USA v. Manafort et al
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00083-TSE
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 4, 2018 at 6:22 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Greg Donald Andres +1 202 514 0522 +1 718 254 6478 gda@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Weissmann +1 202 616 0800 + 202 353 3165 aaw@usdoj.gov
v.
Manafort, Paul J., Jr. Manafort, Paul J., Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Paul J. Manafort, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Griffith L. Green +1 202 736 8126 +1 202 736 8711 ggreen@sidley.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (1)
Office Alexandria
Filed 2/13/2018
County Fairfax
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-5
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1); 182 and 3551 et seq. Subscribing to False United States Individual Income Tax Returns
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq Bank Fraud Conspiracy (FORFEITURE)
Count 11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud (F0RFEITURE)
Count 12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
18;1349 and 3551 et seq Bank Fraud Conspiracy (FORFEITURE)
Count 13
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 14-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq Bank Fraud Conspiracy (FORFEITURE)
Count 16
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 17
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud Conspiracy (FORFEITURE)
Count 18
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 6-9
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5314.F
Offense Level 4
315314 and 5322(a); 182 and 3551 et seq Failure To File Reports of Foreign Bank and Financial Accounts
Count 11s-14s
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5314.F
Offense Level 4
315314 and 5322(a); 182 and 3551 et seq. Failure To File Reports Of Foreign Bank And Financial Accounts
Count 1s-5s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) Subscribing to False United States Individual Income Tax Returns
Count 24s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq. Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 25s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 26s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq. Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 27s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2 and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 28s-29s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq. Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 30s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud
Count 31s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 3551 et seq. Conspiracy to Commit Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 32s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344, 2, and 3551 et seq. Bank Fraud (FORFEITURE)
Count 6s-10s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2); 18 3551 et seq. Assisting in the Preparation of False United States Individual Income Tax Return
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 201 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF USE IMMUNITY FOR TRIAL TESTIMONY as to Cindy Laporta (Government Exhibit 2E). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 08/03/2018. (mpha)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Jury Trial Day 4 as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 8/3/2018. Brandon L. Van Grack, Greg D. Andres, and Uzo Asonye present on behalf of government, with Special Agent Sherine Ebadi, and Evan Binder (paralegal) present at counsel table. Defendant present w/ counsel Jay R. Nanavati, Thomas E. Zehnle, Brian Ketcham, Kevin M. Downing, and Richard Westling. Government continued to adduce evidence using evidence presentation system. Order of Use Immunity for Trial Testimony as to Cindy Laporta entered in open court. Jurors excused at 4:55PM and Jury Trial reset for 8/6/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris (AM) / Anneliese Thompson (PM).)(mpha, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 reply
      Reply by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [197] Opposition (Van Grack, Brandon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Trial Brief
        TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Van Grack, Brandon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Opposition
          Opposition by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [194] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument of Civil Tax Audits (Nanavati, Jay)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Jury Trial Day 3 as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 8/2/2018. Brandon L. Van Grack, Greg D. Andres, and Uzo Asonye present on behalf of government, with Special Agent Sherine Ebadi, and Evan Binder (paralegal) present at counsel table. Defendant present w/ counsel Jay R. Nanavati, Thomas E. Zehnle, Brian Ketcham, Kevin M. Downing, and Richard Westling. Government continued to adduce evidence using evidence presentation system. Jurors excused at 5:19PM and Jury Trial reset for 8/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris (AM) / Anneliese Thomson (PM))(mpha)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Exhibit
              GOVERNMENT'S SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Motion in Limine
                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument of Civil Tax Audits by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Van Grack, Brandon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 193 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Trial Brief
                  TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Van Grack, Brandon)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Jury Trial Day 2 as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 8/1/2018. Brandon L. Van Grack, Greg D. Andres, and Uzo Asonye present on behalf of government, with Special Agent Sherine Ebadi, and Evan Binder (paralegal) present at counsel table. Defendant present w/ counsel Jay R. Nanavati, Thomas E. Zehnle, Brian Ketcham, Kevin M. Downing, and Richard Westling. Government continued to adduce evidence using evidence presentation system. Jurors excused at 4:45PM and Jury Trial reset for 8/2/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson (AM) / Tonia Harris (PM))(mpha)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDERED that jurors in this matter shall be delivered a daily meal at the expense of the United States, with any bills or invoices to be submitted to the Clerk of the Court for payment. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/31/2018. (mpha)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Jury Trial Day 1 as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 7/31/2018. Brandon L. Van Grack, Greg D. Andres, and Uzo Asonye present on behalf of government, with Special Agent Rob Valdini, Special Agent Sherine Ebadi, and Evan Binder (paralegal) present at counsel table. Defendant present w/ counsel Jay R. Nanavati, Thomas E. Zehnle, Brian Ketcham, Kevin M. Downing, and Richard Westling, with Tim Wang (paralegal) and Spencer Ritchie (paralegal) present for counsel team. Jury appeared as summoned, Voir Dire held, jury sworn and empaneled (Jurors #0008, #0037, #0276, #0017, #0145, #0115, #0082, #0009, #0299, #0091, #0302, #0060, #0296A, #0054A, #0127A, #0133A). Selected juror list provided to the Clerks Office jury clerk. Opening statements made by both parties and rule invoked on witnesses. Government used evidence presentation system to adduce evidence. Jurors excused at 5:40PM and Jury Trial reset for 8/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Exhibit
                          GOVERNMENT'S FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  terminate deadlines and hearings
