Henley v. Jacobs
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-02244-SBA
District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 7, 2021 at 10:37 PM DT (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward Russo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James W Spertus Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezra D Landes +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 ezra@spertuslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Donald Umhofer +1 310 826 4700 matthew@spertuslaw.com
No Logo Jacob Nocon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James W Spertus Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezra D Landes +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 ezra@spertuslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Donald Umhofer +1 310 826 4700 matthew@spertuslaw.com
No Logo Mathew Henley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James W Spertus Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezra D Landes +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 ezra@spertuslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Donald Umhofer +1 310 826 4700 matthew@spertuslaw.com
No Logo Nicholas Gicinto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James W Spertus Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezra D Landes +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 ezra@spertuslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Donald Umhofer +1 310 826 4700 matthew@spertuslaw.com
v.
No Logo Richard A. Jacobs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bostwick Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary L Bostwick +1 310 979 6059 +1 310 424 5975 gbostwick@B1Law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drooz Legal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Drooz +1 323 337 2092 deb@droozlegal.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                    ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting [89] STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AND DATES DUE TO COVID-19.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020, Terminated: 5/6/2020 stipulation
                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Dates and Deadlines due to COVID-19 filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo and Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 4/15/2020) Modified on 4/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [86] STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AND DATES. Designation of Experts due by 5/12/2020. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 5/26/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/9/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/24/2020. Dispositive Motion to be heard by 7/8/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Supplemental Brief
                                Supplemental Brief re [86] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo and Richard A. Jacobs. (Related document(s)[86]) (Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020, Terminated: 3/3/2020 stipulation
                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines and Dates filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo and Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 2/4/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [84] Stipulated Protective Order. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020, Terminated: 1/21/2020 stipulation
                                            STIPULATED Protective Order filed by Richard A. Jacobs, Edward Russo, Jacob Nocon, Matthew Henley and Nicholas Gicinto. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/21/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 83 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Order on Motion for Certificate of AppealabilityCourt Filing
                                                Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong denying [78] Motion for Interlocutory Appeal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                    Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [80] Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Deadlines and Dates. Close of Fact Discovery by 3/11/2020. Designation of Experts due by 2/11/2020. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 2/25/2020. Dispositive Motion hearing held by 4/8/2020. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [78] Amended MOTION for Certificate of Appealability CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [77]. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [78] Amended MOTION for Certificate of Appealability CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [77]. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 10/9/2019 Ex-Parte Application
                                                          Ex Parte Application re [56] Case Management Conference - Initial,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, for Order Continuing Deadlines and Dates filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Settlement Conference held on 9/27/2019. Case did not settle. No further settlement proceedings set at this time. (Total Time in Court: 7 hours.) (Not reported.) Attorney for Plaintiffs: Matthew Umhofer. Attorneys for Defendants: Gary Bostwick; Deborah Drooz. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2019)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [78] Amended MOTION for Certificate of Appealability CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [77] ) filed byNicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                Set/Reset Hearing re [74] Order Setting Settlement Conference, Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019, Terminated: 10/25/2019 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                                                                  Amended MOTION for Certificate of Appealability CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [77] filed by Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019, Terminated: 10/3/2019 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint byRichard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Order Setting Settlement Conference.Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/20/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2019. Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 9:30 AM. The Court will issue a settlement conference order.(Total Time in Court: 5 minutes.) (Not reported.) Attorney for Plaintiffs: Erza Landes; Matthew Umhofer. Attorney for Defendant: Gary Bostwick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2019)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2019. The Court was unable to find a date that worked for the parties and the Court until December; accordingly, the case is being reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (Not Reported)(Time 00:30) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2019)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties should meet and confer regarding dates that they can attend a settlement conference in September and October in advance. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/13/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING ACTION for Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/2/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong denying [49] Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; denying [52] Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO STRIKE [52] AND TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION.The hearing on the Second Motion to Strike Amended Complaint set 3/13/2019 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS [49] AND TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. The Motion to Dismiss set for 3/13/2019 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Brief
                                                                                            Response to [66] Objection to Defendant's Evidence filed by Richard A. Jacobs. (Related document(s)[66]) (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Objection
                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re [62] Reply to Opposition/Response (DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. JACOBS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE) by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Objection
