Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ramesh Sunny Balwani
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01603

Tags
Last Updated June 30, 2021 at 4:23 PM DT (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Wai-Chung Chan +1 415 705 2451 chanjes@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Balwani, Ramesh, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ramesh Sunny Balwani"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey B Coopersmith +1 206 757 8020 +1 206 757 7020 jeffcoopersmith@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly Michelle Gorton +1 415 276 6580 +1 415 276 4880 kellygorton@dwt.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Order Staying Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 133 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Exhibits
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/17/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/2/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/11/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES (RE: SEC V. HOLMES, ET AL., CASE NO. 18-CV-1602-EJD). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/25/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Michelle Gorton (Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bruce Coopersmith (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Service waived by Ramesh Sunny Balwani waiver sent on 3/14/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Ramesh Sunny Balwani. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins is the referral judge. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Filing Fee: $400.00-WAIVED) against Ramesh "Sunny" Balwani. Filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) Modified on 3/14/2018 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?