                            Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Pretrial conference held 7/31/2018 @ 9:00AM. (mpha)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDERED that the parties arc to appear for a pre-trial hearing at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, July 31, 2018.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/30/18. (kbar)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting the USA to use Court's Evidence Presentation System as to Paul J. Manfort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/30/18. (kbar)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion for use of courtroom technologyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [177] Motion for use of courtroom technology filed by Paul J. Manafort as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/30/18. (kbar, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion for use of courtroom technologyCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [178] Motion for use Court's Evidence Presentation System filed by USA as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/30/18. (kbar, ) Modified on 7/30/2018 (kbar, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Waiver of
                                      WAIVER of Appearance (July 23, 2018) by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Nanavati, Jay)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Waiver of
                                        WAIVER of Appearance (July 24, 2018) by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Nanavati, Jay)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 182 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Opposition
                                          Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [153] Supplemental MOTION in Limine (Asonye, Uzo)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice - other
                                            NOTICE Notice of Appearance as to third party witness Donna Duggan by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Authorization to bring electronic devices into courthouse)(Weber, David)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                              Set Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (kbar)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/29/2018, Entered: 7/29/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for the use of courtroom technology
                                                MOTION for the use of courtroom technology (request for authorization to bring electronic devices) by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDERED that defense counsel shall file the written waivers as represented in open court on or before Tuesday, 7/31/2018. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/27/2018. (rban, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for the use of courtroom technology
                                                    MOTION for the use of courtroom technology by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for the use of courtroom technology
                                                      MOTION for the use of courtroom technology by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 176 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re Jurors being excused. Objections, if any, due by noon on 7/30/2018. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/27/2018. (rban, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 175 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 witness list
                                                          WITNESS LIST by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 174 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                            Subpoenas issued. (kbar, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/24/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis. Court reporter/transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018.(harris, tonia)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motion Proceedings held on 7/23/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis. Court reporter/transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018.(harris, tonia)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 171 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [169] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). ORDERED that the government is DIRECTED to file its response to defendant's supplemental motion in limine by 7/30/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/27/2018. (rban, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 170 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall excuse the following 27 jurors from further service in this case: 0001, 0011, 0023, 0033, 0035, 0043, 0044, 0051, 0053, 0062, 0064, 0065, 0070, 0071, 0074, 0075, 0078, 0079, 0083, 0086, 0089, 0095, 0107, 0111, 0113, 0120, and 0139. These 27 jurors need not appear on Tuesday for oral voir dire. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/26/2018. (rban, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 169 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018, Terminated: 7/27/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [153] Supplemental MOTION in Limine by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Van Grack, Brandon)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                        STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Business Records of Bokkeeping and Tax Preparation Services (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Purchase of Audio/Visual System and Service (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B through D)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Renovation of Palm Beach Gardens, Florida Residence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Purchase of Landscaping Services (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A through I)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                              STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Business Records of Mercedes-Benz (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding $500,000 Wire (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Purchase of 1046 N. Edgewood Street, Arlington, VA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding 2012 Land Rover Purchase and Lease (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Purchase of 29 Howard Street, New York, NY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Rug Purchases (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Purchase of 377 Union Street, Brooklyn, NY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                            STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Business Records of Financial Institutions (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding FDIC Insured Status (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Email (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                  STIPULATION by USA and Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Tax Returns (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 153 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                    Supplemental MOTION in Limine by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-DD, # (2) Exhibit EE-FF, # (3) Exhibit GG-YY)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                    Subpoena issued. (kbar)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 151 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 response
