Miller v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00149

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 24, 2020 at 12:26 PM DT (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 45 U.S.C. § 51
Nature of Suit Federal Employer's Liability
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Settlement Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Extend
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Extend
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Extend
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Extend
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Returned Mail
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Returned Mail
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Extend
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Extend
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - that the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Dates (Filing No. 25 ) is granted, and that the provisions of the Court's earlier, initial progression order remain in effect, and in addition t o those provisions, the following shall apply. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by March 15, 2019. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for August 23, 2019 , at 10:00 a.m., in my chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. five (5) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of September 9, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Attorney Letter
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Application/Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Summons Requested
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?