Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara California Court of Appeals CA Supreme Court

Greenspan v. MasMarques
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 18CH008067

Tags
Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:26 PM DT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Greenspan, Aaron Jacob"
v.
No Logo MasMarques, Diego, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MasMarques, Diego

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diego MasMarques +1 617 416 8670
Case Type Civil Harassment
Case Status Open
Case Location Civil
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 132 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration
    Legal Document 131 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
    re: Mtn to reconsider 7-28-20 order denying attys fees is Denied by Judge Overton
      Legal Document 130 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Declaration
        Legal Document 129 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Appeal: Appellant's Default Notice
          Legal Document 128 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance
          H047904 - Appellant
            Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
              Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                Proof of Service: Mail
                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                  Proof of Service: Mail
                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Exhibit List (Party)
                    Plaintiff 1 envelope combined w/Def's exh's
                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Exhibit List (Party)
                      Defendant 1 envelope combined w/Plntf's exh's
                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Notice
                          Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                            Proof of Service
                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                              re: addendum to appeals designation
                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Appeal deposit for clerk's transcript
                                  Legal Document 116 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
                                    Legal Document 115 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Appeal: Appellant's Default Notice
                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Designation: Respondent
                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                        Proof of Service
                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Designation: Appellant
                                          8.122
                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                            Motion for Reconsideration
                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                              in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Atty's Fees
                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                Proof of Service
                                                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Order: Disposition of Exhibits
                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                    Re: notice of appeal
                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
                                                        re: mtn to reconsider and mtn for atty fees Denied
                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                              Proof of Service: Mail
                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                Ntc of Mtn, Memo of P&A, Opposition
                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                  AMENDED
                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                          Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                          Hrg 10/07/19 - in Opposition to Mtn for Sanctions, Reasonable Expenses; Atty Fees
                                                                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                          of Intent to Appear by Telephone
                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None notice of motion
                                                                            Notice of Motion
                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                              Motion: Sanctions and Attorney's Fees
                                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                mtn for reonsideration of 8-30-19 order 10-7-19 D-11 @1:30
                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                  Granted Exp 8/30/21; Cross Request Denied
                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                      Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                      Cross Request - Granted Exp. 8-30-19
                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                        Granted Exp. 8-30-19
                                                                                          Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                          2nd amended Granted - Exp. 8-23-19
                                                                                            Legal Document 86 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                            on Cross Request 2nd amended Granted - Exp. 8-23-19
                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                              Amended Granted Exp. 8-5-19
                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                Cross Request Amended Granted Exp. 8-5-19
                                                                                                  Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                  Amended Granted - Exp. 7-22-19
                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                    Cross-Request Amended Granted - Exp. 7-22-19
                                                                                                      Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                        Request
                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                          Proposed Order
                                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                            Editable Microsoft Word Proposed Order
                                                                                                              Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                              Declaration
                                                                                                                Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                            Cross-Request
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None notice of motion
                                                                                                                                for an Injunction ...
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                  for an Injunction ...
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                    of Diego Mas Marques
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                      of Diego Mas Marques
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                        Opposition
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                          Opposition
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                            Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                              to Deem Aaron Greenspan Vexatious by Def Diego Mas Marques (Pro Per)
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None other
                                                                                                                                                to Deem Aaron Greenspan Vexatious by Def Diego Mas Marques (Pro Per)
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                      Motion (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            cont: 05/02/19 @ 130pm
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                              Cross-Request - Cont. to 05/02/19 @ 130pm
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                  to Seal - 03/19/19 @ 9am
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request to Terminate filed prematurely.
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                              Amended
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    of letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                      substitute service on wife's of Masmarques
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              of letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross Request - Granted - Contued from 9-4 to 10-9
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    on request to continue hearing to terminate ROAH set for 10-9-18
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      notice of letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Declaration Re: Diligence
                                                                                                                                                                                                            re: req to continue hrg on req to terminate ROAH
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Declaration: Non-Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Declaration Re: Diligence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reissuance of Motion to terminate ROAH issued on 6/19/18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of Reasonable Diligence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of Reasonable Diligence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            on both motions Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reissued notice of hearing to terminate ROAH issued on 6/19/18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HRG 8/14/2018 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      to terminate ROAH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        on request to terminate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Request: Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cross-Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross-Request GRANTED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Personal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    clets, CH116
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      5 years exp.6/19/23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Request: Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  re: CV 5014
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Order Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GRANTED

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7,546 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?