                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [149] Order,,,,,, Request to Not Strike Three Prospective Jurors for Cause at this Time (Van Grack, Brandon)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER re: Jury Selection: that if If the parties disagree with excusing or striking any of the thirty jurors identified by the Court, they must file written objections on or before Thursday, July 26, 2018 at noon. If no objections are received, these jurors will be excused from further service in this case. Additionally, the Court will issue summonses to an additional twenty-five (25) jurors to appear on Friday, July 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. to complete the jury questionnaire. These additional twenty-five (25) jurors will be told by the Court's jury clerks to complete the questionnaire in the Jury Assembly Room. These jurors will not be greeted in open court on Friday; however, the questionnaire's opening instructions will be modified to encompass the oral instruction given by the Court yesterday - namely, that the prospective jurors cannot discuss this case with anyone or permit anyone to discuss the case with them. Nor may the prospective jurors disclose their answers to the questionnaire unless and until the Court directs otherwise. However, these additional jurors will not be instructed on the substance or nature of the case until Tuesday during voir dire and the substance of the jury questionnaire will not be changed in any way. The parties may obtain copies of these jurors' responses to the questionnaire from the Clerk's Office at 3:00 p.m. on Friday, July 27th These twenty-five jurors will be added to the panel of prospective jurors if they are not excused or stricken based on their responses to the questionnaire. Voir dire is still scheduled to begin at 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, July 31, 2018. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/25/18. (kbar, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER for the reasons stated from the BenchORDERED that the government's motion in limine to preclude defendant from presenting argument or evidence at trial that the Special Counsel was not authorized to prosecute this case is DENIED AS MOOT.ORDERED that the government's motion in limine to preclude defendant from presenting argument or evidence at trial that defendant was selectively or vindictively prosecuted is DENIED AS MOOT.ORDERED that the government's motion in limine to preclude defendant from presenting argument or evidence at trial that any former government investigation of defendant ended with a decision not to prosecute defendant is GRANTED.ORDERED that defendant's motion in limine to preclude the government from presenting argument or evidence at trial concerning any alleged collusion with the Russian government is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that defendant's motion in limine to preclude the government from presenting argument or evidence at trial concerning defendant's affiliation with the Trump campaign is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that defendant's motion in limine to preclude the government from presenting argument or evidence at trial concerning the charges that defendant is facing in D.C. is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that defendant's motion in limine to preclude the government from presenting argument or evidence at trial concerning defendant's recent remand into custody is DENIED AS MOOT.ORDERED that defendant's motion in limine to preclude the government from presenting argument or evidence at trial concerning the nature of defendant's work for the Ukraine, for Yanukovych, and for organizations associated with Yanukovych is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant is DIRECTED to file a supplemental memorandum by Thursday, July 26, 2018 at 5:00 p.m., attaching copies of the specific exhibits that defendant seeks to exclude. The government is DIRECTED to file a response to defendant's supplemental memorandum by Friday, July 27, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. If defendant identifies a significant number of exhibits in his supplemental memorandum and the government requires additional time to respond, the government should notify the Court promptly. (see order for full details)Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/24/2018. (mpha)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Status Conference as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 7/24/2018. Defendant present w/ counsel Thomas E. Zehnle, Kevin M. Downing, Jay R. Nanavati, and Richard Westling. Greg D. Andres, Uzo Asonye, and Brandon L. Van Grack present on behalf of USA. Matter comes on for Status Conference re: Jury Questionnaire. Jurors appeared and instructed. The Court represents matter to take no more than 3 weeks. Lists to be made public by the end of the week. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Docket Call and Motions in Limine as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. held on 7/24/2018. Defendant present w/ counsel Thomas E. Zehnle, Kevin M. Downing, Jay R. Nanavati, and Richard Westling. Greg D. Andres, Uzo Asonye, and Brandon L. Van Grack present on behalf of USA. Matters briefed, argued, and resolved. Seal to be lifted/removed and persons involved will be identified. Government to file list of witnesses and exhibits and provide copy to defendant today. Defendant Manafort excused and presence waived for afternoon hearing - waiver to be submitted in writing. The Court postpones commencement of trial and Jury Trial reset for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Defendant given until COB Thursday for filings and government given until Friday/Monday for response (depending on volume). Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha) Modified on 7/24/2018 - minute entry added (mpha)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [140] Motion for Pro hac vice for Brian Patrick Ketcham as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/23/18. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 145 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [130] Motion to Seal Docket Entries 133, 134,135, 136, and 137 as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/23/18. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                    Set Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Status Conference re: Jury Questionnaire set for 7/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/22/2018, Entered: 7/22/2018 Opposition
                                                                                                                      Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [143] Supplemental MOTION in Limine (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018, Terminated: 7/24/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION in Limine by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                          Reset Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Docket Call reset for 7/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                            Reset Deadline re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr.: Motion Hearing reset for 7/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                              Reset Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Docket Call reset for 7/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                Reset Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Motion Hearing reset for 7/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    TRIAL EXHIBIT CUSTODY FORM. Exhibits 1-436 returned to the USA. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Ketcham and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas Zehnle (Filing fee $ 75 receipt number 0422-6184473.) by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Proceedings held on 6/29/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis. Court reporter/transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2018.