United States v. Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-01143

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 16, 2019 at 12:03 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie Page +1 202 514 8219 +1 202 514 6770 Stephanie.M.Page@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Page +1 202 514 8219 +1 202 514 6770 Stephanie.M.Page@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Derek B Matta +1 713 333 0555 +1 713 333 0550 dmatta@cctaxlaw.com
No Logo Farida Moeen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milledge, Samuel L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel L Milledge +1 713 812 1409 +1 713 812 1418 milledge@milledgelawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel L Milledge +1 713 812 1409 +1 713 812 1418 milledge@milledgelawfirm.com
No Logo Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Derek B Matta +1 713 333 0555 +1 713 333 0550 dmatta@cctaxlaw.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Other Notice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Entry Of Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Certificate of Interested Parties
              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P., Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - CivilCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference is RESET to 8/31/2018 at 02:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr, filed. (marflores, 4)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Certificate of Interested Parties
                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Page, Stephanie)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Answer
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Farida Moeen, filed.(Milledge, Samuel)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Answer
                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P., Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(LaurenWebsteradi, 4)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Request for Issuance of Summons as to Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P. dba United Memorial Medical Center dba United General Hospital, Farida Moeen, Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin, # 2 Summons to Farida Moeen)(Page, Stephanie)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT against Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P. dba United Memorial Medical Center dba United General Hospital, Farida Moeen, Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Stephanie)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Summons Issued as to Doctors Hospital 1997, L.P., Farida Moeen, Syed Rizwan Mohiuddin. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?