United States v. FINESSE MILLS, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01757

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 7:27 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Moore +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 7009 tom.moore@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo FINESSE MILLS, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/31/2018. Status Conference set for 7/19/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 5 Order to Show Cause, Declaration Of Jerry Perrien (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED AS MODIFIED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/31/2018 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/30/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
              Civil Cover Sheet by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed byUNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] The civil cover sheet filed is outdated. Please find the updated civil cover sheet at www.cand.uscourts.gov and re-file in its entirety using the event civil cover sheet. Re:[1-2] Civil cover sheet filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?