In Re 11218 Osborne Street, Los Angeles, CA 91342
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-03029

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 4:39 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo T.D. Service Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donna M. Osborn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cori Brooke Jones +1 949 477 5050 +1 949 608 9142 cjones@wrightlegal.net
v.
No Logo Elena Fondacaro, Defendant
No Logo Philip Fondacaro, Defendant
No Logo State of California Franchise Tax Board, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
No Logo 11218 Osborne Street, Los Angeles, CA 91342, In Re
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1444
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS ORDERED that T.D. Service Company shall pay $170,052.97 to the United States in partial satisfaction of the tax liabilities of Philip and Elena Fondacaro. The check shall be made payable to the Department of Treasury and sent to the following address: (See Judgment for further details) Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 7 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States of America. (Greene, Gavin)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number PS019763 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2) (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Greene, Gavin) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CONFORMED COPY OF PETITION filed by T.D. Service Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/26/2018; attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 7 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?