USA v. Nejad
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00224-AJN
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 11, 2020 at 5:14 PM DT (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew James DeFilippis +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2527 andrew.defilippis@usdoj.gov
Space Matthew Joseph Laroche +1 212 637 2420 +1 212 637 2527 matthew.laroche@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/19/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2
Citation Section 50 U.S.C. § 1705.F
Offense Level 4
501705.F CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE THE INTERNATIONAL EMERGENCY ECONOMIC POWERS ACT
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344A.F BANK FRAUD
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT BANK FRAUD
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT MONEY LAUNDERING
Defendant Custody Status Custody Other Jurisdiction
Flag ECF
  Entries (404) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 350 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: 6/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: On or before June 18, 2020, the Government is ordered to respond to Mr. Sadr's submission, including his specific suggestion for the appropriate mechanism for dismissal, as outlined in Dkt. No. 349. The Government's submission must also include specific answers to the following questions: 1. List all material in the case that was potentially improperly withheld from the defense. a. For each item responding to 1, indicate all Government attorneys who were responsible for the disclosure failures, including supervisors. b. For each item responding to 1, indicate whether the Government agrees or disagrees that the withholding of the item was intentional withholding of exculpatory evidence. (Responses due by 6/18/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/9/2020) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/7/2020, Entered: 6/7/2020 response
    RESPONSE by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [348] Letter filed by USA . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Order from United States v. Stevens, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, Bahram Karimi addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from USAO-SDNY dated June 5, 2020 re: Nolle prosequi Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Nolle prosequi)(Bove, Emil)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Emil Joseph Bove, III appearing for USA. (Bove, Emil)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated June 3, 2020 re: Reply to Government Letter of May 28 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K)(Heberlig, Brian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 letterCourt Filing
          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated May 28, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Discovery Letter, # (2) Exhibit Court Transcript, # (3) Exhibit Court Transcript)(Krouse, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [335] MOTION for Acquittal or in the Alternative a New Trial. Rule 29 and Multiplicity Sections. (Heberlig, Brian)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated May 26, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad on re: [340] LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated May 19, 2020 re: Briefs re Government's Post-Trial Disclosures. ENDORSEMENT: By May 26, 2020, the government shall inform the Court what, if any, categories of communications, documents, or information requested by Mr. Sadr it will not produce by June 5, 2020. If it will not produce any requested categories, it shall submit letter briefing in opposition to Mr. Sadr's request that the Court compel the Government to produce these categories of communications, documents, or information by May 28, 2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/22/2020) (ap)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 letterCourt Filing
                  LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated May 22, 2020 re: May 19 and May 21, 2020 Productions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - May 19 Cover Letter, # (2) Exhibit B - FD-1057 Produced May 19, # (3) Exhibit C - Email re 2016 Interview Produced May 21, # (4) Exhibit D - Email re GX 411 Produced May 21, # (5) Exhibit E - Set of FD-1057s Produced May 19)(Heberlig, Brian)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 letterCourt Filing
                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated May 19, 2020 re: Briefs re Government's Post-Trial Disclosures (Heberlig, Brian)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [335] MOTION for Acquittal or in the Alternative a New Trial.. (Krouse, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad...ENDORSEMENT..If Mr. Sadr wishes to supplement his post-trial motions in light of the Government's May 13, 2020 disclosures, he may do so by May 22, 2020. The Governnment shall file its opposition to Mr. Sadr's motions, including any supplements, by June 5, 2020. No further requests by the Government for an extension of time are permitted, and failure to timely oppose by the Government will result in the Court deeming Mr. Sadr's motions unopposed. Mr. Sadr's reply shall be filed by June 15, 2020 ( Motions due by 5/22/2020., Replies due by 6/15/2020., Responses due by 6/5/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/14/20)(jw)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 letterCourt Filing
                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated May 13, 2020 re: Extension request Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 336 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [335] MOTION for Acquittal or in the Alternative a New Trial.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W)(Heberlig, Brian)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 Motion for Acquittal
                              MOTION for Acquittal or in the Alternative a New Trial. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, Bahram Karimi. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated April 21, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Letter to Defense)(Krouse, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/16/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/16/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/13/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/13/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/12/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/12/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/11/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/11/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/10/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/10/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/9/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/9/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/6/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/5/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/4/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/4/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/3/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/3/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/2/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Trial held on 3/2/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, Bahram Karimi addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated April 13, 2020 re: Recording Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Letter to defense with exhibits)(Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) The deadline for post-trial motions is hereby extended to May 1, 2020. Any opposition shall be filed by May 15, 2020, and any reply shall be filed by May 26, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. on [305] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated April 6, 2020 re: Extension Request. ENDORSEMENT: (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/7/2020) (ap)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Motions due by 5/1/2020. Responses due by 5/15/2020. Replies due by 5/26/2020. (ap)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020, Terminated: 4/7/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated April 6, 2020 re: Extension Request . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Apr. 3, 2020 Disclosure)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 Remark
                                                                                      Court Exhibit #1 as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jw)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated April 1, 2020 re: Response to Government Letters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - April 1, 2020 Letter with Exhibits A, B, and C)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated March 31, 2020 re: Production of Karimi Interview Recording Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: 3/19/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The sentencing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad is set for August 17, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. Pursuant to this Court's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases, sentencing submissions from the Defendant are due on or before August 10, 2020. The Government's submission is due on or before August 12, 2020. (Sentencing set for 8/17/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/19/2020) (ap)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 Remark
                                                                                              Court Exhibit #9 as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jw)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: As stated on the record at trial on March 16, 2020, the Court hereby modifies Mr. Sadr's bail conditions to include home detention and GPS location monitoring. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/16/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: As stated on the record at trial on March 16, 2020, any post-trial motions shall be filed by April 16, 2020. The Government's opposition shall be due by May 18, 2020. Mr. Sadr's reply shall be due by June 1, 2020. (Motions due by 4/16/2020. Responses due by 5/18/2020. Replies due by 6/1/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/16/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The Court has reviewed the parties proposals as to testimony of Mr. Kim that should be struck in light of the Government's late disclosures. The Court will adopt the Government's more limited striking proposal, coupled with the curative instruction and stipulation regarding GX 411 already given to the jury. To the extent the defense also wishes to recall Mr. Kim to cross-examine him further on the late disclosed materials, it may do so. The Government shall forthwith arrange for Mr. Kirn to be available to testify tomorrow afternoon. If the defense decides not to recall Mr. Kim, defense counsel shall inform the Government immediately. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/10/2020)(jw)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 Remark
                                                                                                      Final Verdict Form as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jw)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 Remark
