PROMETHEUS BRANDS, LLC, A2 PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT, INC., TELEBRANDS CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 for Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document 42 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARVIN LEVY, GOTHAM STEEL LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/31/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document 43 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/31/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANTONIO PAPAGEORGIOU, ESQ. and SUSAN M. SCHLESINGER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW036220 for ANTONIO PAPAGEORGIOU, ESQ. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW036219 for SUSAN M. SCHLESINGER, ESQ. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Please disregard 36 CONSENT ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Antonio Papageorgiou, Esq., Duplicate entry. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT T. MALDONADO, ESQ. and LAURA A. ALOS, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document 21 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by E. MISHAN & SONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/12/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk's Note - Please disregard Clerk`s Text Order - The document 25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, it was docketed in error. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corrected Clerk`s Text Order - The document 25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARVIN LEVY, GOTHAM STEEL LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/12/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document 25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Eugene Meyers has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/12/2018. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANGELO NOTARO, ESQ. and JOHN ZACCARIA, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 9 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?