Castro v. Gudorf
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00081

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 1:18 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
    DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO VACATE PRELIMINARY TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND DISMISS THIS ACTION (DOC. # 12 ); DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; JUDGMENT TO ENTER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 9/25/2018. (srb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Motion to vacate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Motion to vacate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Motion to Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio Pro Hac vice Rules as to Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Remark
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?