429 Holdings, LLC v. 421 Kent Development, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01802

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2019 at 4:10 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 421 Kent Development, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
No Logo 429 Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles L. Rosenzweig +1 914 681 0200 +1 914 684 0288 clr@ddw-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order(Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: 3/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against 429 Holdings, LLC by 421 Kent Development, LLC. (Sweeney, Patrick)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 4/11/2018 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/27/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Change of email by Charles L. Rosenzweig (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Rosenzweig on behalf of 429 Holdings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 429 Holdings, LLC from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 503215/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-10298475) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?