                                                                                                        Jury Instructions as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jw)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Attached to this Order is the final draft of the jury instructions in this case. The parties shall inform the Court by 9:30 p.m. on March 11, 2020 whether any changes were entered incorrectly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/11/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 11, 2020 re: Use of Term "Front Company" (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated March 11, 2020 re: Use of the term front company Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/11/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Thursday, March 12, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendants continued bail release. (jbo)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding whether specific passages of Mr. Kim's testimony should be struck. They shall submit a joint letter outlining their respective positions by 9pm (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/10/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 10, 2020 re: Testimony Relating to Sadr's State of Mind (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated March 10, 2020 re: Striking Testimony Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian Heberlig dated March 10, 2020 re: Curative Instruction re Striking T. Kim Testimony (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 10, 2020 re: Striking Testimony of Ted Kim (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Furthermore, the previously filed letter does not offer an explanation for how it came to be that GX 411 was not (though should have been) provided to the defense as part of Bank-1 's subpoena production. The Government is ordered to address these points by letter to be filed no later than 10 p.m. this evening. The defense may reply to the Government's letters by 11 p.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/8/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Acquittal (refiled and retitled as instructed). Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. On March 8, 2020, the Government filed a letter objecting to various exhibits Mr. Sadr may seek to introduce in his case-in-chief, if any. Mr. Sadr shall respond to this letter by no later than 11pm on March 8, 2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/8/2020)(jw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. In its response letter to be filed by 7 p.m., the Government shall include a detailed representation to the Court that explains why Government Exhibit 411 was not previously disclosed and what led to its disclosure for the first time yesterday. That representation shall further specify all attorneys involved in the decision-making with respect to both the non-disclosure and the subsequent disclosure yesterday of this document (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/8/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. On March 8, 2020, Mr. Sadr filed a letter requesting a curative instruction with respect to Government Exhibit 411. The Government shall respond to Mr. Sadr's March 8 letter by no later than 7pm on March 8, 2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/8/2020)(jw)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. On March 8, 2020, the Government filed a letter regarding its motion to preclude proposed expert testimony on the concept of de-risking. Mr. Sadr shall respond to the Government's March 8 letter by no than 2pm on March 8, 2020 (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/8/2020)(jw)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The parties shall jointly submit a draft verdict sheet no later than 6pm on Monday, March 9, 2020. To the extent the parties disagree as to specific aspects of the draft verdict sheet, such disagreement and the parties respective positions with respect to it shall be noted. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/7/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/10/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trail to resume Wednesday, March 11, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendant's continued bail release. (Jury Trial set for 3/11/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Heberlig, Brian to RE-FILE Document [282] MOTION for Acquittal Memorandum in Support of Oral Motion. ERROR(S): Incorrect document Title. Change title to Motion for Acquittal (ka)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated March 9, 2020 re: OFAC and GX 411 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020, Terminated: 3/9/2020 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Acquittal Memorandum in Support of Oral Motion. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian) Modified on 3/10/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Attached to this Order is a copy of the Court's proposed jury instructions. Counsel may present any objections to the Court at tomorrow's charging conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/9/2020)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan:Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/9/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Tuesday, March 10, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendant's continued bail release. (Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 8, 2020 re: Exhibit B to Dkt. No. 279 (Letter re Government's Saturday Production) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B - Further Correspondence)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 8, 2020 re: Production Issues (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Correspondence)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 8, 2020 re: Government Request to Exclude Exhibits (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated March 8, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated March 8, 2020 re: Government Objections to Defense Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated March 8, 2020 re: GX 411 Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 8, 2020 re: Curative Instruction re GX 411 . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - GX 411, # (2) Exhibit B - Transcript of Curative Instruction)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 8, 2020 re: Expert Witness Qualifications (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/8/2020, Entered: 3/8/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated March 8, 2020 . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad To afford adequate time to address objections raised in the Government's March 4, 2020 letter, see Old. No. 262, the parties shall be prepared to begin tomorrow morning, March 5, 2020, at 8:45 a.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/4/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The parties shall be prepared to begin this morning, March 6, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/6/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Mr. Sadr has communicated to the Court that he intends to file a letter this evening objecting to "significant portions of the testimony the Government intends to elicit from a State Department witness." He shall file such a letter no later than 10 p.m. on March 3, 2020. The Government shall file its response no later than 12 a.m. on March 4, 2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/3/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The parties shall be prepared to begin this morning, March 6, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/6/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/6/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Monday, March 9, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendant's continued bail release. (Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 5, 2020 re: Government Objections to Cross-Examination Evidence (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated March 5, 2020 re: Objections to Defense Exhibits . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Kim dated March 5, 2020 re: Reply Regarding Objections to Defense Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan:Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/5/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Friday, March 6, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendant's continued bail release. (Jury Trial set for 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 4, 2020 re: Government Objections to Cross Examination of Ted Kim (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated March 4, 2020 re: Government Exhibit 1209 . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Kim dated March 4, 2020 re: Objections to Defense Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 4, 2020 re: Disclosure of Ebanks Testimony (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/4/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Thursday, March 5, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendant's continued bail release (Jury Trial set for 3/5/2020 at 09:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Kim dated March 3, 2020 re: Defendant's motion re SKN citizenship Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 3, 2020 re: Government's Opposition to Supplemental Submission re s. 560.516 (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 3, 2020 re: Objecting to State Department Witness Testimony . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated March 3, 2020 re: Defense Supplemental Letter Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Jury Trial as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/3/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury trial continued. Trial to resume Wednesday, March 4, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendants continued bail release. (Jury Trial set for 3/4/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The Government is ordered to file a reply to Sadr's response to the supplemental motions in limine by 8:30 p.m. this evening. Specifically, in light of the relevance proffered by Sadr with respect to several of the categories of evidence objected to by the Government, the Government shall indicate whether it withdraws any of its previous objections. To the extent the Government does withdraw objections but seeks to have a limiting instruction given to the jury, it shall propose language for such an instruction. To the extent the Government maintains any of its previous objections, it shall state specifically what objections remain in light of Sadr's response and its basis for continuing objection. