USA v. Kyriacou et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00102-KAM

Tags
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 10:46 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Adrian Baron, Defendant
No Logo Aristos Aristodemou, Defendant
No Logo Arvinsingh Canaye, Defendant
No Logo Beaufort Management Services LTD, Defendant
No Logo Beaufort Securities LTD, Defendant
No Logo Linda Bullock, Defendant
No Logo Loyal Agency and Trust Corp., Defendant
No Logo Loyal Bank LTD, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Green, Defendant
No Logo Panayiotis Kyriacou, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 9/11/18 until 11/18/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/12/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Tremonte appearing for Loyal Bank LTD, and Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (Galeano, Sonia)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Status Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Status Conference as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. held on 9/12/2018. Appearances: AUSA: David Gopstein appeared on behalf of the government, while Michael Tremonte represented the Loyal Entities. Mr. Tremonte reported that he has received authorization to act on the Loyal Entities behalf. The court granted the parties request for an extension of time until 11/16/18, in the interest of justice, and to allow the parties with time to discuss a resolution of this action with the government. The court scheduled the status conference for 11/16/18 at 10:30a.m. in courtroom 6c south before Judge Matsumoto.(Court Reporter David Roy.) (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: AUSA David Gopstein/Michael Keilty. Defense Counsel: Avni Praful Patel. Change of Plea Hearing as to Adrian Baron held on 9/11/2018, Plea entered by Adrian Baron (3) Guilty Count 5s. (Sentencing set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto.) Transcript Ordered. Counsel are advised that they are expected to follow Federal Rule 32 with regard to objections to or correcting the Presentence Report (PSR). Opposing counsel must respond to the PSR within two weeks. PSR objections must directed to the probation officer, but need not be filed via ecf. Sentencing motions/submissions (apart from PSR objections) shall be submitted as follows: defendant's submissions shall be filed bv 11/21/2018, and the government must respond by 11/28/2018, reply if any, by the defendant, shall be served and filed bv 12/2/2018. The court respectfully request that the parties shall serve chambers with two hard courtesy copies of all sentencing related materials and onecopy served on the probation department. The Probation Department is respectfully requested to expedite the PSR. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Galeano, Sonia)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Status Conference
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Status Conference as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. held on 9/11/2018. Due to counsel on behalf of the Loyal Entities failure to appear at the scheduled 9/11/18 conference, the court orders that all parties shall appear tomorrow, September 12, 2018 at 1:00p.m. for a status conference in courtroom 6c south before Judge Matsumoto. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
            LREF
            Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 9/4/18 until 9/11/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/4/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
              LREF
              Blank  Set Hearings
              ORDER granting [49] Letter Clarifying Adjournment Request. Status Conference reset for 9/11/2018 at 11:30a.m. in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/4/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 letter
                Letter Clarifying Adjournment Request as to Adrian Baron (Patel, Avni)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 letter
                  Letter Request for Adjournment as to Adrian Baron (Patel, Avni)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                    ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Adrian Baron Time excluded from 9/4/2018 until 9/11/2018, SCHEDULING ORDER as to Adrian Baron. The guilty plea hearing scheduled for September 4, 2018 at 12:00 noon is adjourned to September 11, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6C South, United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. In light of the parties on going plea discussions and negotiations, time is excluded from the speedy trial clock until 9/11/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/31/2018. (Flores, Diego)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                      ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 8/22/2018 until 9/4/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/22/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                        ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD Time excluded from 8/22/2018 until 9/4/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/22/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Adrian Baron Time excluded from 8/22/2018 until 9/4/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/22/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Status Conference
