Marathon Asset Management, L.P. v. Demos
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:18-mc-00035

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 1:06 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marathon Asset Management, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
v.
No Logo David Demos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Lincoln Chambers, Jr. +1 860 231 9535 +1 860 233 8276 michael_chambers_jr@yahoo.com
Citation Motion to Quash
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the plaintiff's motion to quash (Doc. No. 7 and Doc. No. 12 ) is being granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/20/2018. (Cole-Chu, H.) Modified on 4/24/2018 to include links to Doc. Nos. 7 and 12 (Ferguson, L.).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Marathon's Motion to Seal (Doc. No. 18 ) is hereby GRANTED because the exhibit in question consists of "confidential" records subject to the protective order in the underlying criminal case (see Doc. No. 27 in United States v. David Demos, 16-cr-220). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/20/2018. (Cole-Chu, H.) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 by Marathon Asset Management, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Patrick)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
        Sealed Document: EXHIBIT 1 by Marathon Asset Management, L.P. re 16 Reply to Response to Motion, . (Allen, Patrick)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
          REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel (CORRECTED), 7 MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Marathon Asset Management, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Patrick)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
            First Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel (CORRECTED), 7 MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by David Demos. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Chambers, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lincoln Chambers, Jr on behalf of David Demos (Chambers, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE: Marathon Asset Management, L.P.'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Compel/Support of Cross-Motion to Quash (Doc. Nos. 7 and 12 ) is a combined document that (1) opposes a motion to compel filed by defendant David Demos in United States v. David Demos (See Doc. No. 263 in 3:16-cr-220-AWT) and (2) moves to quash a subpoena in this case. The court hereby notifies the parties that it has issued an order denying the motion to compel in United States v. David Demos (See Doc. No. 288 in 3:16-cr-220-AWT). Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/10/2018. (Cole-Chu, H.) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel (CORRECTED) by Marathon Asset Management, L.P..Responses due by 4/26/2018 (Allen, Patrick)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER: Marathon's Motion to Seal (Doc. No. 10 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk shall place Doc. Nos. 8 and 9 under seal. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/05/2018. (Cole-Chu, H.) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Seal Unredacted Exhibits B and J in support of Motion to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel by Marathon Asset Management, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Allen, Patrick)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        Sealed Document: Sealed Exhibit J by Marathon Asset Management, L.P. re 7 MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel . (Allen, Patrick)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Sealed Document: Sealed Exhibit B by Marathon Asset Management, L.P. . (Allen, Patrick)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Quash /Opposition to Motion to Compel by Marathon Asset Management, L.P..Responses due by 4/25/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P)(Allen, Patrick)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: The Motion for Date Certain for Non-Party Marathon Asset Management, L.P. to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel/Motion to Quash Subpoena (Doc. No. 1 ) is hereby GRANTED. Marathon Asset Management shall file an opposition to David Demos's motion to compel compliance/a cross-motion to quash by April 4, 2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/02/2018. (Cole-Chu, H.) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/29/2018. (Shafer, J.)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Related Case by Marathon Asset Management, L.P. (Allen, Patrick)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/23/2018.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D Allen on behalf of Marathon Asset Management, L.P. (Allen, Patrick)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Motion to Quash Subpoena
                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena MOTION FOR DATE CERTAIN TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL/MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-4767428), filed by Marathon Asset Management, L.P.Responses due by 4/13/2018 (Allen, Patrick) Modified on 3/23/2018 (Walker, A).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Add and Terminate Judges
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?