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/1/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1): On February 24, 2020, Sadr moved in limine, under Rules 401,403, and 404(b) of the Federal Rules of Evidence, to preclude the Government from offering evidence or argument contending that uncharged acts of exchanging U.S. dollars for Venezuelan Bolivars constitute evidence of guilt of the charged offenses. See Dkt. Nos. 228,229. On February 26, 2020, the Government filed its opposition to Sadr's motion. Dkt. No. 235. Having reviewed the parties' briefing, the Court DENIES Sadr's motion. As an initial matter, based on the Government's proffer it appears that the evidence at issue is, at a minimum, likely to be probative of Sadr's alleged identity as an individual in control of Clarity and its accounts, as well as his alleged deceptive use of this entity and its accounts. Nor does its probative value appear to be substantially outweighed by any risk of confusing the issues, misleading the jury, or undue delay, and thus preclusion under Rule 403 is not warranted. Additionally, the Court agrees with the Government that this evidence is not subject to Rule 404(b). Indeed, "evidence of uncharged criminal activity is not considered other crimes evidence under Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) if it arose out of the same transaction or series of transactions as the charged offense, if it is inextricably intertwined with the evidence regarding the charged offense, or if it is necessary to complete the story of the crime on trial." United States v. Carboni, 204 F.3d 39, 44 (2d Cir. 2000) (quoting United States v. Gonzalez, 110 F.3d 936, 942 (2d Cir. 1997)). Here, the Government alleges that the U.S. dollars exchanged for Bolivars on December 6, 2011 derived from the very transactions charged in the Indictment. This evidence thus "ar[i]se[s] out of the same transaction or series of transactions as the charged offense [or] is inextricably intertwined with the evidence regarding the charged offense," and accordingly is "not considered other crimes evidence under Fed. R. Evid. 404(b). " Id. Based on the information provided, the motion in limine is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/29/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) denying [249] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicholas Silverman dated March 1, 2020 re: Electronic Devices Request. ENDORSEMENT: This request is denied. Pursuant to Standing Order M 10-468, attorneys may be authorized to bring personal electronic devices or general purpose computing devices into the Courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/1/2020) (lnl) Modified on 3/4/2020 (lnl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicholas P. Silverman dated March 2, 2020 re: Copy of Authorities (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Compilation of Authorities)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated March 2, 2020 re: 31 C.F.R. s. 560.516 (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Voir Dire and Jury Selection held on 3/2/2020 as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop, Nicholas P. Silverman and paralegal Brook Holder. AUSA, Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse, Stephanie L. Lake, Garrett Lynch & Shawn Milione AUSA paralegal. Also, FBI Special Agent Leigh Ann Pond present. Jury selection began and completed. Jury sworn. Jury trial to begin Tuesday, March 3, 2020 at 9:00 am. See transcript for complete details. Defendants continued bail release. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/1/2020, Entered: 3/1/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated March 1, 2020 re: In Response to the Defendant's Opposition to the Government's Supplemental Motions in Limine Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/1/2020, Entered: 3/1/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [248] MOTION in Limine Supplemental.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - DX 0007-R, # (2) Exhibit B - DX 0041, # (3) Exhibit C - DX 0131)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/1/2020, Entered: 3/1/2020, Terminated: 3/2/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicholas Silverman dated March 1, 2020 re: Electronic Devices Request . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Supplemental. Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated February 29, 2020 re: Voir dire Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian Heberlig dated February 29, 2020 re: Revised Proposed Instruction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Instruction, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Redline)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [187] Letter filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [185] Request to Charge filed by USA . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian Heberlig dated February 29, 2020 re: Additional Voir Dire Questions (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) on [240] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 28, 2020 re: Modification of Curfew for Trial Preparation. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/28/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Attached to this Order is the voir dire the Court intends to use in the above-captioned matter. If the parties have any objections to or requests regarding the voir dire, they shall file such objections or requests by February 29, 2020, at 12 p.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/28/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 28, 2020 re: Government Position re Curfew Extension (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020, Terminated: 2/28/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 28, 2020 re: Modification of Curfew for Trial Preparation . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated February 27, 2020 re: List of people and entities Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 27, 2020 re: Agreed-Upon Summary of the Allegations for Voir Dire (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The Court has reviewed the parties' briefing on each of these outstanding issues and now resolves them as follows. 1. Mark Dubowitz's Expert Testimony. In its response to Sadr's renewed objections to Mr. Dubowitz's testimony, the Government represents that it will not "elicit any substantive testimony from Mr. Dubowitz regarding the history of sanctions against Iran, the Islamic Revolution Guard Corps ("IRGC"), the U-Turn Exemption, or the entities that OFAC has designated as SDNs." Dkt. No. 230 at 1. Rather, Mr. Dubowitz's testimony will be limited "to explaining certain means, methods, and strategies of sanctions evasion as they relate to the charges in this case." Id. The Court concludes that Mr. Dubowitz may testify to "the process by which individuals establish or incorporate companies in foreign jurisdictions, the documents and disclosures needed to establish such companies, the concept and use of front and shell companies, the extent to which bank accounts may be established remotely,... the way international financial transactions may be conducted online and through email[,]... the process by which individuals obtain citizenship and passports in countries other than their country of birth, the process by which individuals obtain residency in foreign jurisdictions,... citizenship-by-investment programs[,]... bank secrecy laws in countries like Switzerland, [and] the manner in which money can be transferred electronically across various jurisdictions." Id. at 2. He may explain these sophisticated concepts because they are beyond the ken of the average juror. However, to the extent the Government seeks to have Mr. Dubowitz "explain how these complicated methods and means can be used together in order to obscure an individual or entity's connection to Iran," id., it may cross the line into testimony that runs afoul of Castillo v. United States, which prohibits expert testimony that invites the jury to infer the defendant's guilt "from the behavior of unrelated persons," United States v. Castillo, 924 F.2d 1227, 1234 (2d Cir. 1991 ). In this regard, the Court will entertain objections to specific questions from Sadr during the course of the trial that he thinks crosses this line. If the Government has questions as to what it may say during opening statements in this regard, it may submit a specific proffer to the Court by Friday, February 28, 2020 at 12 p.m. In addition, to the extent the Government anticipates testimony that it believes will be permissible, but close to this line, it shall prepare a proposed limiting instruction, which it shall submit to the Court by Friday, February 28, 2020 at 12 p.m. 2. Government's Trial Exhibits Sadr's objections to the "clean versions" of the Government's trial exhibits fall into two categories. See Dkt. No. 222. First, he objects to documents that had cut off pages in the May 2018 production but have been replaced with clean, complete versions in the Government's trial exhibits. Second, he objects to documents that contain charts or text images that were illegible in the May 2018 production but have been replaced with completely legible versions in the Government's trial exhibits. With respect to both categories of documents, Sadr objects that they contain "additional content that was not present in the previously-seized versions." Id. at 2. The Court disagrees. The Court has already determined that all of the pages Sadr complains about were identified as responsive and seized during the course of a constitutional responsiveness review. See Dkt. No. 197. That technical issues may have resulted in these documents being cut off or rendered illegible in the May 2018 production does not mean that the reviewers seized cut off or illegible versions of these documents. Moreover, Sadr will not be prejudiced in any way by the Government using these 16 exhibits, because he has had access to the native files from which the Government pulled them since at least November 15, 2018, when the Government produced the original search warrant returns as Relativity load files to Sadr. See Dkt. No. 201 at 4-5. Accordingly, the Court concludes that the Government may use the 16 exhibits to which Sadr objects at trial. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/27/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 26, 2020 re: U-Turn License Stipulation (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated February 26, 2020 re: Letter Response in Opposition to Def. Motion to Preclude Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [228] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Other Acts Constitute Evidence of Guilt.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lake, Stephanie) Modified on 2/26/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Lake, Stephanie to RE-FILE Document [234] Response in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 25, 2020 re: U-Turn Transaction Evidence (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicholas P. Silverman dated February 25, 2020 re: Electronic Devices and Breakout/Witness Room Request . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Electronic Devices Order)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. On February 24, 2020, Sadr filed a motion in limine. See Dkt. No. 228. By February 26, 2020, the Government shall respond to Sadr's February 24 motion (Government Responses due by 2/26/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/25/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated February 24, 2020 re: Expert testimony Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [228] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Other Acts Constitute Evidence of Guilt.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020, Terminated: 3/2/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument That Other Acts Constitute Evidence of Guilt. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The Court concludes that prong one generally-and a right to control theory under prong one specifically-requires the Government to prove that Sadr had knowledge that his scheme would likely harm the victim banks. The Court further concludes that prong two does not require the Government to prove that Sadr had any intent to hmm the victim banks-or anyone else, for that matter. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/22/2020) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: On February 22, 2020, Sadr filed a letter setting forth his objections to Government exhibits obtained from the email search warrant raw returns. See Dkt. No. 222. By February 25, 2020, the Government shall respond to Sadr's February 22 letter. