The Huntington National Bank, a national banking corporation v. Lancaster Holdings, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-11020

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2019 at 12:54 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Remand*
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Remanding Case - Partial State ClaimsCourt Filing
    ORDER remanding remaining state law claims to Oakland County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DPer)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Appear*
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Response - Free
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Notice of Removal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?