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Status Conference as to Adrian Baron, Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. held on 8/22/2018. In light of the parties on going plea discussions and negotiations, time is excluded from the speedy trial clock until 9/4/2018. All parties shall appear for a guilty plea hearing on the next status conference on 9/4/2018 at 12:00 noon in courtroom 6c south before Judge Matsumoto. (Court Reporter Stacy Mace.) (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John F. Curran appearing for Adrian Baron (Curran, John)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Adrian Baron Time excluded from 8/6/2018 until 8/22/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/6/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 8/6/2018 until 8/22/2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/6/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Avni Praful Patel appearing for Adrian Baron (Almonte, Giselle)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Status Conference as to Adrian Baron, Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. held on 8/6/2018. Counsel on behalf of the government reported that it has provided the defendants with a large portion of Rule 16 discovery. The parties reported that they are engaging in plea negotiations, which they hope will result in a disposition of this case short of trial. In the event negotiations fail, the Court will schedule a trial date at the next status conference. The Court ordered the parties to appear for another status conference on 8/22/2018 at 12 noon in courtroom 6c south before Judge Matsumoto. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                        Attorney update in case as to Adrian Baron. Attorney Avni Praful Patel for Adrian Baron added. (Almonte, Giselle)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: AUSA Michael Keilty. Federal Defender: James Darrow. Change of Plea Hearing as to Arvinsingh Canaye held on 7/26/2018, Plea entered by Arvinsingh Canaye (2) Guilty Count 2s. Court finds factual basis for the plea. Transcript Ordered. Counsel are advised that they are expected to follow Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 32 with regards to objections, corrections or comments to the Presentence Report (PSR). Defense counsel must respond to PSR within two weeks of receipt of the psr, the government wall respond one week thereafter. PSR objections shall be directed to the probation officer, but need not be filed via ecf. Sentencing motions/submissions or letters of support on behalf of the defendant (apart from PSR objections) shall be submitted as follows: Counsel on behalf of the defendant shall file a sentencing memoranda by close of business on 10/29/18. the government will respond bv 11/5/2018, any reply by the defendant shall be served and filed electronically by close of business on 11/12/2018. (Sentencing set for 11/20/2018 at 11:10 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto.) (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk.) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                            ORDER OF DETENTION as to Adrian Baron. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/18/2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak: AUSA Michael Keilty. Defense Counsel: John Curran. Status Conference as to Adrian Baron held on 7/18/2018. Gov't status that they believe the deft is bailable, however the details of the bond need to be finalized before they would agree to release. Defense counsel states that he has some of the bond details complete while others are being worked upon. Court suggests that the details of the bond be complete before it would consider release. Order of Detention entered. (Status Conference set for 8/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto.) (FTR Log #11:23-11:38.) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Adrian Baron. Bond/Bail Hearing set for 7/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2A South before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak.(Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/13/2018). (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr: AUSA Michael Keilty and David Gopstein. Defense Counsel: John Curran. Arraignment as to Adrian Baron (3) Count 2s,5s of the Superseding Indictment held on 7/13/2018. Initial Appearance as to Adrian Baron held on 7/13/2018. Detention Hearing as to Adrian Baron held on 7/13/2018. Temporary Order of Detention Issued. Bail Hearing set for 7/18/18 at 11:00 a.m.- at the request of defense counsel. (FTR Log #2:21-2:25.) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 letter
                                                    Letter requesting adjournment as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (Keilty, Michael)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 7/12/18 until 8/6/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/11/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Order
                                                        ORDER as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. granting [34] Letter. In light of the parties ongoing plea negotiations, the status conference previously scheduled for 7/12/18 has been adjourned until 8/6/2018 at 10:00a.m. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/11/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Arvinsingh Canaye Time excluded from 6/15/18 until 7/27/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/10/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                            ORDER granting [29] Motion to Continue as to Arvinsingh Canaye (2). The Court grants the modification as follows: Defendants motion due by July 27, 2018; governments response due by August 17, 2018; reply, if any, due by August 24, 2018. Time is excluded from the speedy trial clock until 7/27/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/10/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 letter
