United States v. Odyssey Spirits, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00733

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 8, 2019 at 10:37 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela R. Foster +1 202 616 9183 +1 202 514 5238 angela.r.foster@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Laura A Hoehn, Defendant
No Logo Mark A Hoehn, Defendant
No Logo Odyssey Spirits, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Contempt
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  Complaint against Laura A Hoehn, Mark A Hoehn, Odyssey Spirits, Inc... Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons) (Foster, Angela)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?