Lightwire, LLC v. Lead By Sales, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00722

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2019 at 8:36 AM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lead By Sales, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank R. Jakes +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 frankj@jpfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Messa +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 zacharym@jpfirm.com
No Logo Lightwire LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayrobinson Pa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Patrick Crosby +1 954 761 8111 +1 954 761 8112 kevin.crosby@gray-robinson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. McFetridge +1 813 273 5000 william.mcfetridge@gray-robinson.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of mediation conference/hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Case Management Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Case Management Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                            CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Lead By Sales, LLC. (Messa, Zachary)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Answer
                              ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Lightwire, LLC by Lead By Sales, LLC.(Jakes, Frank)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by William F. McFetridge on behalf of Lightwire, LLC (McFetridge, William)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                  CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Lightwire, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Red Dragon Innovations, LLC, Other Affiliate 2s Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate ALY Ventures, LLC for Lightwire, LLC.. (Crosby, Kevin)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Notice of pendency of related cases
                                    NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lightwire, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Crosby, Kevin)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Lead By Sales, LLC answer or response due 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/30/2018. (Wilson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Lead By Sales, LLC by Lightwire, LLC (Crosby, Kevin) Modified text on 4/25/2018 (CTR).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Dkt. 1) by Lead By Sales, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) Modified event type on 4/20/2018 (CTR).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Frank R. Jakes on behalf of Lead By Sales, LLC (Jakes, Frank)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/28/2018. (BGS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - PATENT track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/28/2018. (BGS)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Complaint) (LNR)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS issued as to Lead By Sales, LLC. (LNR) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          COMPLAINT against Lead By Sales, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA49640) filed by Lightwire, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?