(harris, tonia)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 138 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Order on Motion for Change of VenueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [106] Motion for Change of Venue as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/17/18. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 134 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 133 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Immunity Motions and Proposed Orders by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 131 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [130] MOTION to Seal Immunity Motions (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Immunity Motions by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [122] Order, to Propose Changes to Court's Proposed Jury Questionnaire (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [122] Order, Proposed Changes to Proposed Jury Questionnaire (Van Grack, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                Per TSE chambers, Docket Call and Motions reset for 7/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [106] MOTION to Change Venue (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 126 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [111] Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Westling and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas Zehnle as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/13/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Reply by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [117] Opposition to Motion to Continue (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED that the parties shall have until 7/16/2018 at noon to propose any changes to the Court's proposed jury questionnaire. Any oral argument on the jury questionnaire will be heard on Tuesday, 7/17/2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/11/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                                                                                          Subpoena issued. (kbar)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 117 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [109] MOTION to Continue Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Set Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Docket Call re: Oral Argument on the Jury Questionnaire set for 7/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Order on Motion to SuppressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [47] Motion to Suppress as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/2018. (rban, ) (Main Document 123 replaced on 7/12/2018) (rban, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that defendant's [116] motion is DENIED opposing his transfer to the Alexandria Detention Center. It is further ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall comply with the Court's previous Order directing that defendant be transported from Northern Neck Regional Jail to be housed in the Alexandria Detention Center pending trial. It is further ORDERED that to the extent practically possible, defendant should be permitted to meet and confer with his attorneys at least eight (8) hours per day during the next two (2) weeks leading up to trial as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/18. (c/s to USMS) (kbar)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED that the parties shall appear for oral argument on these two motions (Docs. 106 and 109) on Tuesday, July 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/18. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                        Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr for 7/10/18 (kbar )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION re [113] Order, Regarding Place of Detention by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay) Modified on 7/11/2018 (krob, ). Modified on 7/11/2018 (kbar, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the United States Marshal for the EDVA shall promptly transport the defendant from Northern Neck Regional Jail to the Alexandria Detention Center where he shall remain pending trial. It is further ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall notify chambers as soon as the defendant arrives at the Alexandria Detention Center as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/2018. (lcre, )(c/s to USMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER- It is ORDERED that the government shall have until Friday, July 13, 2018 at 5:00p.m. to respond re [106] MOTION to Change Venue filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr., [109] MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/10/2018. (lcre, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Order on Motion to SuppressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [45] Motion to Suppress as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/9/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/9/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 7/13/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Westling and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas Zehnle (Filing fee $ 75 receipt number 0422-6168177.) by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [109] MOTION to Continue Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Appeal Brief)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Trial by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [43] MOTION for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter of January 23, 2018, # (2) Exhibit Letter of February 21, 2018, # (3) Exhibit Greenaway Electronic Communication, # (4) Exhibit Pfeiffer Electronic Communication)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [106] MOTION to Change Venue (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 motion to change venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Change Venue by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [93] MOTION in Limine (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance and Motion for Order that Defendant Not Be Transported by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, for the reasons stated from the Bench, that the government's Motion for Use of Jury Questionnaire [87] is DENIED; that defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count 11 of the Superseding Indictment [41] is DENIED AS MOOT given defendant's withdrawal of the motion at the hearing; that defendant's motion for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks [43], Motion to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit [45], and Motion to Suppress Evidence from Residence [47] are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/29/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final EXHIBIT LIST and WITNESS LIST by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Exhibits maintained in Clerk's Office) (awac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr held on 6/29/2018 re [43] MOTION for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr., [41] MOTION to Dismiss Count Eleven filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr., [83] MOTION for Discovery Order filed by USA, [45] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr., [47] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Residence filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr., [87] MOTION for Use of Juror Questionnaire filed by USA. USA appeared through Uzo Asonye, Scott Meisler, Greg Andres. Defendant represented by Thomas Zehnle, Jay Nanavati and Kevin Downing. Counsel present arguments. Government calls witness. Court makes rulings and takes certain matters under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter T. Harris.)