                                                              Letter requesting adjournment as to Arvinsingh Canaye (Keilty, Michael)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Time excluded from 6/19/18 until 7/12/18. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/19/2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: AUSA Michael Keilty. Defense Counsel: Michael Tremonte for Defts Loyal Bank and Loyal Agency and Trust. Arraignment as to Loyal Bank LTD (9) Count 2s and Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (10) Count 2s held on 6/19/2018, Initial Appearance as to Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. held on 6/19/2018, Plea entered by Loyal Bank LTD (9) Count 2,2s and Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (10) Count 2,2s. by Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. Not Guilty on ALL COUNTS of the Superseding Indictment. Order of Speedy Trial entered: Start 6/19, Stop 7/12/18. (FTR Log #11:06-11:09.) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                    Consent MOTION to Continue by Arvinsingh Canaye. (Darrow, James)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Set Hearings
                                                                      ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the status conference scheduled for 7/16/2018 is hereby adjourned to 7/12/2018 at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/11/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Set Hearings
                                                                        ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the status conference scheduled for 7/16/2018 is hereby adjourned to 7/12/2018 at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/11/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                          ORDER: The Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp shall schedule the arraignment and exclude speedy trial time before the duty Magistrate Judge for May 30, 2018. The parties shall contact the Court's deputy for a status conference date. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/29/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                            ORDER granting [28] Motion to Continue as to Arvinsingh Canaye. The parties shall comply with the revised briefing schedule: The defendant shall file and serve his motions by 6/15/2018, the government shall file its opposition by 7/16/2018, and the defendant shall file his reply, if any, by 7/30/2018. (2) Oral Argument is scheduled for 8/17/2018 at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/29/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                                                              ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Arvinsingh Canaye Time excluded from 5/25/18 until 6/15/18.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/29/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                Consent MOTION to Continue pre-motion schedule by three weeks by Arvinsingh Canaye. (Darrow, James)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                                                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Arvinsingh Canaye Time excluded from 4/24/18 until 5/25/18.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/24/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Status Conference as to Arvinsingh Canaye held on 4/24/2018. The following were discussed and/ordered: (1) Although plea negotiations are ongoing, the defendant requested a motion schedule to sever, and to dismiss for failure to state a crime. The defendant would like to move for a bail package, but he is indigent and has no contacts in the United States. For speedy trial purposes, this case has been designated as complex. For purposes of the motion, the parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: The defendant shall file and serve his motions by 5/25/2018, the government shall file its opposition by 6/25/2018, and the defendant shall file his reply, if any, by 7/9/2018. (2) Oral Argument is scheduled for 7/27/2018 at 11:00a.m. (3) The Loyal Entities shall appear to be Arraigned on 5/30/2018 at 12:00p.m. before the undersigned, or before the Magistrate Judge on duty. The Court respectfully requests that the parties serve chambers with two hard courtesy copies of all motion submissions. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Yu Han appearing for Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (Han, Yu)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Knuts appearing for Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (Knuts, Robert)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: AUSA Michael Keilyt and David Gopstein. Defense Counsel: James Darrow. Case called. Status Conference held as to deft. Arraignment as to Arvinsingh Canaye (2) Count 1s,2s,4s held on 3/27/2018, Plea entered by Arvinsingh Canaye Not Guilty on ALL COUNTS OF THE SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT. Order of Excludable Delay entered as to deft. Code Type: XT Start 3/27/18, Stop 4/24/18. The parties are engaging in plea negotiations, which they believe will result in a disposition of this case without trial. The court ordered the parties to appear for another Status Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. All parties consented to an Order of Excludable Delay from 3/27/18 until 4/24/18. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Arvinsingh Canaye Time excluded from 3/27/18 until 4/24/18. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/27/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: 3/24/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Darrow appearing for Arvinsingh Canaye (Darrow, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Set Hearings
