Olympus Insurance Company v. Bull
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:18-cv-80351

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 3:18 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Palm Beach County, Florida. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Hearing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Clerks Appointment of Mediator
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Remand
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Court Practice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?