(awac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brandon Lang Van Grack appearing for USA. (Van Grack, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/26/2018. (lcre, ) (Main Document 97 replaced on 6/27/2018) (jlan, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [30] Motion to Dismiss as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1) Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/26/2018. (lcre, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [94] Notice of Waiver of Appearance at June 29, 2018 Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/26/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance and Motion for Order that Defendant Not Be Transported by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 7/24/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Paul J. Manafort, Jr Regarding Juror Questionnaire (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Andrew Meisler appearing for USA. (Meisler, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 7/24/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Use of Juror Questionnaire by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank Subpoenas issued for hearing on 07/25/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Opposition by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [81] Status Report (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [82] Motion to Continue as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/11/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Discovery Order by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Richard W. Gates. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Discovery Order)(Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Jury Trial set for 7/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018, Terminated: 6/11/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue Trial to July 25, 2018 by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Revoke or Revise Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Current Order of Pretrial Release in District of Columbia by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for June 8, 2018 has been rescheduled to Friday, June 29, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. re [41] Motion to Dismiss, [43] Motion for Hearing, [45] Motion to Suppress, and [47] Motion to Suppress as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Motion Hearing reset for 6/29/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/1/2018. (lcre, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam C. Jed appearing for USA. (Jed, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Per TSE chambers, Motions Hearing [41], [43], [45], and [47] reset for 6/8/2018 at 08:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED that the jury trial currently scheduled to begin on Tuesday, July 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to Tuesday, July 24, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/25/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Jury Trial set for 7/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [61] Response in Opposition to Motion for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended REPLY TO RESPONSE by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [67] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit. (Nanavati, Jay) Modified on 5/21/2018 (lcre, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [66] Response to Motion to Dismiss Count Eleven (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [65] Response in Opposition to Motion Suppress Evidence from Residence (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [67] Response in Opposition to Motion to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, May 25, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to Friday, June 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/18/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  terminate hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminated motion hearing set for 5/25/18 per court order. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Unredacted Memorandum by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Richard W. Gates re [52] Motion Hearing,, (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Memorandum in Opposition filed by USA re: [47] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Residence filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(krob) Modified on 5/15/2018 (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE and SEALED Supplement to Government's [43] Memorandum in Opposition filed by USA. (krob, ) Modified on 5/15/2018 (krob, ). (Main Document 69 replaced on 5/15/2018) (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE and Sealed Motion by USA, as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(krob) Modified on 5/15/2018 (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [45] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [41] MOTION to Dismiss Count Eleven (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [47] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Residence [Redacted] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Government's Motion to Seal by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [62] MOTION to Seal AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF THE GOVERNMENTS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.S MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE AND FRUITS FROM THE SEARCH OF HIS RESIDENCE (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF THE GOVERNMENTS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.S MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE AND FRUITS FROM THE SEARCH OF HIS RESIDENCE by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [43] MOTION for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Motion [58] to Modify Conditions of Release as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1): Upon consideration of Defendant Paul J. Manafort's motion to modify his conditions of release to attend his grandson's baptism ceremony and related family reception on May 19, 2018 from 9:00 a.m. to 5:00 p.m., it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/11/2018. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Exhibits A-B re [46] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(lcre, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/11/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [56] MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Motion to Suppress (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Motion to Suppress by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/4/18, before Judge T.S. Ellis, III. Court reporter/transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2018.(montgomery, rhonda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jay Rohit Nanavati appearing for Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Nanavati, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment, (Doc. 30) is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/4/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr held on 5/4/2018 re: Defendant's Motion [30] to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment. Defendant present w/ counsel Thomas E. Zehnle and Kevin M. Downing. Andrew A. Weissmann, Greg D. Andres, Michael R. Dreeben, and Uzo Asonye present on behalf of USA. Matter briefed, argued, and taken under advisement. Government to file ex parte/under seal a complete copy of the August 2nd memorandum within 2 weeks. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery)(mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael R. Dreeben appearing for USA. (Dreeben, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Subpoena issued. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Uzo Asonye appearing for USA. (Asonye, Uzo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [47] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Residence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Residence by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [45] MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 7/9/2018 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Storage Unit by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [43] MOTION for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing Regarding Government Leaks by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [41] MOTION to Dismiss Count Eleven (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Count Eleven by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [30] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [35] Motion to Seal as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/12/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Exhibit filed by USA. (krob, ) Modified on 4/16/2018 to correct the filer. (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [35] MOTION to Seal (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [35] MOTION to Seal (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/12/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr [30] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Notice of Hearing Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Date set for 5/4/2018 re [30] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr re [30] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Service, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Subpoena(s) Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank Subpoenas issued for hearing on 07/10/2018. (jlan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  notice of correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date re [30] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment (krob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [29] Motion for Protective Order as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/27/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018, Terminated: 6/26/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018, Terminated: 3/27/2018 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Waiver of
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER of Speedy Trial Rights by Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas E. Zehnle appearing for Paul J. Manafort, Jr (Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/08/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis. Court reporter/transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018.(harris, tonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED that defendant is RELEASESD pending trial pursuant to the following conditions as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/9/2018. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Arraignment held on 3/8/2018. Defendant present w/ counsel Kevin M. Downing & David G. Barger. Greg D. Andres and Andrew A. Weissmann present on behalf of USA. Defendant WFA, PNG, and demanded trial by jury. Speedy trial waived and parties to submit agreed signed order. Motions to be filed by 4/30/2018 w/ local rules to govern responses. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2018 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM (govt estimates 8-10 days and 20-25 witnesses) before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Government argues defendant is a risk of flight; requests defendant be released on $10 million bond w/ electronic monitoring as he has significant ties abroad. Defense argues combination of bond and monitoring far exceed conditions needed. Defendant ordered to home confinement w/ electronic monitoring through EDVA USPO. Defendant may only leave for the following conditions: to consult or visit w/ counsel; medical emergencies/doctors appointments; religious obligation days and service. Proposed Jury Instructions/Voir Dire/Motions in Limine to be filed by June 22, 2018 COB - hearing set for Friday, June 29, 2018, time TBD. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22] Motion for Pro hac vice for Kevin Mitchel Downing as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/8/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018, Terminated: 3/8/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Mitchel Downing and Certification of Local Counsel David Barger by Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Motion in Limine Hearing set for 6/29/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr.: Due to inclement weather, Arraignment previously set for 3/2/2018 @ 1:30PM reset for 3/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr.: Due to inclement weather, Arraignment previously set for 3/2/2018 @ 1:30PM reset for 3/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [16] Motion to Dismiss the superseding Indictment as to Richard W. Gates and [19] Motion to Continue is denied as moot as to Richard W. Gates (2). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/1/18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Defendant/Other Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISMISSAL OF COUNTS per the filing of the superseding indictment of Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr, Richard W. Gates (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Certificate of Service)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Arraignment (Unopposed) by Richard W. Gates. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Green, Griffith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Griffith Lowell Green appearing for Richard W. Gates (Green, Griffith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrew A. Weissmann appearing for USA. (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Charges Against Defendant Richard W. Gates III Without Prejudice by USA as to Richard W. Gates. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Greg D. Andres appearing for USA. (Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Indictment-Redacted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Redacted Indictment as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docketed in error and removed. Modified on 2/26/2018 (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arraignment set for 3/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018, Terminated: 2/26/2018 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docketed in error and removed. (krob, ) Modified on 2/26/2018 (krob, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (krob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (1) count(s) 1s-5s, 6s-10s, 11s-14s, 24s, 25s, 26s, 27s, 28s-29s, 30s, 31s, 32s, Richard W. Gates (2) count(s) 6-10, 15-19, 20, 21-23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28-29, 30, 31, 32. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  terminate deadlines and hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Per TSE chambers, Arraignment previously set for 2/23/2018 @ 9:00AM removed from docket. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED Summons Issued in case as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr: Arraignment set for 2/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Summons issuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued in case as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. Arraignment set for 2/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (krob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion to Seal Case until further order of Court as to Paul J. Manafort Jr. (1). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/13/18. (krob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Paul J. Manafort, Jr (1) count(s) 1-5, 6-9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14-15, 16, 17, 18. (krob, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 292 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?