United States v. GREENWAY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00683

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2021 at 6:40 PM ST (3.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Elizabeth Nash +1 202 307 6489 +1 202 514 6866 ann.e.nash@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Elizabeth Nash +1 202 307 6489 +1 202 514 6866 ann.e.nash@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo TAMARA PETRA GREENWAY, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Status report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against TAMARA PETRA GREENWAY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Nash, Ann)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 9 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?