ANTONIAK v. ARMSTRONG
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01263

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 14, 2020 at 2:30 PM EDT (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/4/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/27/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Suspense Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Transfer
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/16/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT TO STRIKE IMMATERIAL, IMPERTINENT, AND SCANDALOUS ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/19/18. 7/19/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT TO STRIKE IMMATERIAL, IMPERTINENT, AND SCANDALOUS ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/19/18. 7/19/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?