                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re [59] Opposition/Response to Motion, Declarations of each Plaintiff ISO Opposition by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                          REPLY (re [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byNicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/17/19. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List and Markers)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2019. Designation of Experts due by 10/14/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 10/28/2019. Close of Fact Discovery by 11/11/2019. Close of Expert Discovery by 11/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 02:00 PM. Pretrial Preparation due by 1/15/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 02:00. Jury Selection and Jury Trial (5-6 days) set for 3/23/2020 10:00 AM. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2019)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019, Terminated: 8/2/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Richard A. Jacobs re [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) Amending Hearing Date (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re [49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[49]) (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019, Terminated: 8/2/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Jacobs. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom BK210, 2nd Floor Bankruptcy Court before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/28/2019. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. Insufficient notice given pursuant to L.R. 7-2. The hearing set for 2/13/19 is vacated. Please re-notice (do not re-file) your motion. Re:[49] Second MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Jacobs. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo and Richard A. Jacobs. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2019) Modified on 1/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard A. Jacobs. Filed byJacob Nocon, Mathew Henley, Edward Russo, Nicholas Gicinto. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/21/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2019 02:45 PM. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled on December 13, 2018, at 2:45 pm before the HONORABLE SAUNDRA BROWN ARMSTRONG is continued to January 17, 2019 at 2:45 pm. The joint case management statement shall be due on January 10, 2019. (Call-in instructions may be found in doc. [9]). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2019 02:45 PM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong denying as moot [39] Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearings.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court finds that the Motion to Strike[26], Motion to Dismiss[25] are appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to L.R. 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 11/14/2018 hearing is hereby vacated and the Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday October 31, 2018, is continued to Thursday, December 13, 2018 at 3:00 p.m., Case Management Statement due by December 6, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 03:00 PM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [39] Ex Parte Application re [26] MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint, [25] MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) , to Continue Hearings on Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss ) filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018, Terminated: 11/7/2018 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Application re [26] MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint, [25] MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) , to Continue Hearings on Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew Donald Umhofer in Support of Ex Parte Application, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard A. Jacobs (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo, Nicholas Gicinto, and Richard A. Jacobs. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2018) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 39 Ex Parte Application re 26 MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint, 25 MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6), to Continue Hearings on Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss ) filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [33] Reply to Opposition/Response CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [33-1] by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [32] Reply to Opposition/Response CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [32-1] by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Your Proposed Order has the attorney's signature not a signature line for the judge. Please re-file the proposed order without the attorney's signature Re:[33-1] Proposed Order filed by Richard A. Jacobs (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [25] MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re [30] Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declarations of Each Plaintiff in Support of Motion by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [26] MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint ) filed byNicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Mathew Henley in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, # (2) Declaration of Nicholas Gicinto in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, # (3) Declaration of Jacob Nocon in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, # (4) Declaration of Edward Russo in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, # (5) Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Strike)(Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [25] MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byNicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [27] Exhibits, [24] Request for Judicial Notice CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [27] filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Related document(s)[27], [24]) (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[27] Exhibits filed by Richard A. Jacobs (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [24] Request for Judicial Notice, [26] MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [24-1] filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Related document(s)[24], [26]) (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 12/10/2018 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint filed by Richard A. Jacobs. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom BK210, 2nd Floor Bankruptcy Court before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Motion to Strike, # (2) Exhibit ISO Drooz Declaration, # (3) Declaration ISO Motion to Strike)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 12/10/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Jacobs. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom BK210, 2nd Floor Bankruptcy Court before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration re Meet and Confer)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re [23] MOTION for Hearing re [22] Amended Complaint filed byRichard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[23]) (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS re [22] Amended Complaint filed by Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Certification of Meet and Confer)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss. Correct hearing time is 2:00 pm. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[23] MOTION for Hearing re [22] Amended Complaint filed by Richard A. Jacobs (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard A. Jacobs. Filed byJacob Nocon, Mathew Henley, Edward Russo, Nicholas Gicinto. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [20] Stipulation for Filing of First Amended Complaint.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Amended Complaint, filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo, Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 9/4/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Mathew Henley (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting [17] Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 02:30 PM.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo and Richard A. Jacobs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 7/27/2018) Modified on 7/30/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by defendant Jacobs (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jacob Nocon, Mathew Henley, Edward Russo, Nicholas Gicinto. Service waived by Richard A. Jacobs waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Drooz (Drooz, Deborah) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Application in Waymo v. Uber to Relate Cases by Richard A. Jacobs. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L Bostwick (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic filing error. Motion filed in wrong case pursuant to L.R. 3-12(b) Re:[10] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Edward Russo et al. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 7/9/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo. Responses due by 7/10/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Umhofer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2018 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/30/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nicholas Gicinto, Mathew Henley, Jacob Nocon, Edward Russo.. (Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Richard A. Jacobs. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons. (Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT with jury demand against Richard A. Jacobs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12271876.). Filed by Jacob Nocon, Mathew Henley, Edward Russo, Nicholas Gicinto. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Landes, Ezra) (Filed on 4/13/2018) Modified on 4/16/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Your Proposed Order has the attorney's signature not a signature line for the judge. Please re-file the proposed order without the attorney's signature Re:[32-1] Proposed Order re Defendants Motion per CCP ยง425.16 filed by Richard A. Jacobs (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Your Proposed Order has the attorney's signature not a signature line for the judge. Please r e-file the proposed order without the attorney's signature Re:[33-1] Proposed Order filed by Richard A. Jacobs (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement . Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 27 Exhibits filed by Richard A. Jacobs (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss. Correct hearing time is 2:00 pm. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 23 MOTION for Hearing re 22 Amended Complaint filed by Richard A. Jacobs (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?