Bank of New York v. Mandap
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01562

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2019 at 7:52 PM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 . STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Bank of New York filed by Bank of New York. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Lis Pendens
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?