JOHNSON v. RIHANNA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00448

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2019 at 12:30 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Judgment (Rule 58)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ORDER. This case is dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); and the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 5 ) is adopted as the Opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/2/18. (dcd) Staff note: a copy of this filing was sent today, via email; and via First-Class U.S. Mail, to Plaintiff's address of record.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 3 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?