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/23/2020) (ap) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: On February 20, 2020, Sadr filed a letter setting forth his continuing objections to the proffered expert testimony of Mark Dubowitz. See Dkt. No. 220. By February 24, 2020, the Government shall respond to the continuing objections to Mr. Dubowitz's testimony Sadr makes in his February 20 letter. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/22/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: In light of the Court's conclusion in this Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer to determine whether there is any remaining dispute as to how this information will be presented to the jury. By February 25, 2020, the parties shall inform the Court whether any dispute remains, and, if so, they shall state their respective positions. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/22/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/23/2020, Entered: 2/23/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated February 23, 2020 re: Email Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/22/2020, Entered: 2/22/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 22, 2020 re: Differences Between New GXs and May 2018 Production (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, Bahram Karimi addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated February 20, 2020 re: U-Turn Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad as to Bahram Karimi addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 20, 2020 re: Continuing Objections to Proposed Expert Testimony Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Dubowitz Proffer)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to (18-Cr-224-01) Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Trial will commence at 9 a.m. on Monday, March 2, 2020. For planning purposes, the Court informs the parties that it will not be available to sit on Friday, March 20, 2020 and Monday, March 23, 2020. The Court will sit on Friday, March 6, 2020 and will inform the parties during trial whether it will sit on Friday, March 13, 2020. If the trial has not concluded by Thursday, March 19, 2020, it will resume on Tuesday, March 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/19/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/10/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 2/10/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated February 18, 2020 re: Bank Fraud Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (18-Cr-224-01) Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad on re: [214] LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Attorney Brian M. Heberlig dated February 18, 2020 re: Scheduling order. Modification of the deadline for Sadr's objections from February 18 until February 22, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/18/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated February 18, 2020 re: Scheduling order (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (18-Cr-224-01) Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad on re: [211] LETTER by USA addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Michael Krouse dated February 14, 2020 re: Scheduling order. The defense has agreed to have the Government produce the marked email exhibits (of both Sadr and non-Sadr documents) on Tuesday, February 18, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/14/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated Feb. 14, 2020 re: United States v. Lebedev, 932 F.3d 40 (2d Cir. 2019) (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael Krouse dated February 14, 2020 re: Scheduling order Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. On February 10, 2020, the Court held a final pretrial conference in the above-captioned matter. At that conference, the Court preliminarily resolved several of the parties' in limine motions as follows..... (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/14/2020)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. As discussed at the final pretrial conference in this matter held on February 10, 2020, this Order sets forth the jury selection procedures to be followed at trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/13/2020) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to (18-Cr-224-1) Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The parties' briefing on their motions in limine indicate several areas of potential agreement with respect to the resolution of evidentiary issues. Prior to the conference scheduled for February 10, 2020 at 4 p.m., the parties shall meet and confer and come prepared to identify those issues upon which they have reached agreement and those that remain contested. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/10/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Final Pretrial Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 2/10/2020. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Reid Weingarten, Brain M. Heberlig, Nicholas P. Silverman & Bruce C. Bishop. AUSA, Stephanie L. Lake, Michael K. Krouse, Jane Kim & Garret Lynch present. Jury Trial set to commence on Monday, March 2, 2020 at 9 am. Time already excluded until March 2, 2020. Oral argument heard on motions in limine and the Court orally ruled on the pending motions. Defendant continued bail release. See transcript for complete details. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the final pretrial conference scheduled for 2 p.m. on February 10, 2020 is hereby adjourned to 4 p.m. on February 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/6/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RESPONSE by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [204] Letter filed by USA . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Heberlig, Brian) Modified on 2/10/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated Feb. 5, 2020 re: Proposed Order re Return of Property (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated February 5, 2020 re: Defendant's Request for Return of Property Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad on [201] LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated February 4, 2020 re: Request for Orders Regarding Rule 16 Discovery and Expert Notice from the Defendant and Authentication of Email Evidence. ENDORSEMENT: Sadr shall respond to the Government's February 4, 2020 letter by February 6, 2020, informing the Court of his position with respect to providing reciprocal discovery and expert notice and allowing the Government to access the provider data. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/5/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/5/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated February 4, 2020 re: Request for Orders Regarding Rule 16 Discovery and Expert Notice from the Defendant and Authentication of Email Evidence Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (01/31/2020 Defense Letter))(Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 199 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    S(2) INDICTMENT FILED as to Bahram Karimi (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [188] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony. . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Resume of Ted Kim, # (2) Exhibit B - Transcript of Dubowitz Testimony, # (3) Exhibit C - Transcript of OFAC Witness Testimony)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: the Court GRANTS in part, DENIES in part, and RESERVES JUDGMENT in part on Sadr's motion to suppress search warrant evidence, DENIES his corollary requests for a Franks hearing, RESERVES JUDGMENT on his return of property motion, and DENIES as moot his motion to exclude. Within seven days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall either submit an expedited briefing schedule for supplemental briefing or inform the Court that no such briefing is necessary and submit a proposed order for the return of property. Should a briefing schedule be necessary, within fourteen days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the Government shall provide the Court with a page-by-page analysis of when each page of the subset of so-called non-Sadr documents that Sadr claims he has Fourth Amendment standing to seek the suppression of was first identified as responsive. It shall do the same with respect to each page of the grand jury subpoena return documents if Sadr also continues to seek their suppression. This resolves Docket Nos. 95, 97 and 148. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/28/2020) (See OPINION & ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [182] MOTION in Limine Notice of Motion. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [188] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony.. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [186] MOTION in Limine . . (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated Jan. 24, 2020 re: Clarification regarding Section III of Dkt. No. 192 (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [186] MOTION in Limine .. Refiled in accord with notice to refile. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Heberlig, Brian to RE-FILE Document [191] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Response to Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [186] MOTION in Limine .. (Heberlig, Brian) Modified on 1/21/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [182] MOTION in Limine Notice of Motion.. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [188] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Apr. 2018 Discovery Letter, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Notice from US v. Atilla, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Notice of Proposed Expert Testimony)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 23, 2019 re: Proposed Requests to Charge (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request To Charge by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Proposed Examination of Jurors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [182] MOTION in Limine Notice of Motion.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Notice of Motion. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motions In Limine)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) granting [179] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated December 18, 2019 re: Extension for Motion Oppositions and Replies. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is hereby granted. No further extensions will be allowed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/19/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Responses due by 1/17/2020. Replies due by 1/24/2020. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019, Terminated: 12/19/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated December 18, 2019 re: Extension for Motion Oppositions and Replies . