United States v. 65,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02324

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 11:35 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Judgment ConsentCourt Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE by Judge Christina A. Snyder : The United States of America shall have judgment as to $62,000.00 of the defendant currency and all interest earned on the entirety of the defendant currency sinceseizure, and no othe r person or entity shall have any right, title or interest therein. The United States is ordered to dispose of said funds in accordance with law. $3,000.00 of the defendant currency, without interest, shall be returned to Garland through his cou nsel.The United States Marshals Service shall release said funds by wire transfer to Garlands counsel Each of the parties shall bear its own fees and costs in connection with the seizure, retention and return of the defendant currency.( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Warrant for Seizure Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?