United States v. Tommer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00788

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2021 at 6:29 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip L. Bednar +1 202 307 6415 +1 202 514 5238 philip.l.bednar@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Harry L. Tommer, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Paulette E. Tommer, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio, Defendant
No Logo Treasurer of Ottawa County, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Vacate
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Vacate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Vacate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  Complaint against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Paulette Tommer, # 3 Summons Paulette Tommer as trustee or other fiduciary of Right Way Marine, # 4 Summons Harry Tommer, # 5 Summons Ditech Financial, # 6 Summons State of Ohio, # 7 Summons Treasurer of Ottawa County) (Bednar, Philip)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (D,TM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. Related document(s) 1 . (D,TM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?