KERCHNER v. COLOPLAST CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01408

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 28, 2019 at 3:28 PM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLEYNE KERCHNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kline & Specter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lee B. Balefsky +1 215 772 1000 +1 215 735 0960
v.
No Logo Coloplast Corp, Defendant
Officially listed as "COLOPLAST CORPORATION"
No Logo COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/20/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against COLOPLAST CORPORATION, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 176215.), filed by CHARLEYNE KERCHNER.(ahf) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to COLOPLAST CORPORATION, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/4/2018 (ahf)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARLEYNE KERCHNER. (ahf)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?