                                                                                                ORDER: Status Conference as to Arvinsingh Canaye reset for 3/27/2018 at 03:00p.m. in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/23/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 indictment
                                                                                                  SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (S-1) as to Panayiotis Kyriacou (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, Arvinsingh Canaye (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, Adrian Baron (3) count(s) 2s, 5s, Linda Bullock (4) count(s) 2s, 5s, Aristos Aristodemou (5) count(s) 3s, Matthew Green (6) count(s) 3s, Beaufort Securities LTD (7) count(s) 1s, 2s, Beaufort Management Services LTD (8) count(s) 1s, 2s, Loyal Bank LTD (9) count(s) 2s, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (10) count(s) 2s. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER as to Arvinsingh Canaye: That the US Marshal's Service for the EDNY accept a pair of prescription eyeglasses that were seized from the deft upon his arrest, and that these be provided to the deft who is being held in the EDNY Courthouse holding cells. (Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2018) (Attachments: # (1) Letter dated March 15, 2018) (2) Certified Copies of this Order forwarded to the USMS-EDNY via personal delivery on 3/16/18. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jan Alison Rostal appearing for Arvinsingh Canaye (Rostal, Jan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Arvinsingh Canaye.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/6/2018. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: AUSA Michael Keilty. Federal Defender: Michael Padden. Detention Hearing as to Arvinsingh Canaye held on 3/6/2018. Order of Detention entered. (FTR Log #2:28-2:30.) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Norwich Gopstein appearing for USA. (Gopstein, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Arvinsingh Canaye. Bond Hearing set for 3/6/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/2/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) Modified on 3/6/2018 (Tavarez, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Arvinsingh Canaye. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY - Ends of Justice as to Arvinsingh Canaye. Time excluded from 3/2/2018 until 4/6/2018.SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/2/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Arraignment as to Arvinsingh Canaye (2) Count 1,2 held on 3/2/2018. Appearances: AUSA Michael Keity and AUSA David Gopstein appeared on behalf of United States. Michael Padden, esq. appeared on behalf of defendant. Plea entered by Arvinsingh Canaye (2) Count 1,2; Not Guilty on counts 1,2. Temporary Order of Detention Issued. Bail hearing set for 3/6/2018 at 2:00 pm. Order of Excludable Delay entered. Status Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Status Control date set for 4/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2A. (FTR Log #3:03-3:12.) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Arvinsingh Canaye. Attorney Michael P. Padden for Arvinsingh Canaye added. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Order Reassigning Judge
                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to Panayiotis Kyriacou, Arvinsingh Canaye, Adrian Baron, Linda Bullock, Aristos Aristodemou, Matthew Green, Beaufort Securities LTD, Beaufort Management Services LTD, Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp.. Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/2/2018. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Order that the Above Captioned Matter be Unsealed as to Panayiotis Kyriacou, Arvinsingh Canaye, Adrian Baron, Linda Bullock, Aristos Aristodemou, Matthew Green, Beaufort Securities LTD, Beaufort Management Services LTD, Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/1/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Panayiotis Kyriacou, Arvinsingh Canaye, Adrian Baron, Linda Bullock, Aristos Aristodemou, Matthew Green, Beaufort Securities LTD, Beaufort Management Services LTD, Loyal Bank LTD, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp.: It is ordered that the government may disclose the Indictment and arrest warrants in the above-captioned matter to law enforcement in the United Kingdom, Hungary, Saint Vincent and the Grenadines and Mauritius. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/27/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Sealing Cover Sheet) (Fernandez, Erica)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                              SEALED INDICTMENT as to Panayiotis Kyriacou (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Arvinsingh Canaye (2) count(s) 1, 2, Adrian Baron (3) count(s) 2, Linda Bullock (4) count(s) 2, Aristos Aristodemou (5) count(s) 3, Matthew Green (6) count(s) 3, Beaufort Securities LTD (7) count(s) 1, 2, Beaufort Management Services LTD (8) count(s) 1, 2, Loyal Bank LTD (9) count(s) 2, Loyal Agency and Trust Corp. (10) count(s) 2. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet, # (2) Sealing Cover Sheet) (Fernandez, Erica)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 313 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?