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) granting [177] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 13, 2019 re: Request for Extension re Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/18/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019, Terminated: 12/18/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 13, 2019 re: Request for Extension re Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 11, 2019 re: Proposed Order Granting Motion for Return of Property (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 11, 2019 re: Dec. 9 Letter Regarding Post-April 2017 Searches and Seizures (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 11/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Arraignment held on 11/25/19 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated December 11, 2019 re: Response to the Defendant's December 9, 2019 Letter Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated December 11, 2019 re: Response to Defendant's Proposed Order (Dkt. No. 165) Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 11/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Arraignment held on 11/25/19 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated December 9, 2019 re: Letter in Support of October 30, 2019 Motion Opposition Document filed by USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing., [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial .. Submission of Example Documents (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated December 9, 2019 re: Proposed Order re Pretrial Motion No. 9 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION & ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [93] MOTION to Strike Surplusage filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [81] MOTION to Dismiss the Sanctions Counts (One & Two) and Derivative Money Laundering Counts (Five & Six) for Failure to State an Offense filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [87] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three Through Six for Failure to State an Offense filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [91] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense and Lack of Specificity, or in the Alternative, For a Bill of Particulars. filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [83] MOTION to Dismiss Count One for Failure to State a Conspiracy to Defraud the United States and Unconstitutional Vagueness filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, [85] MOTION to Dismiss All IEEPA-Based Counts Because the Iran Sanctions Regime Exceeds the Authority in IEEPA and IEEPA is an Unconstitutional Delegation of Legislative Authority filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Sadr's first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, and seventh pretrial motions in their entireties. With respect to the fifth and seventh pretrial motions, these denials are without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/6/2019)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. As stated on the record at the conference on November 25, 2019, by December 9, 2019, the Government shall submit its analysis of the 420 May 2018 pertinent documents, and the Defendant shall submit his proposed return of property order and any exemplar documents related to the 420 May 2018 pertinent documents, SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/26/19) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan:Oral Argument on Motions to Exclude as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 11/25/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hasemi Nejad present w/atty Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop and Nicholas P. Silverman. AUSA, Michael K. Krouse, Jane Kim, Garett Lynch and Stephanie L. Lake present. Decision reserved. See transcript for complete details. Defendant continued bail release. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated Nov. 14, 2019 re: Motion to Strike Surplusage (Pretrial Motion No. 7) (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Oral Argument proceeding held on 11/7/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Oral Argument held on 11/7/19 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: As stated-on the record at the proceeding on November 7, 2019, the Court will hear oral argument on pretrial motions 8 and 9, as well as Defendant's motion to exclude, on November 25, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. On or before November 14, 2019, the parties shall meet and confer to discuss narrowing the issues raised in Defendant's motion to strike surplusage. By that date, they shall submit a joint letter informing the Court of the outcome of that meet and confer. (Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/7/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Oral Argument on Motions to Dismiss as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 11/7/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hasemi Nejad present w/atty Reiid Weingarten, Brian M. Heberlig, Bruce C. Bishop and Nicholas P. Silverman. AUSA, Michael K. Krouse, Jane Kim, Garett Lynch and Stephanie L. Lake present. Decision reserved. See transcript for complete details. Defendant continued bail release. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Due to the Court's calendar, the proceeding scheduled for November 7, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to November 7, 2019 at 11:00 a.m.. To clarify its previous Order dated November 6, 2019, the Court will hear argument on pretrial motions 1,3,4,6, and 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/6/2019)(dif)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: At the proceeding scheduled for November 7, 2019, the Court will hear oral argument on pretrial motions 1-7. In light of the fact that pretrial motions 8 and 9, as well as Defendant's motion to exclude, were not fully briefed until November 4, 2019, the Court will hold argument on those motions at a later date. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/6/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Oral Argument set for 11/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. [*** NOTE: Refer to Order, Doc.#158. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [148] MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to Rule 16., [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing., [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial . . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [148] MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to Rule 16.. Memorandum in Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Exclude and Supplemental Motions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Search Warrant Charts))(Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSED as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [153] Letter on Scheduling...ENDORSEMENT: The Government's time to file its response is hereby extended to October 30, 2019. Defendant's reply is due November 4, 2019, Oral argument is hereby adjourned to November 7, 2019 at 10 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/28/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated October 28, 2019 re: Scheduling Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Replies due by 11/4/2019. Responses due by 10/30/2019. Oral Argument set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated October 25, 2019 re: Oral Argument (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 10/16/18 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [148] MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to Rule 16.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2020 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to Rule 16. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing., [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial .. Supplemental Memorandum in Support (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [146] Motion for Bruce C. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/10/2019) (Nathan, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [107] Motion for Nicholas P. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/10/2019) (Nathan, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019, Terminated: 10/10/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Bruce C. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17738346. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Bruce Bishop, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Bruce)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [146] MOTION for Bruce C. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17738346. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Due to a change in the Court's calendar on November 8, 2019, the Court hereby reserves November 6, 2019 at 1 p.m. for oral argument on Defendant's pretrial motions. The parties shall still inform the Court by October 25, 2019 whether they request oral argument at that time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2019)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated 9/30/19 re: Proposed agreed-upon briefing schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Granted., Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings.October 10, 2019 Sadr to file (1) supplement to motion to suppress evidence and motion for return of property, and (2) motion to exclude evidence.October 28, 2019 government to file any responses or oppositions. November 1, 2019 Sadr to file any reply memoranda. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/1/19)(vb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Motions due by 10/10/2019. Responses due by 10/28/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. [*** NOTE: Refer to Endorsed Letter, Doc.#[144]. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019, Terminated: 10/2/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian M. Heberlig dated September 30, 2019 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated September 23, 2019 re: Document Production Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Trial in this matter is set for March 2, 2020. In light of this trial date, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for a final pretrial conference on February 10, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 20, 2019, the parties shall submit: (1) an agreed upon 1-2 paragraph description of the case to be read to potential jurors during Voir Dire; (2) any Voir Dire requests; and (3) any Requests to Charge. With respect to Requests to Charge, the parties shall indicate whether the request is made jointly and, if not, whether a party objects to a particular request. Any party objecting to a request shall indicate the legal basis for their objection. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that any 404(b) motions and motions in limine be filed by December 20, 2019. Opposition papers, if any, shall be filed by January 3, 2020, and Replies, if any, shall be filed by January 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/18/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSED as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [133] Letter requesting bail modification...ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/18/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Brief due by 12/20/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. Responses due by 1/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stephanie Lindsay Lake appearing for USA. (Lake, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/9/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 9/9/19 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/15/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 8/15/19 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated September 16, 2019 re: Document production Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated September 16, 2019 re: Bail Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: The Court hereby reserves November 8, 2019 at 1 p.m. for oral argument on Defendant's pretrial motions. The parties shall inform the Court by October 25, 2019 whether they request oral argument at that time. (Oral Argument set for 11/8/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/16/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. As stated on the record in the conference on September 9, 2019, trial is set for March 2, 2019. It is SO ORDERED that the Government submit a status update by September 16, 2019 regarding the disclosure of documents not yet disclosed to Defendant. On or before September 23, 2019, the Government shall submit a letter informing the Court that all documents not yet disclosed have been disclosed or providing justification for why such disclosure has not been completed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant submit a letter by September 30, 2019, informing the Court whether he intends to supplement his current suppression or return of prope1iy motions or file an additional motion relating to the discovery issues identified at the September 9 conference. In that letter, Defendant shall also propose a joint briefing schedule for any supplemental or additional briefing. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Government submit a letter by September 16, 2019 informing the Court of Probation's views on Defendant's proposed bail modifications. Defendant shall file any reply to the Government's letter by September 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/11/19) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Replies due by 9/23/2019. Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael K. Krouse dated September 9, 2019 re: Scheduling Document filed by USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Curcio Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Curcio Hearing as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 9/9/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Najed present w/atty Reid Weingarten and Brain M. Heberlig. AUSA, Michael K. Krouse present. Defendant knowingly and voluntarily waived his right to conflict free representation. Jury trial set to commence on Monday, March 2, 2020 at 9 a.m. Scheduling order to follow. See transcript for complete details. Defendant continued bail release. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jane Kim dated September 3, 2019 re: Curcio Hearing and Proposed Script Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (JPMC Waiver))(Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: As stated on the record in the conference on August 15, 2019, a Curcio hearing is scheduled for September 9, 2019 at 10 a.m. No later than September 3, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint letter proposing a Curcio script and indicating the parties' views as to the necessity of written waivers and unconflicted trial counsel. The parties shall also propose a date for the commencement of trial in their joint letter. The Court will set a firm trial date at the September 9 Curcio hearing. SO ORDERED. (Curcio Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/16/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 8/15/2019. Status Conference hearing held. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad present w/atty Brian M. Heberlig and Reid Weingarten. AUSA, David W. Denton, Jr., Jane Kim, Michael K. Krouse and Garrett Lynch present. Curcio hearing set for Monday, September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Joint letter by counsel due by Tuesday, September 3, 2019. See transcript for complete details. Defendant continued bail release. (Curcio Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: WHEREAS this case was recently transferred to the undersigned, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference will be held on August 15, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Prior to the status conference, the parties should familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases, available at http://www.nysd.uscomis.gov/judge/Nathan. Per Rule 2.B. of the undersigned's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases, communications with the Court shall be submitted by letter filed on ECF unless there is a request to seal the communication, in which case it shall be submitted by email as described in Rule 2.B. (Status Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/7/2019) (ap) Modified on 8/8/2019 (ap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Andrew J. Carter, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ap) Modified on 8/6/2019 (ap). Modified on 8/6/2019 (ap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 8/2/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Brian Heberlig and Nicholas Silverman. AUSA David Denton and Jane Kim the Government. The Court recuses. Parties to file a Joint Status Report on 8/7/19 only if this action has not been reassigned to another district judge. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Steve Greenblum. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Jane Kim dated July 30, 2019 re: Response to Defendant's Letter Regarding the Court's Recusal Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian M. Heberlig dated July 30, 2019 re: Potential Recusal (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Per the status conference held before the Court on July 29, 2019, the Defendant's request to submit a letter to the Court on the topic of recusal is GRANTED. The Defendant should submit his letter to the Court on or before July 30, 2019 at 5:00pm. The Government's response, if any, should be submitted on or before July 31, 2019 at 12:00pm. In addition, the Court will hold a telephone conference on August 1, 2019 at 12:00pm. The parties should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 on the date and time specified above and once prompted should dial the conference code 3768660. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/29/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 7/29/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Reid Weingarten, Nicholas Silverman and Brian Heberlig. AUSA David Denton, AUSA Jane Kim and AUSA Michael Krouse for the Government. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/1/19 at 12:00 p.m. Time previously excluded. All bail conditions remain in effect. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Sonya Ketter Moore. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Brief (Defendant) due by 7/30/2019. Responses (Government) due by 7/31/2019. Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/28/2019, Entered: 7/28/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian M. Heberlig dated 7/28/2019 re: Potential Curcio Hearing (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on [119] Letter re: Curcio Hearing as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad...ENDORSEMENT: Status Conference set for 7/29/19 at 11am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/26/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Jane Kim dated July 26, 2019 re: Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David William Denton, Jr appearing for USA. (Denton, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial . . (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order - Alternative Relief)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [93] MOTION to Strike Surplusage. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [91] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense and Lack of Specificity, or in the Alternative, For a Bill of Particulars. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [89] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [87] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three Through Six for Failure to State an Offense. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [85] MOTION to Dismiss All IEEPA-Based Counts Because the Iran Sanctions Regime Exceeds the Authority in IEEPA and IEEPA is an Unconstitutional Delegation of Legislative Authority. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [81] MOTION to Dismiss the Sanctions Counts (One & Two) and Derivative Money Laundering Counts (Five & Six) for Failure to State an Offense. . (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brian M. Heberlig dated May 10, 2019 re: Increased Length of Reply Brief for Pretrial Motion No. 8 . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [93] MOTION to Strike Surplusage., [81] MOTION to Dismiss the Sanctions Counts (One & Two) and Derivative Money Laundering Counts (Five & Six) for Failure to State an Offense., [87] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three Through Six for Failure to State an Offense., [91] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense and Lack of Specificity, or in the Alternative, For a Bill of Particulars., [83] MOTION to Dismiss Count One for Failure to State a Conspiracy to Defraud the United States and Unconstitutional Vagueness., [85] MOTION to Dismiss All IEEPA-Based Counts Because the Iran Sanctions Regime Exceeds the Authority in IEEPA and IEEPA is an Unconstitutional Delegation of Legislative Authority., [89] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts., [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing., [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial .. (DeFilippis, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [107] MOTION for Nicholas P. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019, Terminated: 10/10/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Nicholas P. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Nicholas P. Silverman, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jane Kim appearing for USA. (Kim, Jane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Matthew Fragale appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Fragale, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019, Terminated: 4/10/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Nicholas P. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16663754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Nicholas P. Silverman, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Nicholas) Modified on 4/10/2019 (wb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad to RE-FILE Document No. [104] MOTION for Nicholas P. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16663754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Kim Krouse appearing for USA. (Krouse, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [99] LETTER MOTION The Government requests permission to file an omnibus brief in opposition totaling up to 140 pages as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad...ENDORSEMENT...The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/14/19) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019, Terminated: 3/14/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Matthew Laroche dated February 26, 2019 re: Revised Pretrial Motion Briefing Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [97] MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - July 10, 2018 Email Chain, # (2) Exhibit B - April 16, 2014 Affidavit)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2020 Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [95] MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - April 16, 2014 Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit B - June 16, 2014 Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit C - October 21, 2015 Affidavit)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2020 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Evidence and for a Franks Hearing. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [93] MOTION to Strike Surplusage.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Surplusage. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Highlighted Indictment, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [91] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense and Lack of Specificity, or in the Alternative, For a Bill of Particulars.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - September 25, 2018 Letter, # (2) Exhibit B - November 2, 2018 Letter)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense and Lack of Specificity, or in the Alternative, For a Bill of Particulars. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Brian Heberlig, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [89] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [87] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three Through Six for Failure to State an Offense.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three Through Six for Failure to State an Offense. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [85] MOTION to Dismiss All IEEPA-Based Counts Because the Iran Sanctions Regime Exceeds the Authority in IEEPA and IEEPA is an Unconstitutional Delegation of Legislative Authority.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss All IEEPA-Based Counts Because the Iran Sanctions Regime Exceeds the Authority in IEEPA and IEEPA is an Unconstitutional Delegation of Legislative Authority. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [83] MOTION to Dismiss Count One for Failure to State a Conspiracy to Defraud the United States and Unconstitutional Vagueness.. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Count One for Failure to State a Conspiracy to Defraud the United States and Unconstitutional Vagueness. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [81] MOTION to Dismiss the Sanctions Counts (One & Two) and Derivative Money Laundering Counts (Five & Six) for Failure to State an Offense.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Appendix D - Fundamentals of the Funds Transfer Process)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss the Sanctions Counts (One & Two) and Derivative Money Laundering Counts (Five & Six) for Failure to State an Offense. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/9/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 1/9/19 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/9/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 1/9/19 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 1/9/2019. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Brian Heberlig and Reid Weingarten. AUSA Andrew De Filippis and AUSA Rebekah Donaleski for the Government. Joint Status Report Due: 3/6/19. Jury Selection and Trial adjourned to 10/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. Time excluded from 5/6/19 to 10/21/19 in the interest of justice. Defendant's Motion(s) Due 2/25/19. Response Due: 3/25/19. Reply Due: 4/8/19. Motions in Limine Due: 10/2/19. Responses Due: 10/9/19. Replies Due: 10/14/19. Proposed Jury Instructions & Requested Voir Dire Due: 10/2/19. Final Pre-trial Conference set for 10/16/19 at 11:00 a.m. All bail conditions remain in effect. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Rose Prater. (Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Rebekah Donaleski dated November 16, 2018 re: Response to Defendant's Supplemental Status Report Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report dated November 15, 2018 by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Donaleski, Rebekah to RE-FILE Document [69] Letter. Use the event type Status Report found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT - Supplemental by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Rebekah Donaleski dated November 15, 2018 re: Joint Status Report Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah) Modified on 11/16/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Per to the status conference held before the Court on October 16, 2018, parties are ordered to submit a Joint Status Report by November 15, 2018. Parties are also ordered to appear for a status conference on January 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 10/16/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report submitted by the Parties on October 15, 2018, and the representations and arguments presented at the Status Conference on October 16, 2018, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. A team of filter attorneys at the U.S. Attorney's Office ("USAO Filter Team") will conduct a supplemental privilege review for the Government. As part of that process, the USAO Filter Team will load Sadr's email accounts into its database, and the USAO Filter Team will seek appropriate assistance from members of the District Attorney of New York's filter team that conducted the original privilege review of Sadr's accounts....[See this Order]... 5. For any documents that are not flagged by the new electronic search for privilege search terms, the prosecution team may resume its access to those documents. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 10/16/2018); Copies Sent By Chambers. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 10/16/2018. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorney Brian Heberlig and Reid Weingarten. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski and Special AUSA Garrett Lynch for the Government. Michael Ubanowicz, FBI present. Joint Status Report Due: 11/15/18. Status Conference set for 1/9/19 at 10:00 a.m. Time previously excluded. All bail conditions remain in effect. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Jerry Harrison. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad on "MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE" filed by Attorneys Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer, Tal R. Machnes, dated September 28, 2018 re: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that attorneys Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer, and Tal R. Machnes, from the firm Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP ("Arnold & Porter"), hereby respectfully request permission to withdraw their appearances in the above-referenced action as counsel on behalf of Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, and further request to be removed from the docket and electronic service list accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 10/2/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Attorneys: Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer, and Tal Rachel Machnes terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Matthew Laroche dated October 1, 2018 re: Discovery Issues Document filed by USA. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer, and Tal R. Machnes to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Weiss, Baruch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO ADMIT BRIAN M. HEBERLIG PRO HAC VICE: as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The motion of Brian M. Heberlig for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bars of the state of Maryland and the District of Columbia; and that his contact information is as follows:...[See this Order]... Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Defendant, Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad, in the above-captioned action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 9/24/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSAs Andrew DeFilippis, Matthew Laroche, Rebekah Donaleski, dated September 21, 2018 re: We write with the consent of defense counsel in the above-referenced matter to request an adjournment of the deadline set by the Court for the Government to produce to defense counsel "the complete data set of discovery that is reasonably free of technical problems[.]" (Dkt. 53). The Court's September 7, 2018 order required that such discovery be produced today. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 9/24/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew J. DeFilippis dated September 21, 2018 re: Adjournment of Deadline to Produce Discovery . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (DeFilippis, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rebekah Allen Donaleski appearing for USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018, Terminated: 7/26/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Brian Matthew Heberlig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15595209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Brian M. Heberlig, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Heberlig, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [58] MOTION for Brian Matthew Heberlig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15595209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Attorney Reid H. Weingarten dated September 18, 2018 re: Substitution of Counsel and Transfer of Retainer Funds. I have been retained by Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad as lead counsel in this case. Michelle Levin and I have entered our appearances. Brian Heberlig will be moving for admission pro hac vice shortly. Following a short transition period, Arnold & Porter will be withdrawing from this matter. We are aware of and will meet all current deadlines in the case, and we will appear before the Court at the status conference on October 16, 2018. Pursuant to the terms of Mr. Sadr's bail conditions, certain funds from two Cyprus-based bank accounts were released into the "the custody of defense counsel to be used for attorney's fees, bail, and/or other expenses only." ECF No. 31, Order if F (May 31, 2018). The defense agreed "(a) not to direct any funds so obtained to Mr. Sadr, or anyone else on his behalf, and (b) that-should Mr. Sadr flee-any remaining funds that have not been used for attorneys' fees and/or other expenses and which originated from the Cyprus-based bank accounts would be deemed posted for bail." Id. Mr. Sadr has directed Arnold & Porter to transfer the remainder of these funds to Steptoe & Johnson LLP to be used for legal fees and expenses. Steptoe agrees to abide by the Court's May 31, 2018 Order. Accordingly, we respectfully request that the Court authorize Arnold & Porter to transfer the remaining retainer funds to Steptoe, subject to the terms of the May 31, 2018 Order. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 9/19/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018, Terminated: 9/19/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Reid H. Weingarten dated September 18, 2018 re: Transfer of Retainer Funds . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Weingarten, Reid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle Lynn Levin appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Levin, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Reid Weingarten appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Weingarten, Reid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) granting [49] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated August 27, 2018 re: Privilege Issues. After consideration of the parties' submissions, the Defendant's motion regarding privilege review is GRANTED. ECF No. 49. The Government is to halt review, and to produce the complete data set of discovery that is reasonably free of technical problems to defense counsel by September 21, 2018. Any technical problems that arise with the data set shall be addressed by Government IT personnel who have already worked on this matter. Parties should file a joint status report with the Court on October 15, 2018 outlining the privilege review plan going forward. Between September 21, 2018 and the Court's approval of the proposed plan, the Government is to refrain from reviewing the document set. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/7/2018) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated September 5, 2018 re: RESPONSE by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad to [48] Letter filed by USA, [49] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated August 27, 2018 re: Privilege Issues (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 responseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [48] Letter filed by USA, [49] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated August 27, 2018 re: Privilege Issues . filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad . (Machnes, Tal) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Machnes, Tal to RE-FILE Document [51] Response. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. If Defendant intends to respond to the Government's letter dated August 31, 2018, ECF No. 48, Defendant must do so by September 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. on 9/4/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018, Terminated: 9/7/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated August 27, 2018 re: Privilege Issues . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Weiss, Baruch to RE-FILE Document [47] MOTION for Discovery Letter Motion from Baruch Weiss regarding Privilege Issues. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew J. DeFilippis dated August 31, 2018 re: Defense Letter re: Privilege Issues Document filed by USA. (DeFilippis, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018, Terminated: 8/27/2018 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Discovery Letter Motion from Baruch Weiss regarding Privilege Issues. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Baruch) Modified on 9/4/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/17/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 7/17/18 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Pursuant to the status conference held before the Court on July 18, 2018, parties are ordered to appear for a status conference on October 16, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. (Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/18/2018) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 7/17/2018. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Baruch eiss, Andrew Bauer and Tal Machnes. AUSA Andrew De Filippis and Special AUSA Garrett Lynch for the Government. Michael Ubanowicz, FBI present. Status Conference set for 10/16/18 at 11:30 a.m. Jury Selection & Trial set for 5/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. Time excluded from 7/17/18 to 5/6/19 in the interest of justice. All bail conditions remain in effect. Court Reporter: Steve Greenblum. (Jury Trial set for 5/6/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 7/17/2018. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Baruch eiss, Andrew Bauer and Tal Machnes. AUSA Andrew De Filippis and Special AUSA Garrett Lynch for the Government. Michael Ubanowicz, FBI present. Status Conference set for 10/16/18 at 11:30 a.m. Jury Selection & Trial set for 5/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. Time excluded from 7/17/18 to 5/6/19 in the interest of justice. All bail conditions remain in effect. Court Reporter: Steve Greenblum. (Jury Trial set for 5/6/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Tal R. Machnes dated June 18, 2018 re: Scheduling . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time . Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Machnes, Tal) Modified on 6/18/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Machnes, Tal to RE-FILE Document [34] MOTION for Extension of Time. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 5/16/18 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated 5/31/2018 re: Bail Conditions. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/31/2018)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. It is hereby ORDERED that the "Letter by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad," ECF No. 27, which was inadvertently filed without appropriate redactions be removed from the public docket. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/24/18)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Matthew Laroche dated May 24, 2018 re: Proposed Bail Package Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2011.07.18 Email)(Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Bond Hearing as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 5/24/2018. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Andrew Bauer, Baruch Weiss and Tal Machnes. AUSA Matthew Laroche, AUSA Andrew De Filippis and, Special AUSA Garrett Lynch for the Government. Michael Ubanowicz, FBI present. Pre-Trial Services Officers Marlon Ovalles and Winter Pascual, present. Bail application GRANTED. Defendant remains in custody until all bail conditions are satisfied. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Martha M. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Note Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 27 Letter as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Note Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 28. "TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Sentence held on 4/20/18 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest." The document was incorrectly filed in this case. [*** NOTE: This document was originally docketed on 5/23/2018 by (McGuirk, Kelly). Court Reporters Office/SDNY requested the deletion of this docket entry on 5/23/2018. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated May 17, 2018 re: Proposed Bail Conditions (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr:Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 5/16/2018 ( Bail Hearing set for 5/24/2018 at 12:30 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.., Status Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr..) Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer and Tal Machnes. AUSA Matthew Laroche and Special Asst. AUSA Garrett Lynch for the Government. Michael Urbanowicz, FBI present. Bail Hearing set for 5/24/18 at 12:30 p.m. Status Conference set for 6/20/18 at 3:00 p.m. Time excluded from 5/16/18 to 6/20/18 in the interest of justice. Defendant remains in custody. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Rose Prater. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/18/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 4/18/18 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/11/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Conference held on 4/11/18 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr:Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 4/18/2018, as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad( Status Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr) Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Baruch Weiss, Andrew Bauer and Tal Machnes. AUSA Andrew De Filippis for Government. Garrett Lynch, present. Michael Urbanowicz, FBI present. Defendants bail request DENIED. Status Conference set for 5/16/18 at 11:00 a.m. Time excluded from 4/18/18 to 5/16/18 in the interest of justice. Defendant remains in custody. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Sam Mauro. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Matthew Joseph Laroche to RE-FILE Document [20] Response in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [14] FIRST MOTION for Bond Application for Pretrial Release.. (Laroche, Matthew) Modified on 4/18/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Matthew Laroche dated April 17, 2018 re: Request to File Surreply . Document filed by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Baruch Weiss dated 04/17/2018 re: Enlargement of Page Limit (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad: Notice to Attorney Tal Rachel Machnes to RE-FILE Document [16] FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Application for Pretrial Release. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [14] FIRST MOTION for Bond Application for Pretrial Release.. (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Application for Pretrial Release. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Return Date set for 4/18/2018 at 03:00 PM. (Machnes, Tal) Modified on 4/17/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 4/11/2018. Defendant Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad appears with attorneys Andrew Bauer and Baruch Weiss. AUSA Andrew DeFilippis and AUSA Matthew Laroche for Government. Garrett Lynch present. Michael Urbanowicz, FBI present. Defendant's reply brief due 4/16/18 at 5:00 p.m. Bond Hearing scheduled for 4/18/18 at 3:00 p.m. Defendant remains in custody. Time excluded from 4/11/18 to 4/18/18 in the interest of justice. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Steve Griffing. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re [14] FIRST MOTION for Bond Application for Pretrial Release.. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST MOTION for Bond Application for Pretrial Release. Document filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Return Date set for 4/11/2018 at 12:00 PM. (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 3/28/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: Arraignment held on 3/28/2018 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad re: [10] Letter filed by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Application Granted. Status conference adjourned to 4/11/18 at 12pm. So Ordered. (Status Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/5/18)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Bauer dated March 30, 2018 re: scheduling of initial pretrial conference (Bauer, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tal Rachel Machnes appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Machnes, Tal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Baruch Weiss appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Weiss, Baruch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Bauer appearing for Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bauer, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses:Initial Appearance on disposition sheet as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad held on 3/28/2018. Deft present with atty Andrew Bauer. AUSA Andrew DeFilippis present. Detention: Risk of Flight/Danger. See transcript. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5,6 held on 3/28/2018., Plea entered by Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5,6 Not Guilty. Deft present with atty Andrew Bauer. AUSA Andrew DeFilippis present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Next conference set before District Judge on 4/9/18. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 USC 3161(h)(7) until 4/9/18. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 3/20/2018)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest of Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad in the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad ASSIGNED to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF as to Ali Sadr Hashemi Nejad. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT FILED as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 619 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?